Ghabin et al v. Barr et al
Plaintiff: Sallam Salim Aboulnour and Mahdi Ghabin
Defendant: Chad Wolf, Christopher A Wray, William Bierman and William P Barr
Case Number: 3:2020cv01920
Filed: July 21, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Ed Kinkeade
Nature of Suit: Immigration: Other Immigration Actions
Cause of Action: 08:1329
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 21, 2020 Filing 7 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Rutherford). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (jmg)
July 21, 2020 Filing 6 Case electronically transferred in from District of District of Columbia; Case Number 1:20-cv-01015. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas should seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. Copy of NEF to be sent US Mail to parties not electronically noticed.
July 9, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. Upon review of Defendants' #4 Consent Motion to Transfer Case and #5 Consent Motion for Extension of Time, it is hereby ORDERED that the Motions are GRANTED. The Clerk of the Court is DIRECTED to transfer this case "for the convenience of [the] parties..., in the interest of justice" to the United States District Court for the Northern District of Texas by July 19, 2020. 28 U.S.C. 1404(a). It is further ORDERED that Defendants shall respond to Plaintiff's #1 Complaint no later than thirty days after the case is transferred. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on July 9, 2020. (lccjn2) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 7/21/2020.]
July 8, 2020 Filing 5 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Defendants' Response to Plaintiffs' Complaint by WILLIAM P. BARR, WILLIAM BIERMAN, CHAD WOLF, CHRISTOPHER A. WRAY (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Yee, Marsha) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 7/21/2020.]
July 8, 2020 Filing 4 Consent MOTION to Transfer Case by WILLIAM P. BARR, WILLIAM BIERMAN, CHAD WOLF, CHRISTOPHER A. WRAY (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Yee, Marsha) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 7/21/2020.]
May 19, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Marsha Wellknown Yee on behalf of All Defendants (Yee, Marsha) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 7/21/2020.]
April 20, 2020 Filing 2 SUMMONS (5) Issued Electronically as to WILLIAM P. BARR, WILLIAM BIERMAN, CHAD WOLF, CHRISTOPHER A. WRAY, and U.S. Attorney (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(adh, ) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 7/21/2020.]
April 20, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Carl J. Nichols. (adh, ) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 7/21/2020.]
April 18, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against WILLIAM P. BARR, WILLIAM BIERMAN, CHAD WOLF, CHRISTOPHER A. WRAY ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-7036080) filed by MAHDI GHABIN, SALLAM SALIM ABOULNOUR. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Summons, #8 Summons, #9 Summons, #10 Summons, #11 Summons)(Kuck, Charles) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 7/21/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ghabin et al v. Barr et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chad Wolf
Represented By: Marsha Wellknown Yee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher A Wray
Represented By: Marsha Wellknown Yee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Bierman
Represented By: Marsha Wellknown Yee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William P Barr
Represented By: Marsha Wellknown Yee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sallam Salim Aboulnour
Represented By: Charles H Kuck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mahdi Ghabin
Represented By: Charles H Kuck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?