Hassell v. C R Bard Inc et al
Plaintiff: Paul Hassell
Defendant: McKesson Corporation, C R Bard Inc, Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated and Does 1 through 100 Inclusive
Case Number: 3:2020cv02354
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Office: Dallas Office
Presiding Judge: Karen Gren Scholer
Nature of Suit: Torts/Pers Inj: Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 20, 2020 Case transferred from NDTX has been opened in Eastern District of Missouri as case number 4:20-cv-01113. (jmg)
August 19, 2020 Interdistrict Transfer to Eastern District of Missouri, St. Louis Division; notice sent via email. All documents available electronically. If receiving court cannot upload, documents are available from PACER (record does not contain restricted documents). Counsel advised to file future documents in Eastern District of Missouri, St. Louis Division. (mjr)
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting #19 Unopposed Motion to Sever and Transfer Venue of Out-of-State Plaintiffs' Cases. The Court directs the Clerk of the Court to sever and transfer this action as follows: a. Plaintiff Terry Alderman's case be severed and transferred to the Winston Salem Division of the Middle District of North Carolina (Civil case 3:20-cv-2351-S opened); b. Plaintiff Paula Best's case be severed and transferred to the Panama City Division of the Northern District of Florida (Civil case 3:20-cv-2352-S opened); c. Plaintiff Dennis Gordon's case be severed and transferred to the Boston Division of the District of Massachusetts (Civil case 3:20-cv-2353-S opened); d. Plaintiff Paul Hassell's case be severed and transferred to the St. Louis Division of the Eastern District of Missouri (Civil case 3:20-cv-2354-S opened); e. Plaintiff Jennie Hill's case be severed and transferred to the Durham Division of the Middle District of North Carolina (Civil case 3:20-cv-2355-S opened); f. Plaintiff Melinda Karper's case be severed and transferred to the Harrisburg Division of the Middle District of Pennsylvania (Civil case 3:20-cv-2356-S opened); g. Plaintiff Lorenzo McCaskill's case be severed and transferred to the Greenbelt Division of the District of Maryland (Civil case 3:20-cv-2357-S opened); h. Plaintiff James Shelvin's case be severed and transferred to the New York Division of the Southern District of New York (Civil case 3:20-cv-2358-S opened); i. Plaintiff Steven Templeton's case be severed and transferred to the Topeka Division of the District of Kansas (Civil case 3:20-cv-2361-S opened). Plaintiff Valerie Lopez is the sole plaintiff with any connection to this forum. Accordingly, she shall remain in the Dallas Division of the Northern District of Texas. (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 8/19/2020) (axm)
August 14, 2020 Filing 22 RESPONSE filed by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Inc re: #19 MOTION to Sever and Transfer Venue of Out of State Plaintiffs' Cases (Matthews, Melissa)
July 30, 2020 Filing 21 Appendix in Support filed by Terry Alderman, Paula Best, Dennis Gordon, Paul Hassell, Jennie Hill, Melinda Karper, Valerie Lopez, Lorenzo McCaskill, James Shevlin, Steven Templeton re #19 MOTION to Sever and Transfer Venue of Out of State Plaintiffs' Cases Including Declaration and Exhibits (Schulte, Steven)
July 30, 2020 Filing 20 Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by Terry Alderman, Paula Best, Dennis Gordon, Paul Hassell, Jennie Hill, Melinda Karper, Valerie Lopez, Lorenzo McCaskill, James Shevlin, Steven Templeton re #19 MOTION to Sever and Transfer Venue of Out of State Plaintiffs' Cases (Schulte, Steven)
July 30, 2020 Filing 19 MOTION to Sever and Transfer Venue of Out of State Plaintiffs' Cases filed by Terry Alderman, Paula Best, Dennis Gordon, Paul Hassell, Jennie Hill, Melinda Karper, Valerie Lopez, Lorenzo McCaskill, James Shevlin, Steven Templeton (Schulte, Steven)
July 30, 2020 Filing 18 RESPONSE filed by Terry Alderman, Paula Best, Dennis Gordon, Paul Hassell, Jennie Hill, Melinda Karper, Valerie Lopez, Lorenzo McCaskill, James Shevlin, Steven Templeton re: #3 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , #8 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Schulte, Steven)
July 22, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE of Filing Completed Forms for Each Plaintiff re: #15 Order, filed by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Inc, McKesson Corporation (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s)) (Matthews, Melissa)
July 21, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE of Filing Completed Forms For Each Plaintiff filed by Terry Alderman, Paula Best, Dennis Gordon, Paul Hassell, Jennie Hill, Melinda Karper, Valerie Lopez, Lorenzo McCaskill, James Shevlin, Steven Templeton (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s)) (Schulte, Steven)
