Girardin v. CR Bard Inc et al
Plaintiff: Ronald Girardin
Defendant: McKesson Corporation, Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, CR Bard Inc and Does 1 through 100 Inclusive
Case Number: 3:2020cv02210
Filed: August 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Office: Dallas Office
Presiding Judge: Karen Gren Scholer
Nature of Suit: Torts/Pers Inj: Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 19, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 19, 2020 Case transferred from NDTX has been opened in Middle District of Florida as case number 6:20-cv-01496. (mjr)
August 17, 2020 Interdistrict Transfer to Middle District of Florida, Orlando Division; notice sent via email. All documents available electronically. If receiving court cannot upload, documents are available from PACER (record does not contain restricted documents). Counsel advised to file future documents in Middle District of Florida, Orlando Division. (mjr)
August 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 27 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting #24 Unopposed Amended Motion to Sever and Transfer Venue of Out-of-State Plaintiff' Cases. The Court directs the Clerk of the Court to sever and transfer this action as follows: a. Plaintiff Johnetta Ateman case be severed and transferred to the Peoria Division of the Central District of Illinois (Civil case 3:20-cv-2209-S opened); b. Plaintiff Ronald Girardin case be severed and transferred to the Orlando Division of the Middle District of Florida (Civil case 3:20-cv-2210-S opened); c. Plaintiff Kyla Ferguson's case be severed and transferred to the Kansas City Division of the Western District of Missouri (Civil case 3:20-cv-2211-S opened); d. Plaintiff Shirley Hasselle's case be severed and transferred to the Jackson Division of the Southern District of Mississippi (Civil case 3:20-cv-2212-S opened);e. Plaintiff Kimberly Kennebrew's case be severed and transferred to the Binghamton Division of the Northern District of New York (Civil case 3:20-cv-2213-S opened);f. Plaintiff Angie Lewis's case be severed and transferred to the Savannah of the Southern District of Georgia (Civil case 3:20-cv-2214-S opened);g. Plaintiff Carl Martin's case be severed and transferred to the Ashland Division of the Eastern District of Kentucky (Civil case 3:20-cv-2215-S opened);h. Plaintiff Harry Stoner's case be severed and transferred to the Erie Division of the Western District of Pennsylvania (Civil case 3:20-cv-2216-S opened);i. Plaintiff Steve Urevith's case be severed and transferred to the Southern District of New York (Civil case 3:20-cv-2217-S opened); (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 8/17/2020) (axm)
August 14, 2020 Filing 26 RESPONSE filed by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, CR Bard Inc re: #20 MOTION to Sever and Transfer Venue of Out of State Plaintiffs' Cases, #24 Amended MOTION to Sever and Transfer Venue of Out of State Plaintiffs' Cases (Matthews, Melissa)
August 11, 2020 Filing 25 Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by Johnetta Ateman, Alex Dominguez, Kyla Ferguson, Ronald Girardin, Shirley Hasselle, Kimberly Kennebrew, Angie Lewis, Carl Martin, Harry Stoner, Steve Urevith re #24 Amended MOTION to Sever and Transfer Venue of Out of State Plaintiffs' Cases (Schulte, Steven)
August 11, 2020 Filing 24 Amended MOTION to Sever and Transfer Venue of Out of State Plaintiffs' Cases filed by Johnetta Ateman, Alex Dominguez, Kyla Ferguson, Ronald Girardin, Shirley Hasselle, Kimberly Kennebrew, Angie Lewis, Carl Martin, Harry Stoner, Steve Urevith (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Schulte, Steven)
July 31, 2020 Filing 23 RESPONSE filed by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, CR Bard Inc, McKesson Corporation re: #20 MOTION to Sever and Transfer Venue of Out of State Plaintiffs' Cases (Matthews, Melissa)
July 29, 2020 Filing 22 Appendix in Support filed by Johnetta Ateman, Alex Dominguez, Kyla Ferguson, Ronald Girardin, Shirley Hasselle, Kimberly Kennebrew, Angie Lewis, Carl Martin, Harry Stoner, Steve Urevith re #20 MOTION to Sever and Transfer Venue of Out of State Plaintiffs' Cases Including Declaration and Exhibits (Schulte, Steven)
July 29, 2020 Filing 21 Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by Johnetta Ateman, Alex Dominguez, Kyla Ferguson, Ronald Girardin, Shirley Hasselle, Kimberly Kennebrew, Angie Lewis, Carl Martin, Harry Stoner, Steve Urevith re #20 MOTION to Sever and Transfer Venue of Out of State Plaintiffs' Cases (Schulte, Steven)
July 29, 2020 Filing 20 MOTION to Sever and Transfer Venue of Out of State Plaintiffs' Cases filed by Johnetta Ateman, Alex Dominguez, Kyla Ferguson, Ronald Girardin, Shirley Hasselle, Kimberly Kennebrew, Angie Lewis, Carl Martin, Harry Stoner, Steve Urevith (Schulte, Steven)
July 29, 2020 Filing 19 RESPONSE filed by Johnetta Ateman, Alex Dominguez, Kyla Ferguson, Ronald Girardin, Shirley Hasselle, Kimberly Kennebrew, Angie Lewis, Carl Martin, Harry Stoner, Steve Urevith re: #2 MOTION to Dismiss the Out-of-State Plaintiffs Claims for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction (Schulte, Steven)
July 22, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE of Filing Completed Forms for Each Plaintiff filed by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, CR Bard Inc, Does 1 through 100 Inclusive, McKesson Corporation (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A - Responses) (Matthews, Melissa)
