Wedge v. C R Bard Inc et al
Plaintiff: Quinten Wedge
Defendant: Does 1 through 100 Inclusive, McKesson Corporation, C R Bard Inc and Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc
Case Number: 3:2020cv02362
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Office: Dallas Office
Presiding Judge: Karen Gren Scholer
Nature of Suit: Torts/Pers Inj: Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 20, 2020 Case transferred from NDTX has been opened in the District of Kansas as case number 2:20-cv-02412. (ykp)
August 19, 2020 Interdistrict Transfer to District of Kansas, Kansas City Division; notice sent via email. All documents available electronically. If receiving court cannot upload, documents are available from PACER (record does not contain restricted documents). Counsel advised to file future documents in District of Kansas, Kansas City Division. (mjr)
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting #19 Unopposed Motion to Sever and Transfer Venue of Out-of-State Plaintiffs' Cases. The Court directs the Clerk of the Court to sever and transfer this action as follows: a. Plaintiff Patricia Britt's case be severed and transferred to the Sioux City Division of the Northern District of Iowa (Civil case 3:20-cv-2342-S opened); b. Plaintiff Jessica Burge's case be severed and transferred to the Hattiesburg Division of the Southern District of Mississippi (Civil case 3:20-cv-2343-S opened); c. Plaintiff Lori Finn's case be severed and transferred to the Rochester Division of the Western District of New York (Civil case 3:20-cv-2344-S opened); d. Plaintiff Joseph Ingram's case be severed and transferred to the Jackson Division of the Southern District of Mississippi (Civil case 3:20-cv-2345-S opened); e. Plaintiff James Jones's case be severed and transferred to the Richmond Division of the Eastern District of Virginia (Civil case 3:20-cv-2346-S opened); f. Plaintiff Barbara Lawrence's case be severed and transferred to the Detroit Division of the Eastern District of Michigan (Civil case 3:20-cv-2347-S opened); g. Plaintiff John Reeves's case be severed and transferred to the Springfield Division of the Western District of Missouri (Civil case 3:20-cv-2349-S opened); h. Plaintiff Venette Terry's case be severed and transferred to the Bay City Division of the Eastern District of Michigan (Civil case 3:20-cv-2350-S opened); i. Plaintiff Quinten Wedge's case be severed and transferred to the Kansas City Division of the District of Kansas (Civil case 3:20-cv-2362-S opened). Plaintiff Catherine Simpson is the sole plaintiff with any connection to this forum. Accordingly, she shall remain in the Dallas Division of the Northern District of Texas. (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 8/19/2020) (axm)
August 14, 2020 Filing 22 RESPONSE filed by Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc, C R Bard Inc re: #19 MOTION to Sever and Transfer Venue of Out of State Plaintiffs' Cases (Matthews, Melissa)
July 31, 2020 Filing 21 Appendix in Support filed by Patricia Britt, Jessica Burge, Lori Finn, Joseph Ingram, James Jones, Barbara Lawrence, John Reeves, Catherine Simpson, Venette Terry, Quinten Wedge re #19 MOTION to Sever and Transfer Venue of Out of State Plaintiffs' Cases Including Declaration and Exhibits (Schulte, Steven)
July 31, 2020 Filing 20 Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by Patricia Britt, Jessica Burge, Lori Finn, Joseph Ingram, James Jones, Barbara Lawrence, John Reeves, Catherine Simpson, Venette Terry, Quinten Wedge re #19 MOTION to Sever and Transfer Venue of Out of State Plaintiffs' Cases (Schulte, Steven)
July 31, 2020 Filing 19 MOTION to Sever and Transfer Venue of Out of State Plaintiffs' Cases filed by Patricia Britt, Jessica Burge, Lori Finn, Joseph Ingram, James Jones, Barbara Lawrence, John Reeves, Catherine Simpson, Venette Terry, Quinten Wedge (Schulte, Steven)
July 31, 2020 Filing 18 RESPONSE filed by Patricia Britt, Jessica Burge, Lori Finn, Joseph Ingram, James Jones, Barbara Lawrence, John Reeves, Catherine Simpson, Venette Terry, Quinten Wedge re: #8 MOTION to Dismiss the Out-of-State Plaintiffs Claims for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction, #2 MOTION to Dismiss the Out-of-State Plaintiffs Claims for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction (Schulte, Steven)
July 22, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE of Filing Completed Forms for Each Plaintiff re: #15 Order, filed by Patricia Britt, Jessica Burge, Lori Finn, Joseph Ingram, James Jones, Barbara Lawrence, John Reeves, Catherine Simpson, Venette Terry, Quinten Wedge (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Completed Plaintiff Forms) (Schulte, Steven)
July 21, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE of Filing Completed Forms for Each Plaintiff filed by Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc, C R Bard Inc, McKesson Corporation (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A - Responses) (Matthews, Melissa)
July 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER: To assist the Court, counsel for all parties shall complete the form attached hereto as Exhibit A for each Plaintiff in this action. The parties shall file their completed forms on or before July 22, 2020. (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 7/16/2020) (ndt)
July 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ELECTRONIC ORDER: The Court grants the parties' Agreed Motion for Extension of Time. (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 7/1/2020) (ctf)
June 29, 2020 Filing 13 Agreed MOTION to Extend Time Resp/Reply filed by Patricia Britt, Jessica Burge, Lori Finn, Joseph Ingram, James Jones, Barbara Lawrence, John Reeves, Catherine Simpson, Venette Terry, Quinten Wedge (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Przybysz, Eric)
June 17, 2020 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by McKesson Corporation. (Junek, Jessica) (Main Document 12 replaced to flatten image on 6/17/2020) (dsr).
