Okoroji v. USA
Petitioner: Patience Okoroji
Respondent: USA
Case Number: 3:2020cv02303
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Reed C O'Connor
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Pet: Motions to Vacate Sentence
Cause of Action: 28:2255
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 26, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 26, 2020 Filing 4 Notice of Substitution of Counsel by AUSA. Jonathan Glen Bradshaw-DOJ added as AUSA. (Bradshaw-DOJ, Jonathan)
August 24, 2020 Filing 3 Supplemental Document by Patience Okoroji as to #1 Motion to Vacate under 28 U.S.C. 2255 . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Supplement) (Gordon, Jeremy)
August 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order to Show Cause, Notice, and Instructions to Parties. The clerk has served this order and will regenerate notice of the motion and supporting documents to the designated Assistant US Attorney. Leigha A Simonton-DOJ for USA added. Pursuant to Rule 4(b) of the Rules Governing Section 2255 Proceedings, the United States Attorney is ORDERED to file an Answer or Response to the instant motion on or before sixty (60) days from the date of this order. Deadline to reply to the answer is 30 days. (Ordered by Judge Reed C. O'Connor on 8/21/2020) (ykp)
August 19, 2020 New Case Notes: A filing fee is not due for this case. Case received over counter/electronically. No prior sanctions found. (For court use only - links to the #national and #circuit indexes.) (ykp)
August 19, 2020 Filing 1 MOTION to Vacate under 28 U.S.C. 2255 (Criminal Case Number 3:15-cr-559-O-1) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law In Support of Motion, #2 Exhibit(s) A - Declaration of Patience Okoroji, #3 Exhibit(s) B - Declaration of Bryant Okoroji) (Gordon, Jeremy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Okoroji v. USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: USA
Represented By: Jonathan Glen Bradshaw-DOJ
Represented By: Leigha A Simonton-DOJ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Patience Okoroji
Represented By: Jeremy Brian Gordon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?