Bekendam et al v. State of Texas et al
Plaintiff: Stephanie Bekendam
Defendant: Criminal Justice Board of Pardons and Paroles and State of Texas
Interested Party: Tyler Layne Bekendam
Case Number: 3:2020cv02307
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Ed Kinkeade
Referring Judge: Rebecca Rutherford
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Pet/Other: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 9, 2020 Filing 20 RESPONSE filed by Stephanie Bekendam re: #4 Order And Notice of Deficiency. (oyh)
October 8, 2020 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:19. Thu Oct 8 14:42:59 CDT 2020 (crt)
October 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER: Plaintiff Stephanie Bekendam seeks at least a 7-day extension of time to file a 6-month inmate trust account or a current financial affidavit in support of her Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (ECF No. #18 .) Bekendam's motion is GRANTED, and she has 20 days from the date of this order to file her 6-month inmate trust account or a current financial affidavit. Bekendam also questions, "May I get an early release through parole? I need to go home!" To the extent that she is seeking something other than an extension of time within which to file a 6-month inmate trust account or a current financial affidavit, Bekendam's motion is DENIED. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Rebecca Rutherford on 10/8/2020) (ctf)
October 5, 2020 Filing 18 MOTION to Extend Time filed by Stephanie Bekendam. (oyh)
September 30, 2020 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:14. Re-mailed Wed Sep 30 09:12:22 CDT 2020 (crt)
September 29, 2020 Filing 17 Mail returned as undeliverable. #14 Order And Notice of Deficiency, received back from Stephanie Bekendam as Return to Sender - Not Deliverable as Addressed - Unable to Forward. Address updated from last filed document, #15 . New address: 405 W 28th St. Bryan, TX 77803. The current document has been re-mailed. (jmg)
September 22, 2020 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:16. Tue Sep 22 14:51:59 CDT 2020 (crt)
September 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER: Plaintiff's first "Notice of Address Change" (ECF No. #7 ), to the extent it seeks an extension of time or the appointment of counsel, is DENIED without prejudice. Plaintiff's "Motion to Compel Discovery" (ECF No. #8 ) is DENIED without prejudice. The Court ORDERS Bekendamwithin 30 days of the date of this Orderto file a 6-month inmate trust account statement or a current financial affidavit. The Court SEVERS Bekendam's habeas claims from this civil rights action filed under 1983. The Court directs the Clerk of Court to open a new habeas case pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2254 (nature of suit 530), for the now- severed claims and file a copy of this order in that case. ECF Numbers 9 through 13 should be docketed in the new case, and the new case should be assigned to the same District Judge and Magistrate Judge as the instant civil rights case. Finally, all future pleadings related to the severed habeas matter should be filed in the new case. (Civil case 3:20-cv-2918-K opened) (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Rebecca Rutherford on 9/22/2020) (axm)
September 21, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE of Change of Address for Pro Se litigant Stephanie Bekendam. New address: 405 W 28th St. Bryan, TX 77803. (jmg)
September 17, 2020 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:14. Thu Sep 17 15:35:55 CDT 2020 (crt)
September 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Order and Notice of Deficiency: Stephanie Bekendam must address the following deficiency: Include a certified statement of the balance in Plaintiffs inmate trust account for the six-month period preceding the filing of the complaint. Failure to comply with this order may lead to dismissal for failure to prosecute pursuant to FRCvP 41(b). Deadline to cure the deficiency is 30 days. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Rebecca Rutherford on 9/16/2020) (jmg)
September 14, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION to Compel Discovery filed by Stephanie Bekendam. (oyh)
September 9, 2020 Filing 12 Motion for Judgement Nunc Pro Tunc in Support re #11 Application For Writ of Lawsuit 2254 Mandamus filed by Stephanie Bekendam. (Attachments: #1 Additional Page(s), #2 Additional Page(s), #3 Additional Page(s), #4 Additional Page(s)) (jmg)
September 9, 2020 Filing 11 Application For Writ of Lawsuit 2254 Mandamus filed by Stephanie Bekendam. (jmg)
September 9, 2020 Filing 10 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Stephanie Bekendam. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (jmg)
September 9, 2020 Filing 9 Application in Demand for Attorney filed by Stephanie Bekendam. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (jmg)
September 9, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION to Compel Discovery filed by Stephanie Bekendam. (jmg)
September 9, 2020 Filing 7 Notice of Address Change with Request for Appointment of Counsel and MOTION to Extend Time filed by Stephanie Bekendam. (jmg) Modified text on 9/15/2020 (jmg).
September 9, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis with certificate of trust account filed by Stephanie Bekendam. (jmg)
August 28, 2020 Filing 5 Public correspondence filed with NOTICE of changed of address change effective 9/14/2020 received from Stephanie Bekendam. (mjr)
August 21, 2020 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:4. Fri Aug 21 11:59:35 CDT 2020 (crt)
August 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order and Notice of Deficiency: Stephanie Bekendam must address the following deficiency: The $400 fee has not been paid nor has a proper request to proceed in forma pauperis been submitted. Failure to comply with this order may lead to dismissal for failure to prosecute pursuant to FRCvP 41(b). Deadline to cure the deficiency is 30 days. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Rebecca Rutherford on 8/21/2020) (Attachments: #1 IFP Form) (axm)
August 20, 2020 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:1, 2. Thu Aug 20 08:29:21 CDT 2020 (crt)
August 19, 2020 Filing 3 COMPLAINT against Criminal Justice Board of Pardons and Paroles, State of Texas filed by Stephanie Bekendam. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (jmg)
August 19, 2020 Filing 2 Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party. (jmg)
August 19, 2020 Filing 1 New Case Notes: A filing fee has not been paid. CASREF case referral set and case referred to Magistrate Judge Rutherford (see Special Order 3). Initiating documents received by mail. No prior sanctions found. (For court use only - links to the #national and #circuit indexes.) Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Rutherford). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (jmg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bekendam et al v. State of Texas et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephanie Bekendam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Criminal Justice Board of Pardons and Paroles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Texas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Tyler Layne Bekendam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?