Lewis v. USA
Petitioner: Tymaine Akeen Lewis
Respondent: USA
Case Number: 3:2020cv02175
Filed: August 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Barbara MG Lynn
Referring Judge: Rebecca Rutherford
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Pet: Motions to Vacate Sentence
Cause of Action: 28:2255
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 JUDGMENT: The 28 U.S.C. 2255 motion to vacate in Civil Action No. 3:20-cv-02175-M is GRANTED. The sentence in the underlying criminal case is VACATED and Defendant will be resentenced in Case No. 3:16-cr-514-M. (Ordered by Chief Judge Barbara M. G. Lynn on 9/15/2020) (axm)
September 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #1 Motion to Vacate under 28 U.S.C. 2255. (Ordered by Chief Judge Barbara M. G. Lynn on 9/15/2020) (axm)
September 11, 2020 Filing 5 RESPONSE filed by USA re: #1 Unopposed MOTION to Vacate (Unopposed only on Ground 1, part 1) (McKay-DOJ, Brian)
August 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order to Show Cause, Notice, and Instructions to Parties. The clerk has served this order and will regenerate notice of the motion and supporting documents to the designated Assistant US Attorney. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Rebecca Rutherford on 8/20/2020) (axm) (Main Document 4 replaced on 8/20/2020) (axm).
August 18, 2020 Filing 3 Notice of Substitution of Counsel by AUSA. Brian W McKay-DOJ added as AUSA. (McKay-DOJ, Brian)
August 17, 2020 New Case Notes: A filing fee is not due for this case. CASREF case referral set and case referred to Magistrate Judge Rutherford (see Special Order 3). Case received over counter/electronically. No prior sanctions found. (For court use only - links to the #national and #circuit indexes.) (ykp)
August 17, 2020 Filing 2 Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by Tymaine Akeen Lewis re #1 Unopposed MOTION to Vacate (Unopposed only on Ground 1, part 1) (Wright-FPD, James)
August 17, 2020 Filing 1 MOTION to Vacate under 28 U.S.C. 2255 (Criminal Case Number 3:16-cr-514) Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. filed by Tymaine Akeen Lewis Attorney James Matthew Wright-FPD added to party Tymaine Akeen Lewis(pty:pet) (Wright-FPD, James) Modified text on 8/17/2020 (ykp).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lewis v. USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: USA
Represented By: Brian W McKay-DOJ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Tymaine Akeen Lewis
Represented By: James Matthew Wright-FPD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?