Roberson v. Creuzot
Petitioner: Billy John Roberson
Respondent: John Creuzot
Case Number: 3:2020cv02310
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Sam A Lindsay
Referring Judge: Barbara M G Lynn
2 Judge: Irma Carrillo Ramirez
3 Judge: Rebecca Rutherford
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Pet/Habeas Corpus: General
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 14, 2020 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:11. Mon Sep 14 08:28:27 CDT 2020 (crt)
September 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Findings, Conclusions, and Recommendation re: the #8 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus Under 28 U.S.C. Section 2241. Because it challenges a conviction and sentence, it should be construed as a successive petition under 28 U.S.C. 2254 and DISMISSED without prejudice for lack of jurisdiction. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Irma Carrillo Ramirez on 9/14/2020) (mcrd)
September 1, 2020 Filing 10 Petitioner's Petition for Presumption of Innocence filed by Billy John Roberson. (oyh)
August 24, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Proposed Decree of Judgment Vacating Criminal Conviction filed by Billy John Roberson. (axm)
August 21, 2020 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:7. Fri Aug 21 16:33:58 CDT 2020 (crt)
August 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting the petitioner's #5 Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Irma Carrillo Ramirez on 8/21/2020) (mcrd)
August 20, 2020 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:6. Thu Aug 20 14:39:26 CDT 2020 (crt)
August 19, 2020 Filing 8 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Billy John Roberson. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Originally filed in case 3:18-cv-2535 as docket entry #29) (axm)
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: Before the Court is the plaintiff's Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus Under 28 U.S.C Section 2241, received in this closed civil non-habeas case on 8/18/2020 (doc. 29, 3:18-cv-2535-L). The Clerk of the Court is DIRECTED to open a new habeas case, file the petition in that new case, file a copy of this order in that case, and directly assign the new case to the same district judge and magistrate judge as in this case. Case reassigned to Judge Sam A. Lindsay and Magistrate Judge Irma Carrillo Ramirez for all further proceedings. Chief Judge Barbara M. G. Lynn, Magistrate Judge Rebecca Rutherford no longer assigned to case. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Irma Carrillo Ramirez on 8/19/2020) (axm)
August 19, 2020 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:1,2. Wed Aug 19 15:59:56 CDT 2020 (crt)
August 19, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Billy John Roberson. (oyh)
August 19, 2020 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT by Billy John Roberson. (oyh)
August 19, 2020 Filing 3 AMENDED PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Billy John Roberson. (oyh) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 8/18/2020 Correspondence, #2 Exhibit(s) 8-17-2020 Correspondence). Modified text on 8/21/2020 per #6 Order(axm).
August 19, 2020 Filing 2 Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party. (oyh)
August 19, 2020 Filing 1 New Case Notes: A filing fee has not been paid. CASREF case referral set and case referred to Magistrate Judge Rutherford (see Special Order 3). Case received over counter/electronically. No prior sanctions found. (For court use only - links to the #national and #circuit indexes.) Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Rutherford). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (oyh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Roberson v. Creuzot
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Billy John Roberson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: John Creuzot
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?