DSL Extension LLC v. Planet Technologies Inc
Plaintiff: DSL Extension LLC
Defendant: Planet Technologies Inc
Case Number: 3:2020cv02313
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Sidney A Fitzwater
Referring Judge: Ed Kinkeade
Nature of Suit: Property Rights: Patent
Cause of Action: 28:1338
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 16, 2020 Filing 12 Report to Patent/Trademark Office of Notice of Dismissal. Form AO 120 e-mailed to notice_of_suit@uspto.gov. (ykp)
September 16, 2020 Civil Case Terminated pursuant to the Notice of Dismissal. The clerk will prepare the final Report to the Patent/Trademark or Copyright Office. (chmb)
September 16, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Dismissal filed by DSL Extension LLC (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Rabicoff, Isaac)
September 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ELECTRONIC ORDER: The Court has attempted to contact Isaac Philip Rabicoff, counsel for Plaintiff(s) to clarify his status as residing and practicing in the Northern District of Texas. The address Mr. Rabicoff provided is a mailbox center (Eagle Postal Center). This does not satisfy Local Rule 85.10 which requires local counsel where the attorney appearing does not reside or maintain his principal office in this District. The Court ORDERS Mr. Rabicoff to update his information in CM to reflect his true principal place of business within 24 hours of this Order. The Court also orders local counsel to make an appearance within 7 days from the date of this Order. In light of Mr. Rabicoff's attempt to circumvent this Court's local rules, the Court will not entertain a motion for leave to be exempt from LR 85.10. (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 9/15/2020) (chmb)
August 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Ed Kinkeade for all further proceedings. Chief Judge Barbara M. G. Lynn no longer assigned to case. (Ordered by Chief Judge Barbara M. G. Lynn on 8/21/2020) (oyh)
August 20, 2020 Chief Judge Barbara M. G. Lynn reassigned as presiding judge per Special Order 3-287. Senior Judge Sidney A Fitzwater no longer assigned to the case. (ctf)
August 19, 2020 Filing 8 Report to Patent/Trademark Office of Initiating Document. Form AO 120 e-mailed to notice_of_suit@uspto.gov. (jmg)
August 19, 2020 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Planet Technologies Inc. (jmg)
August 19, 2020 Filing 6 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Rutherford). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (jmg)
August 19, 2020 Filing 5 Request for Clerk to issue Summons filed by DSL Extension LLC. (Rabicoff, Isaac)
August 19, 2020 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by DSL Extension LLC. (Rabicoff, Isaac)
August 19, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Isaac Philip Rabicoff on behalf of DSL Extension LLC. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Rabicoff, Isaac)
August 19, 2020 Filing 2 ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS - Cover Sheet to #1 Complaint by Plaintiff DSL Extension LLC. (Rabicoff, Isaac) Modified text on 8/19/2020 (jmg).
August 19, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against Planet Technologies, Inc. filed by DSL Extension LLC. (Filing fee $400; Receipt number 0539-11093576) Plaintiff will submit summons(es) for issuance. In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1, #2 Exhibit(s) 2) (Rabicoff, Isaac)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DSL Extension LLC v. Planet Technologies Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DSL Extension LLC
Represented By: Isaac Philip Rabicoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Planet Technologies Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?