Walker v. C R Bard Inc et al
Plaintiff: Annie Walker
Defendant: Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, McKesson Corporation, C R Bard Inc and Does 1 through 100 Inclusive
Case Number: 3:2020cv02187
Filed: August 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Karen Gren Scholer
Nature of Suit: Torts/Pers Inj: Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 19, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 19, 2020 Case transferred from NDTX has been opened in Eastern District of Michigan, Ann Arbor Division as case number 2:20-cv-12232. (jmg)
August 17, 2020 Interdistrict Transfer to Eastern District of Michigan, Ann Arbor Division; notice sent via email. All documents available electronically. If receiving court cannot upload, documents are available from PACER (record does not contain restricted documents). Counsel advised to file future documents in Eastern District of Michigan, Ann Arbor Division. (jmg)
August 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER granting #20 Unopposed Motion to Sever and Transfer Venue of Out of State Plaintiffs' Cases. The Court directs the Clerk of the Court to sever and transfer this action as follows: a. Plaintiff Joseph Abell's case be severed and transferred to the Baltimore Division of the District of Maryland (Civil case 3:20-cv-2182 opened); b. Plaintiff Michael Bell's case be severed and transferred to the Atlanta Division of the Northern District of Georgia (Civil case 3:20-cv-2183 opened); c. Plaintiff Scott German's case be severed and transferred to the Toledo Division of the Northern District of Ohio (Civil case 3:20-cv-2184 opened); d. Plaintiff Marie Leonard's case be severed and transferred to the Raleigh Division of the Eastern District of North Carolina (Civil case 3:20-cv-2185 opened); e. Plaintiff Wilhemenia Lindsey's case be severed and transferred to the Columbus Division of the Southern District of Ohio (Civil case 3:20-cv-2186 opened); f. Plaintiff Annie Walker's case be severed and transferred to the Ann Arbor Division of the Eastern District of Michigan (Civil case 3:20-cv-2187 opened); g. Plaintiff Loreta Windmyer's case be severed and transferred to the Dayton Division of the Southern District of Ohio (Civil case 3:20-cv-2188 opened); h. Plaintiff Cathy Wilburn's case be severed and transferred to the Ashland Division of the Eastern District of Kentucky (Civil case 3:20-cv-2189 opened); i. Plaintiff Cynthia Hughes's case be severed and transferred to the Chattanooga Division of the Eastern District of Tennessee (Civil case 3:20-cv-2190 opened). Plaintiff Manuela Gonzalez is the sole plaintiff with any connection to this forum. Accordingly, he shall remain in the Dallas Division of the Northern District of Texas. (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 8/17/2020) (jmg)
August 14, 2020 Filing 24 RESPONSE filed by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Inc re: #20 MOTION to Sever and Transfer Venue of Out of State Plaintiffs' Cases (Matthews, Melissa)
July 31, 2020 Filing 23 RESPONSE filed by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Inc, McKesson Corporation re: #20 MOTION to Sever and Transfer Venue of Out of State Plaintiffs' Cases (Matthews, Melissa)
July 29, 2020 Filing 22 Appendix in Support filed by Joseph Abell, Michael Bell, Scott German, Manuela Gonzalez, Cynthia Hughes, Marie Leonard, Wilhemenia Lindsey, Annie Walker, Loreta Widmyer, Cathy Wilburn re #20 MOTION to Sever and Transfer Venue of Out of State Plaintiffs' Cases Including Declaration and Exhibits (Schulte, Steven)
July 29, 2020 Filing 21 Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by Joseph Abell, Michael Bell, Scott German, Manuela Gonzalez, Cynthia Hughes, Marie Leonard, Wilhemenia Lindsey, Annie Walker, Loreta Widmyer, Cathy Wilburn re #20 MOTION to Sever and Transfer Venue of Out of State Plaintiffs' Cases (Schulte, Steven)
July 29, 2020 Filing 20 MOTION to Sever and Transfer Venue of Out of State Plaintiffs' Cases filed by Joseph Abell, Michael Bell, Scott German, Manuela Gonzalez, Cynthia Hughes, Marie Leonard, Wilhemenia Lindsey, Annie Walker, Loreta Widmyer, Cathy Wilburn (Schulte, Steven)
July 29, 2020 Filing 19 RESPONSE filed by Joseph Abell, Michael Bell, Scott German, Manuela Gonzalez, Cynthia Hughes, Marie Leonard, Wilhemenia Lindsey, Annie Walker, Loreta Widmyer, Cathy Wilburn re: #9 MOTION to Dismiss Without Prejudice Plaintiffs' Claims for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction, #3 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Schulte, Steven)
July 22, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE of Filing Completed Forms for Each Plaintiff re: #16 Order, filed by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Inc, McKesson Corporation (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s)) (Matthews, Melissa)
July 22, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE of Filing Completed Forms For Each Plaintiff filed by Joseph Abell, Michael Bell, Scott German, Manuela Gonzalez, Cynthia Hughes, Marie Leonard, Wilhemenia Lindsey, Annie Walker, Loreta Widmyer, Cathy Wilburn (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s)) (Schulte, Steven)
July 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER: To assist the Court, counsel for all parties shall complete the form attached hereto as Exhibit A for each Plaintiff in this action. The parties shall file their completed forms on or before July 22, 2020. (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 7/16/2020) (ndt)
July 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ELECTRONIC ORDER: The Court grants the parties' Agreed Motion for Extension of Time. (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 7/1/2020) (ctf)
June 29, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to #9 MOTION to Dismiss Without Prejudice Plaintiffs' Claims for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction, #3 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Joseph Abell, Michael Bell, Scott German, Manuela Gonzalez, Cynthia Hughes, Marie Leonard, Wilhemenia Lindsey, Annie Walker, Loreta Widmyer, Cathy Wilburn (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Schulte, Steven)
June 15, 2020 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by McKesson Corporation. (Matthews, Melissa) (Main Document 13 replaced to flatten image on 6/15/2020) (dsr).
