Jackson v. C R Bard Inc et al
Plaintiff: Markus Jackson
Defendant: McKesson Corporation, C R Bard Inc, Does 1 through 100 Inclusive and Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc
Case Number: 3:2020cv02222
Filed: August 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Office: Dallas Office
Presiding Judge: Karen Gren Scholer
Nature of Suit: Torts/Pers Inj: Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 24, 2020 Case transferred from NDTX has been opened in Southern District of Ohio as case number 1:20-cv-00653. (oyh)
August 17, 2020 Interdistrict Transfer to Southern District of Ohio, Cincinnati Division; notice sent via email. All documents available electronically. If receiving court cannot upload, documents are available from PACER (record does not contain restricted documents). Counsel advised to file future documents in Southern District of Ohio, Cincinnati Division. (mjr)
August 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting #17 Unopposed Motion to Sever and Transfer Venue of Out-of-State Plaintiffs' Cases. The Court directs the Clerk of the Court to sever and transfer this action as follows: a. Plaintiff Patricia Carn's case be severed and transferred to the Harrisburg Division of the Middle District of Pennsylvania (Civil case 3:20-cv-2218-S); b. Plaintiff Stella Colbert's case be severed and transferred to the Jackson Division of the Western District of Tennessee (Civil case 3:20-cv-2219-S); c. Plaintiff William Creekmur's case be severed and transferred to the Paducah Division of the Western District of Kentucky (Civil case 3:20-cv-2220-S); d. Plaintiff Susan Dancy's case be severed and transferred to the Jackson Division of the Western District of Tennessee (Civil case 3:20-cv-2221-S); e. Plaintiff Markus Jackson's case be severed and transferred to the Cincinnati Division of the Southern District of Ohio (Civil case 3:20-cv-2222-S); f. Plaintiff Robert Laplante's case be severed and transferred to the St. Louis Division of the Eastern District of Missouri (Civil case 3:20-cv-2223-S); g. Plaintiff Carlos McPeak's case be severed and transferred to the Roanoke Division of the Western District of Virginia (Civil case 3:20-cv-2224-S); h. Plaintiff Barry McQuitty's case be severed and transferred to the Detroit Division of the Eastern District of Michigan (Civil case 3:20-cv-2225-S); i. Plaintiff Beverly Whitaker's case be severed and transferred to the Sacramento Division of the Eastern District of California (Civil case 3:20-cv-2226-S). Plaintiff Melvin Green is the sole plaintiff with any connection to this forum. Accordingly, he shall remain in the Dallas Division of the Northern District of Texas. (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 8/17/2020) (axm)
August 14, 2020 Filing 20 RESPONSE filed by Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc, C R Bard Inc re: #17 MOTION to Sever and Transfer Venue of Out of State Plaintiffs' Cases (Matthews, Melissa)
July 30, 2020 Filing 19 Appendix in Support filed by Patricia Carn, Stella Colbert, William Creekmur, Susan Dancy, Melvin Green, Markus Jackson, Robert LaPlante, Carlos McPeak, Barry McQuitty, Beverly Whitaker re #17 MOTION to Sever and Transfer Venue of Out of State Plaintiffs' Cases Including Declaration and Exhibits (Schulte, Steven)
July 30, 2020 Filing 18 Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by Patricia Carn, Stella Colbert, William Creekmur, Susan Dancy, Melvin Green, Markus Jackson, Robert LaPlante, Carlos McPeak, Barry McQuitty, Beverly Whitaker re #17 MOTION to Sever and Transfer Venue of Out of State Plaintiffs' Cases (Schulte, Steven)
July 30, 2020 Filing 17 MOTION to Sever and Transfer Venue of Out of State Plaintiffs' Cases filed by Patricia Carn, Stella Colbert, William Creekmur, Susan Dancy, Melvin Green, Markus Jackson, Robert LaPlante, Carlos McPeak, Barry McQuitty, Beverly Whitaker (Schulte, Steven)
July 30, 2020 Filing 16 RESPONSE filed by Patricia Carn, Stella Colbert, William Creekmur, Susan Dancy, Melvin Green, Markus Jackson, Robert LaPlante, Carlos McPeak, Barry McQuitty, Beverly Whitaker re: #2 MOTION to Dismiss the Out-of-State Plaintiffs' Claims for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction, #8 MOTION to Dismiss the Out-of-State Plaintiffs Claims for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction (Schulte, Steven)
July 22, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE of Filing Completed Forms For Each Plaintiff filed by Patricia Carn, Stella Colbert, William Creekmur, Susan Dancy, Melvin Green, Markus Jackson, Robert LaPlante, Carlos McPeak, Barry McQuitty, Beverly Whitaker (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s)) (Schulte, Steven)
