Kincaid v. Health Care Service Corporation
Plaintiff: Sam D Kincaid
Defendant: Health Care Service Corporation a Mutual Legal Reserve Company doing business as Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Texas and Health Care Service Corporation a division of Health Care Service Corporation doing business as Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Texas
Case Number: 3:2020cv02311
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Sidney A Fitzwater
Nature of Suit: Contract: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 29, 2020 Status Report due by 11/2/2020 set per #11 Order. (svc)
September 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: Having considered the parties' 9/21/2020 joint scheduling proposal, the court has decided to defer entering a scheduling order until the parties have had an opportunity to explore settlement. If, by 11/2/2020, the parties have not reached a settlement in principle, the court will enter a scheduling order based on its consideration of the parties' 9/21/2020 joint scheduling proposal. The parties must notify the court of the settlement status of the case no later than 11/2/2020. (Ordered by Senior Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 9/29/2020) (ctf)
September 21, 2020 Filing 10 Proposal for contents of scheduling and discovery order by Sam D Kincaid. (Rubarts, Bobby)
September 9, 2020 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Sam D Kincaid. (Rubarts, Bobby)
August 25, 2020 Filing 8 AMENDED DOCUMENT by Health Care Service Corporation. Amendment to #1 Notice of Removal,,,,,. . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B, #3 Exhibit(s) C, #4 Exhibit(s) D, #5 Exhibit(s) E, #6 Exhibit(s) F, #7 Exhibit(s) G, #8 Exhibit(s) H, #9 Exhibit(s) I, #10 Exhibit(s) J, #11 Exhibit(s) K, #12 Exhibit(s) L, #13 Cover Sheet, #14 Cover Sheet Supplement) (Blount, Cheryl)
August 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #6 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Peter J. Chassman. Important Reminder: Unless excused for cause, an attorney who is not an ECF user must register within 14 days of the date the attorney appears in a case pursuant to LR 5.1(f) and LCrR 49.2(g). (Ordered by Senior Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 8/24/2020) (Senior Judge Sidney A Fitzwater)
August 24, 2020 Filing 6 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing (Filing fee $100; Receipt number 0539-11107967) filed by Health Care Service Corporation (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Proposed Order)Attorney Peter J Chassman added to party Health Care Service Corporation(pty:dft) (Chassman, Peter)
August 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: No later than 9/8/2020, defendant must file an amended notice of removal that alleges diversity of citizenship, in conformity with 28 U.S.C. 1332; otherwise, this action will be remanded to state court. (Ordered by Senior Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 8/24/2020) (jmg)
August 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order for Scheduling Order Proposal: Proposed Scheduling Order due by 9/21/2020. (Ordered by Senior Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 8/24/2020) (jmg)
August 19, 2020 Filing 3 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Rutherford). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (jmg)
August 19, 2020 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Health Care Service Corporation, a mutual legal reserve company. (Blount, Cheryl)
August 19, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH JURY DEMAND filed by Health Care Service Corporation. (Filing fee $400; receipt number 0539-11093366) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B, #3 Exhibit(s) C, #4 Exhibit(s) D, #5 Exhibit(s) E, #6 Exhibit(s) F, #7 Exhibit(s) G, #8 Exhibit(s) H, #9 Exhibit(s) I, #10 Exhibit(s) J, #11 Exhibit(s) K, #12 Exhibit(s) L, #13 Cover Sheet, #14 Cover Sheet Supplement) (Blount, Cheryl) Modified text on 8/19/2020 (jmg).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kincaid v. Health Care Service Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Health Care Service Corporation a Mutual Legal Reserve Company doing business as Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Texas
Represented By: Cheryl Lee Blount
Represented By: Scott T Williams
Represented By: Martin James Bishop
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Health Care Service Corporation a division of Health Care Service Corporation doing business as Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Texas
Represented By: Cheryl Lee Blount
Represented By: Scott T Williams
Represented By: Martin James Bishop
Represented By: Peter J Chassman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sam D Kincaid
Represented By: Bobby M Rubarts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?