Emerson v. Lewis
Petitioner: Terrance Emerson and Terrance Wayne Emerson
Respondent: NFN Lewis
Case Number: 3:2020cv02305
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Jane J Boyle
Referring Judge: David L Horan
2 Judge: Sam A Lindsay
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Pet/Habeas Corpus: General
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 14, 2020 Filing 7 Mail returned as undeliverable. #4 Order Reassigning Case received back from Terrance Wayne Emerson as UTF Discharged. No address update from last filed document. The current document has not been re-mailed. (oyh)
September 4, 2020 Filing 6 Mail returned as undeliverable. #1 Judge Boyle,, #2 Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party received back from Terrance Emerson as Discharged - not deliverable as address- unable to forward. No address update from last filed document. The current document has not been re-mailed. (mjr)
August 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER CONSOLIDATING CASES: Member case(s) 3:20-CV-2305 consolidated with lead case 3:20-CV-2163-L. Member case administratively closed following consolidation. Further docketing should be in lead case 3:20-CV-2163-L. (Ordered by Judge Sam A. Lindsay on 8/31/2020) (svc)
August 26, 2020 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:4. Wed Aug 26 12:27:08 CDT 2020 (crt)
August 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Sam A. Lindsay for all further proceedings. Judge Jane J. Boyle no longer assigned to case. (Ordered by Judge Jane J. Boyle on 8/26/2020) (axm)
August 19, 2020 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:1,2. Wed Aug 19 14:27:02 CDT 2020 (crt)
August 19, 2020 Filing 3 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Terrance Emerson. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (oyh)
August 19, 2020 Filing 2 Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party. (oyh)
August 19, 2020 Filing 1 New Case Notes: A filing fee has not been paid. CASREF case referral set and case referred to Magistrate Judge Horan (see Special Order 3). Initiating documents received by mail. No prior sanctions found. (For court use only - links to the #national and #circuit indexes.) Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Horan). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (oyh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Emerson v. Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: NFN Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Terrance Emerson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Terrance Wayne Emerson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?