Mimiko v. Horn et al
Plaintiff: Phemy Mimiko
Defendant: NFN Horn, Unknown Officer #2 and Unknown Officer #1
Case Number: 3:2020cv02012
Filed: July 30, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Ada Brown
Referring Judge: David L Horan
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Pet/Other: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 30, 2020 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:4, 5, 6. Thu Jul 30 13:43:05 CDT 2020 (crt)
July 30, 2020 Filing 6 Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party. (jmg)
July 30, 2020 Filing 5 New Case Notes: A filing fee has not been paid. CASREF case referral set and case referred to Magistrate Judge Horan (see Special Order 3). Initiating documents received by mail. No prior sanctions found. (For court use only - links to the #national and #circuit indexes.) Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Horan). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (jmg)
July 30, 2020 Filing 4 Case electronically transferred in from District of Texas Eastern; Case Number 4:20-cv-00564. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas should seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. Copy of NEF to be sent US Mail to parties not electronically noticed.
July 29, 2020 Interdistrict transfer to the Northern District of Texas Dallas Division. (daj, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 7/30/2020.]
July 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER OF TRANSFER. ORDERED that the Plaintiff's lawsuit is TRANSFERRED to the Northern District of Texas, Dallas Division. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christine A. Nowak on 7/29/2020. (daj, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 7/30/2020.]
July 22, 2020 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. **Consent form mailed to Plf. (daj, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 7/30/2020.]
July 21, 2020 Filing 2 Case assigned to District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III and referred to Magistrate Judge Christine A. Nowak. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate referral) (daj, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 7/30/2020.]
July 21, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against FNU Horn, Unknown Officer #1, Unknown Officer #2, filed by Phemy Mimiko. (Attachments: #1 Envelope(s))(daj, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 7/30/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mimiko v. Horn et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Phemy Mimiko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NFN Horn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Officer #2
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Officer #1
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?