June 17, 2020 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) with Jury Demand filed by Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc, C R Bard Inc (Junek, Jessica)
June 17, 2020 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) with Jury Demand filed by McKesson Corporation (Junek, Jessica)
June 17, 2020 Filing 9 Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by McKesson Corporation re #8 MOTION to Dismiss the Out-of-State Plaintiffs Claims for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction (Junek, Jessica)
June 17, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss the Out-of-State Plaintiffs Claims for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction filed by McKesson Corporation Attorney Jessica Junek added to party McKesson Corporation(pty:dft) (Junek, Jessica)
June 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: Case reassigned to Judge Karen Gren Scholer for all further proceedings. Chief Judge Barbara M. G. Lynn no longer assigned to case. (Ordered by Chief Judge Barbara M. G. Lynn on 6/12/2020) (ndt)
June 10, 2020 Filing 6 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Ramirez). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (hml)
June 10, 2020 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc.. (Junek, Jessica)
June 10, 2020 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by C. R. Bard, Inc.. (Junek, Jessica)
June 10, 2020 Filing 3 Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc., C. R. Bard, Inc. re #2 MOTION to Dismiss the Out-of-State Plaintiffs Claims for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction (Junek, Jessica)
June 10, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION to Dismiss the Out-of-State Plaintiffs Claims for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction filed by Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc., C. R. Bard, Inc. (Junek, Jessica)
June 10, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH JURY DEMAND filed by C. R. Bard, Inc., Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc.. (Filing fee $400; receipt number 0539-10905573) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Cover Sheet Supplement, #3 Exhibit(s) A - Portion of REACH Agreement (redacted), #4 Exhibit(s) B - McKesson, #5 Exhibit(s) C - 8-30-16 Romney, Kim Deposition, #6 Exhibit(s) D - Index of State Court Documents, #7 Exhibit(s) D-1 State Court Docket Sheet, #8 Exhibit(s) D-2 Plaintiffs' Original Petition, #9 Exhibit(s) D-3 Civil Case Info Sheet, #10 Exhibit(s) D-4 Jury Demand, #11 Exhibit(s) D-5 Citation Issued Bard Peripheral, #12 Exhibit(s) D-6 Citation Issued C.R. Bard Inc., #13 Exhibit(s) D-7 Citation Issued McKesson, #14 Exhibit(s) D-8 Affidavit of Service McKinnson, #15 Exhibit(s) D-9 Return of Service - C. R. Bard, #16 Exhibit(s) D-10 Return of Service - Bard Peripheral) (Junek, Jessica)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wedge v. C R Bard Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 100 Inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKesson Corporation
Represented By: Jessica Junek
Represented By: Melissa Dorman Matthews
Represented By: Jordan E Jarreau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C R Bard Inc
Represented By: Jessica Junek
Represented By: Melissa Dorman Matthews
Represented By: Jordan E Jarreau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc
Represented By: Jessica Junek
Represented By: Melissa Dorman Matthews
Represented By: Jordan E Jarreau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Quinten Wedge
Represented By: Steven Scott Schulte
Represented By: Eric Martin Przybysz
Represented By: Darren McDowell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?