Sullivan v. C R Bard Inc et al
Plaintiff: Jimmy Sullivan
Defendant: Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, McKesson Corporation, C R Bard Inc and Does 1 through 100 Inclusive
Case Number: 3:2020cv02376
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Office: Dallas Office
Presiding Judge: Karen Gren Scholer
Nature of Suit: Torts/Pers Inj: Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 26, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 26, 2020 Case transferred from NDTX has been opened in Eastern District of Tennessee as case number 1:20-cv-00247. (mjr)
August 19, 2020 Interdistrict Transfer to Eastern District of Tennessee, Chattanooga Division; notice sent via email. All documents available electronically. If receiving court cannot upload, documents are available from PACER (record does not contain restricted documents). Counsel advised to file future documents in Eastern District of Tennessee, Chattanooga Division. (axm)
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting #17 Motion to Sever and Transfer Venue of Out-of-State Plaintiffs' Cases. The Court directs the Clerk of the Court to sever and transfer this action as follows: a. Plaintiff Edna Barnes's case be severed and transferred to the Jackson Division of the Western District of Tennessee (Civil case 3:20-cv-2370); b. Plaintiff Joland Brown's case be severed and transferred to the New Orleans Division of the Eastern District of Louisiana (Civil case 3:20-cv-2371 opened); c. Plaintiff Kenwann Foster's case be severed and transferred to the Atlanta Division of the Northern District of Georgia (Civil case 3:20-cv-2372 opened); d. Plaintiff Duron Hebron's case be severed and transferred to the Chicago Division of the Northern District of Illinois (Civil case 3:20-cv-2373 opened); e. Plaintiff Tameka McClamy's case be severed and transferred to the Philadelphia Division of the Eastern District of Pennsylvania (Civil case 3:20-cv-2374 opened); f. Plaintiff Elizabeth Olson's case be severed and transferred to the Madison Division of the Western District of Wisconsin (Civil case 3:20-cv-2375 opened); g. Plaintiff Jimmy Sullivan's case be severed and transferred to the Chattanooga Division of the Eastern District of Tennessee (Civil case 3:20-cv-2376 opened); h. Plaintiff Krista Umholtz's case be severed and transferred to the Tampa Division of the Middle District of Florida (Civil case 3:20-cv-2377 opened); i. Plaintiff Lunell Will's case be severed and transferred to the Benton Division of the Southern District of Illinois (Civil case 3:20-cv-2378 opened). Plaintiff Carlos Martinez is the sole plaintiff with any connection to this forum. Accordingly, he shall remain in the Dallas Division of the Northern District of Texas. (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 8/19/2020) (jmg)
August 14, 2020 Filing 22 RESPONSE filed by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Inc re: #17 MOTION to Sever and Transfer Venue of Out of State Plaintiffs' Cases (Matthews, Melissa)
August 8, 2020 Filing 21 NOTICE of Filing Completed Forms for Each Plaintiff re: #20 Order, filed by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Inc, McKesson Corporation (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Exhibit A) (Matthews, Melissa)
August 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER: To assist the Court, counsel for all parties shall complete the form attached hereto as Exhibit A for each Plaintiff in this action. The parties shall file their completed forms on or before 8/10/2020. (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 8/3/2020) (oyh)
July 30, 2020 Filing 19 Appendix in Support filed by Edna Barnes, Joland Brown, Kenwann Foster, Duron Hebron, Carlos Martinez, Tameka McClamy, Elizabeth Olson, Jimmy Sullivan, Krista Umholtz, Lunell Will re #17 MOTION to Sever and Transfer Venue of Out of State Plaintiffs' Cases Including Declaration and Exhibits (Schulte, Steven)
July 30, 2020 Filing 18 Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by Edna Barnes, Joland Brown, Kenwann Foster, Duron Hebron, Carlos Martinez, Tameka McClamy, Elizabeth Olson, Jimmy Sullivan, Krista Umholtz, Lunell Will re #17 MOTION to Sever and Transfer Venue of Out of State Plaintiffs' Cases (Schulte, Steven)