July 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ELECTRONIC ORDER: The Court grants the parties' Agreed Motion for Extension of Time. (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 7/1/2020) (ctf)
June 29, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to #2 MOTION to Dismiss the Out-of-State Plaintiffs' Claims for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction, #8 MOTION to Dismiss the Out-of-State Plaintiffs Claims for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction filed by Patricia Carn, Stella Colbert, William Creekmur, Susan Dancy, Melvin Green, Markus Jackson, Robert LaPlante, Carlos McPeak, Barry McQuitty, Beverly Whitaker (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Schulte, Steven)
June 16, 2020 Filing 12 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) with Jury Demand filed by Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc, C R Bard Inc (Junek, Jessica)
June 16, 2020 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) with Jury Demand filed by McKesson Corporation (Junek, Jessica)
June 16, 2020 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by McKesson Corporation. (Junek, Jessica) (Main Document 10 replaced to flatten image on 6/16/2020) (dsr).
June 16, 2020 Filing 9 Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by McKesson Corporation re #8 MOTION to Dismiss the Out-of-State Plaintiffs Claims for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction (Junek, Jessica)
June 16, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss the Out-of-State Plaintiffs Claims for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction filed by McKesson Corporation Attorney Jessica Junek added to party McKesson Corporation(pty:dft) (Junek, Jessica)
June 10, 2020 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc. (Junek, Jessica) (Main Document 7 replaced with flattened document on 6/11/2020) (awc).
June 10, 2020 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by C R Bard Inc. (Junek, Jessica) (Main Document 6 replaced with flattened document on 6/11/2020) (awc).
June 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ELECTRONIC ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Karen Gren Scholer for all further proceedings. Judge Ed Kinkeade no longer assigned to case. (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 6/9/2020) (chmb)
June 9, 2020 Filing 4 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Toliver). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (hml)
June 9, 2020 Filing 3 Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc, C R Bard Inc re #2 MOTION to Dismiss the Out-of-State Plaintiffs' Claims for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction (Junek, Jessica)
June 9, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION to Dismiss the Out-of-State Plaintiffs' Claims for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction filed by Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc, C R Bard Inc (Junek, Jessica)
June 9, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH JURY DEMAND filed by C. R. Bard, Inc., Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc.. (Filing fee $400; receipt number 0539-10900275) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Cover Sheet Supplement, #3 Exhibit(s) A - Portion of REACH Agreement (redacted), #4 Exhibit(s) B - McKesson, #5 Exhibit(s) C - 8-30-16 Romney, Kim Deposition, #6 Exhibit(s) D - Index of State Court Documents, #7 Exhibit(s) D-1 State Court Docket Sheet, #8 Exhibit(s) D-2 Plaintiffs' Original Petition, #9 Exhibit(s) D-3 Civil Case Info. Sheet, #10 Exhibit(s) D-4 Citation Issued - Bard Peripheral, #11 Exhibit(s) D-5 Citation Issued - C.R. Bard Inc., #12 Exhibit(s) D-6 Citation Issued - McKesson, #13 Exhibit(s) D-7 Executed Affidavit of Service - McKesson, #14 Exhibit(s) D-8 Executed Return of Service- C.R. Bard Inc., #15 Exhibit(s) D-9 Executed Return of Service - Bard Peripheral) (Junek, Jessica)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jackson v. C R Bard Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Markus Jackson
Represented By: Steven Scott Schulte
Represented By: Eric Martin Przybysz
Represented By: Darren McDowell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKesson Corporation
Represented By: Jessica Junek
Represented By: Melissa Dorman Matthews
Represented By: Jordan E Jarreau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C R Bard Inc
Represented By: Jessica Junek
Represented By: Melissa Dorman Matthews
Represented By: Jordan E Jarreau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 100 Inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc
Represented By: Jessica Junek
Represented By: Melissa Dorman Matthews
Represented By: Jordan E Jarreau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?