June 15, 2020 Filing 12 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) with Jury Demand filed by Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc, C R Bard Inc (Matthews, Melissa)
June 15, 2020 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) with Jury Demand filed by McKesson Corporation (Matthews, Melissa)
June 15, 2020 Filing 10 Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by McKesson Corporation re #9 MOTION to Dismiss Without Prejudice Plaintiffs' Claims for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction (Matthews, Melissa)
June 15, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss Without Prejudice Plaintiffs' Claims for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction filed by McKesson Corporation (Matthews, Melissa)
June 10, 2020 Filing 8 AMENDED DOCUMENT by Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc. Amendment to #6 Cert. Of Interested Persons/Disclosure Statement. . (Matthews, Melissa) (Main Document 8 replaced with flattened document on 6/12/2020) (ykp).
June 10, 2020 Filing 7 AMENDED DOCUMENT by C R Bard Inc. Amendment to #5 Cert. Of Interested Persons/Disclosure Statement. . (Matthews, Melissa) (Main Document 7 replaced with flattened document on 6/12/2020) (ykp).
June 10, 2020 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc. (Matthews, Melissa) (Main Document 6 replaced with flattened document on 6/12/2020) (ykp).
June 10, 2020 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by C R Bard Inc. (Matthews, Melissa) (Main Document 5 replaced with flattened document on 6/12/2020) (ykp).
June 8, 2020 Filing 4 Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc, C R Bard Inc, Does 1 through 100 inclusive, McKesson Corporation re #3 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Matthews, Melissa)
June 8, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc, C R Bard Inc, Does 1 through 100 inclusive, McKesson Corporation (Matthews, Melissa)
June 8, 2020 Filing 2 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Horan). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (hml)
June 8, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH JURY DEMAND filed by Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc., Does 1 through 100 inclusive, C. R. Bard, Inc.. (Filing fee $400; receipt number 0539-10896016) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Cover Sheet Supplement, #3 Exhibit(s) A - Portion of REACH Agreement, #4 Exhibit(s) B - McKesson, #5 Exhibit(s) C - 8-30-16 Romney, Kim Deposition, #6 Exhibit(s) D - Index of State Court Documents, #7 Exhibit(s) D-1 - State Court Docket Sheet, #8 Exhibit(s) D-2 - Plaintiffs' Original Petition, #9 Exhibit(s) D-3 - Civil Case Info Sheet, #10 Exhibit(s) D-4 - Jury Demand, #11 Exhibit(s) D-5 - Citation Issued to Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc., #12 Exhibit(s) D-6 - Citation Issued to C.R. Bard, Inc., #13 Exhibit(s) D-7 - Citation Issued to McKesson Corp., #14 Exhibit(s) D-8 - Affidavit of Service - McKesson, #15 Exhibit(s) D-9 - Return of Service - C.R. Bard, Inc., #16 Exhibit(s) D-10 - Return of Service - Bard Peripheral) (Matthews, Melissa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Walker v. C R Bard Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated
Represented By: Melissa Dorman Matthews
Represented By: Jordan E Jarreau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKesson Corporation
Represented By: Melissa Dorman Matthews
Represented By: Jordan E Jarreau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C R Bard Inc
Represented By: Melissa Dorman Matthews
Represented By: Jordan E Jarreau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 100 Inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Annie Walker
Represented By: Darren McDowell
Represented By: Eric Martin Przybysz
Represented By: Steven Scott Schulte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?