July 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER: To assist the Court, counsel for all parties shall complete the form attached hereto as Exhibit A for each Plaintiff in this action. The parties shall file their completed forms on or before 7/22/2020. (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 7/16/2020) (oyh)
July 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ELECTRONIC ORDER: The Court grants the parties' Agreed Motion for Extension of Time. (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 7/1/2020) (ctf)
June 29, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to #3 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , #8 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Terry Alderman, Paula Best, Dennis Gordon, Paul Hassell, Jennie Hill, Melinda Karper, Valerie Lopez, Lorenzo McCaskill, James Shevlin, Steven Templeton (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Schulte, Steven)
June 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. The above-numbered case is hereby transferred to the docket of the Honorable Judge Karen Gren Scholer and shall henceforth carry the suffix letter "S." Judge Ada Brown no longer assigned to case. (Ordered by Judge Ada Brown on 6/24/2020) (ykp)
June 16, 2020 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by McKesson Corporation. (Jarreau, Jordan)
June 16, 2020 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) with Jury Demand filed by McKesson Corporation (Jarreau, Jordan)
June 16, 2020 Filing 9 Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by McKesson Corporation re #8 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Jarreau, Jordan)
June 16, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by McKesson Corporation (Jarreau, Jordan)
June 16, 2020 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) with Jury Demand filed by Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc, C R Bard Inc (Jarreau, Jordan)
June 10, 2020 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by C R Bard Inc identifying Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate Becton, Dickinson and Company for C R Bard Inc. (Jarreau, Jordan) Modified corporate parent on 6/11/2020 (mla).
June 10, 2020 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc. (Jarreau, Jordan)
June 9, 2020 Filing 4 Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc, C R Bard Inc re #3 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Jarreau, Jordan)
June 9, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc, C R Bard Inc (Jarreau, Jordan)
June 9, 2020 Filing 2 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Ramirez). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (hml)
June 9, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH JURY DEMAND filed by C R Bard Inc, Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc. (Filing fee $400; receipt number 0539-10901357) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Cover Sheet Supplement, #3 Exhibit(s) A - Portion of REACH Agreement (redacted), #4 Exhibit(s) B - McKesson page, #5 Exhibit(s) C - 8-30-16 Romney, Kim Deposition, #6 Exhibit(s) D Index of State Docs, #7 Exhibit(s) D-1 - 2020-06-04 State Court Docket, #8 Exhibit(s) D-2 - 2020-04-06 Plaintiffs' Original Petition, #9 Exhibit(s) D-3 - 2020-04-06 Civil Case Info. Sheet, #10 Exhibit(s) D-4 - 2020-04-06 Jury Demand, #11 Exhibit(s) D-5 - 2020-04-06 Citation Issued - Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc., #12 Exhibit(s) D-6 - 2020-04-06 Citiation Issued - C. R. Bard, Inc., #13 Exhibit(s) D-7 - 2020-04-06 Citation Issued - McKesson, #14 Exhibit(s) D-8 - 2020-05-06 Return of Service - McKesson, #15 Exhibit(s) D-9 - 2020-05-22 Return of Service - C.R. Bard, #16 Exhibit(s) D-10 - 2020-06-04 Return of Service - Bard Peripheral) (Jarreau, Jordan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hassell v. C R Bard Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKesson Corporation
Represented By: Melissa Dorman Matthews
Represented By: Jordan E Jarreau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C R Bard Inc
Represented By: Melissa Dorman Matthews
Represented By: Jordan E Jarreau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated
Represented By: Melissa Dorman Matthews
Represented By: Jordan E Jarreau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 100 Inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Hassell
Represented By: Darren McDowell
Represented By: Eric Martin Przybysz
Represented By: Steven Scott Schulte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?