Logan v. MetLife Inc et al
Plaintiff: Vivian Logan
Defendant: Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, General Life Insurance Company, General Life Insurance Company of America, Metropolitan Tower Life Insurance Company, General American Life Insurance Company, GenAmerica Financial Corporation, MetLife, Inc. and MetLife Inc
Case Number: 3:2020cv02180
Filed: August 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Barbara M G Lynn
Nature of Suit: Contract: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 15, 2020 Filing 15 Joint Submission on Discovery Matters by Vivian Logan. (Malouf, Stephen)
September 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER REQUIRING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE AND REPORT FOR CONTENTS OF SCHEDULING ORDER: Joint Proposed Scheduling Order due by 10/15/2020. (Ordered by Chief Judge Barbara M. G. Lynn on 9/24/2020) (ndt)
September 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER: Before the Court is Defendant's Response to the Court's Order to Show Cause and Second Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Its Response to Plaintiff's Petition [ECF No. #12 ]. The Motion is GRANTED. (Ordered by Chief Judge Barbara M. G. Lynn on 9/24/2020) (ndt)
September 23, 2020 Filing 12 RESPONSE filed by Metropolitan Tower Life Insurance Company re: #11 Order to Show Cause/Order to Answer, (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Moore, Linda)
September 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER re: #8 Answer to the Complaint. Defendant is ORDERED to file a document by 9/30/2020, showing good cause for failing to comply with the Court's #6 Order extending the deadline for Defendant to file an Answer until 9/8/2020. (Ordered by Chief Judge Barbara M. G. Lynn on 9/22/2020) (mjr)
September 22, 2020 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Vivian Logan. (Malouf, Stephen)
September 21, 2020 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Metropolitan Tower Life Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate MetLife Inc for Metropolitan Tower Life Insurance Company. (Moore, Linda) Modified corporate parent on 9/22/2020 (mla).
September 21, 2020 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint filed by Metropolitan Tower Life Insurance Company. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Moore, Linda)
September 10, 2020 ***DISREGARD - CASE CLOSED IN ERROR*** Civil Case Terminated per #7 Notice of Dismissal. (axm) Modified on 9/11/2020 (cea).
September 10, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Dismissal Without Prejudice filed by Vivian Logan (Malouf, Stephen)
August 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer. Metropolitan Tower Life Insurance Company answer due 9/8/2020. (Ordered by Chief Judge Barbara M. G. Lynn on 8/25/2020) (oyh)
August 24, 2020 Filing 5 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer to Plaintiff's Petition filed by Metropolitan Tower Life Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Moore, Linda)
August 19, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Consent to Removal re: #1 Notice of Removal filed by MetLife Inc, Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, Metropolitan Tower Life Insurance Company. (Moore, Linda)
August 17, 2020 Filing 3 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Ramirez). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (oyh)
August 17, 2020 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by MetLife, Inc., Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, Metropolitan Tower Life Insurance Company. (Moore, Linda)
August 17, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH JURY DEMAND filed by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, Metropolitan Tower Life Insurance Company, MetLife, Inc.. (Filing fee $400; receipt number 0539-11084654) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B, #3 Exhibit(s) C, #4 Cover Sheet, #5 Cover Sheet Supplement) (Moore, Linda)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Logan v. MetLife Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metropolitan Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Linda G Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Linda G Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Life Insurance Company of America
Represented By: Linda G Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metropolitan Tower Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Linda G Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General American Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Linda G Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GenAmerica Financial Corporation
Represented By: Linda G Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MetLife, Inc.
Represented By: Linda G Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MetLife Inc
Represented By: Linda G Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vivian Logan
Represented By: Stephen F Malouf
Represented By: Jonathan Andrew Nockels
Represented By: Taylor Patrick Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?