July 22, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE of Filing Completed Forms For Each Plaintiff filed by Johnetta Ateman, Alex Dominguez, Kyla Ferguson, Ronald Girardin, Shirley Hasselle, Kimberly Kennebrew, Angie Lewis, Carl Martin, Harry Stoner, Steve Urevith (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s)) (Schulte, Steven)
July 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER: To assist the Court, counsel for all parties shall complete the form attached hereto as Exhibit A for each Plaintiff in this action. The parties shall file their completed forms on or before 7/22/2020. (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 7/16/2020) (mla)
July 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ELECTRONIC ORDER: The Court grants the parties' Agreed Motion for Extension of Time. (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 7/1/2020) (ctf)
June 29, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to #8 MOTION to Dismiss the Out-of-State Plaintiffs Claims for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction, #2 MOTION to Dismiss the Out-of-State Plaintiffs Claims for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction filed by Johnetta Ateman, Alex Dominguez, Kyla Ferguson, Ronald Girardin, Shirley Hasselle, Kimberly Kennebrew, Angie Lewis, Carl Martin, Harry Stoner, Steve Urevith (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Schulte, Steven)
June 15, 2020 Filing 13 Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by McKesson Corporation re #8 MOTION to Dismiss the Out-of-State Plaintiffs Claims for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction as Amended (Junek, Jessica)
June 15, 2020 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by McKesson Corporation. (Junek, Jessica)
June 15, 2020 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) with Jury Demand filed by Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc, CR Bard Inc (Junek, Jessica)
June 15, 2020 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) with Jury Demand filed by McKesson Corporation (Junek, Jessica)
June 15, 2020 Filing 9 Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by McKesson Corporation re #8 MOTION to Dismiss the Out-of-State Plaintiffs Claims for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction (Junek, Jessica)
June 15, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss the Out-of-State Plaintiffs Claims for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction filed by McKesson Corporation Attorney Jessica Junek added to party McKesson Corporation(pty:dft) (Junek, Jessica)
June 10, 2020 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc. (Junek, Jessica) (Main Document 7 replaced with flattened document on 6/11/2020) (awc).
June 10, 2020 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by CR Bard Inc. (Junek, Jessica) (Main Document 6 replaced with flattened document on 6/11/2020) (awc).
June 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ELECTRONIC ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Karen Gren Scholer, for all further proceedings. Judge Ed Kinkeade no longer assigned to case. (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 6/9/2020) (chmb)
June 9, 2020 Filing 4 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Toliver). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (oyh)
June 8, 2020 Filing 3 Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc., C.R. Bard, Inc. re #2 MOTION to Dismiss the Out-of-State Plaintiffs Claims for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction (Junek, Jessica)
June 8, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION to Dismiss the Out-of-State Plaintiffs Claims for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction filed by Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc, CR Bard Inc. (Junek, Jessica)
June 8, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by CR Bard Inc, Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc. (Filing fee $400; receipt number 0539-10897065) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Cover Sheet Supplement, #3 Exhibit(s) A - Portions of REACH Agreement (redacted), #4 Exhibit(s) B - McKesson, #5 Exhibit(s) C - 8-30-16 Romney, Kim Depositio, #6 Exhibit(s) D - Index of State Documents, #7 Exhibit(s) D-1 State Court Docket Sheet, #8 Exhibit(s) D-2 Plaintiffs' Original Petition, #9 Exhibit(s) D-3 Civil Case Info Sheet, #10 Exhibit(s) D-4 Citation Issued to Bard Peripheral Inc, #11 Exhibit(s) D-5 Citation Issued to C.R. Bard, Inc., #12 Exhibit(s) D-6 Citation Issued to McKesson, #13 Exhibit(s) D-7 Executed Affidavit of Service - McKesson, #14 Exhibit(s) D-8 Return of Service C.R. Bard, #15 Exhibit(s) D-9 Return of Service Bard Peripheral Vascular) (Junek, Jessica) Modified Docket Text on 6/9/2020 (oyh).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Girardin v. CR Bard Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKesson Corporation
Represented By: Jessica Junek
Represented By: Melissa Dorman Matthews
Represented By: Jordan E Jarreau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated
Represented By: Jessica Junek
Represented By: Melissa Dorman Matthews
Represented By: Jordan E Jarreau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CR Bard Inc
Represented By: Jessica Junek
Represented By: Melissa Dorman Matthews
Represented By: Jordan E Jarreau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 100 Inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald Girardin
Represented By: Steven Scott Schulte
Represented By: Eric Martin Przybysz
Represented By: Darren McDowell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?