Tsur-Tsar et al v. Chase Bank USA NA
Plaintiff: Stefani Tsur-Tsar and Peter Buhay
Defendant: Chase Bank USA, NA and Chase Bank USA NA
Case Number: 3:2020cv02368
Filed: August 20, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Sam A Lindsay
Nature of Suit: Torts/Pers Prop: Truth in Lending
Cause of Action: 15:1640
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time. Accordingly, the deadline for Defendant Chase Bank to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint is 10/7/2020. (Ordered by Judge Sam A. Lindsay on 9/15/2020) (chmb)
September 15, 2020 Filing 6 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Chase Bank USA NA (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Attorney Helen Guadalupe Mosothoane added to party Chase Bank USA NA(pty:dft) (Mosothoane, Helen)
August 21, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Chase Bank USA NA. (oyh)
August 20, 2020 Filing 4 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Horan). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (oyh)
August 20, 2020 Filing 3 ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to #1 Complaint by Plaintiff Peter Buhay. (Campbell, Sharon) (Civil Cover Sheet) Modified docket text on 8/21/2020 (oyh).
August 20, 2020 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Peter Buhay. (Campbell, Sharon)
August 20, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against All Plaintiffs filed by Peter Buhay. (Filing fee $400; Receipt number 0539-11097543) Clerk to issue summons(es). In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Campbell, Sharon)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tsur-Tsar et al v. Chase Bank USA NA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stefani Tsur-Tsar
Represented By: Sharon K Campbell,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peter Buhay
Represented By: Sharon K Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chase Bank USA, NA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chase Bank USA NA
Represented By: Gregg D Stevens
Represented By: Helen Guadalupe Mosothoane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?