July 30, 2020 Filing 17 MOTION to Sever and Transfer Venue of Out of State Plaintiffs' Cases filed by Edna Barnes, Joland Brown, Kenwann Foster, Duron Hebron, Carlos Martinez, Tameka McClamy, Elizabeth Olson, Jimmy Sullivan, Krista Umholtz, Lunell Will (Schulte, Steven)
July 30, 2020 Filing 16 RESPONSE filed by Edna Barnes, Joland Brown, Kenwann Foster, Duron Hebron, Carlos Martinez, Tameka McClamy, Elizabeth Olson, Jimmy Sullivan, Krista Umholtz, Lunell Will re: #8 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , #3 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Schulte, Steven)
July 22, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE of Filing Completed Forms For Each Plaintiff filed by Edna Barnes, Joland Brown, Kenwann Foster, Duron Hebron, Carlos Martinez, Tameka McClamy, Elizabeth Olson, Jimmy Sullivan, Krista Umholtz, Lunell Will (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s)) (Schulte, Steven)
July 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ELECTRONIC ORDER: The Court grants the parties' Agreed Motion for Extension of Time. (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 7/1/2020) (ctf)
June 29, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to #8 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , #3 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Edna Barnes, Joland Brown, Kenwann Foster, Duron Hebron, Carlos Martinez, Tameka McClamy, Elizabeth Olson, Jimmy Sullivan, Krista Umholtz, Lunell Will (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Schulte, Steven)
June 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ELECTRONIC ORDER: Civil action numbers 3:20-CV-1499-X; 3:20-CV-1469-X; 3:20-CV-1566-X; and 3:20-CV-1500-X are hereby transferred to the docket of the Honorable Karen Gren Scholer and shall henceforth carry the suffix letter "S". (Ordered by Judge Brantley Starr on 6/19/2020) (ctf)
June 16, 2020 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) with Jury Demand filed by McKesson Corporation (Jarreau, Jordan)
June 16, 2020 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by McKesson Corporation. (Jarreau, Jordan)
June 16, 2020 Filing 9 Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by McKesson Corporation re #8 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Jarreau, Jordan)
June 16, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by McKesson Corporation (Jarreau, Jordan)
June 16, 2020 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) with Jury Demand filed by Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc, C R Bard Inc (Jarreau, Jordan)
June 10, 2020 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by C R Bard Inc. (Jarreau, Jordan)
June 10, 2020 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc. (Jarreau, Jordan)
June 9, 2020 Filing 4 Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc, C R Bard Inc re #3 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Jarreau, Jordan)
June 9, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc, C R Bard Inc (Jarreau, Jordan)
June 9, 2020 Filing 2 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Toliver). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (hml)
June 9, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH JURY DEMAND filed by C R Bard Inc, Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc. (Filing fee $400; receipt number 0539-10900935) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Cover Sheet Supplement, #3 Exhibit(s) A - Portion of REACH Agreement (redacted), #4 Exhibit(s) B - McKesson page, #5 Exhibit(s) C - 8-30-16 Romney, Kim Deposition, #6 Exhibit(s) D Index of State Docs, #7 Exhibit(s) D-1 2020-06-04 State Court Docket, #8 Exhibit(s) D-2 2020-04-06 Original Petition, #9 Exhibit(s) D-3 2020-04-06 Jury Demand, #10 Exhibit(s) D-4 2020-04-06 Citation Issued - Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc., #11 Exhibit(s) D-5 2020-04-06 Citation Issued - C.R. Bard, Inc., #12 Exhibit(s) D-6 2020-04-06 Citiation Issued - McKesson Corp, #13 Exhibit(s) D-7 2020-04-06 Civil Case Info Sheet, #14 Exhibit(s) D-8 2020-05-06 Return of Service - McKesson, #15 Exhibit(s) D-9 2020-05-22 Return of Service - C.R. Bard Inc.) (Jarreau, Jordan) Modified on 6/9/2020 (aaa).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sullivan v. C R Bard Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated
Represented By: Melissa Dorman Matthews
Represented By: Jordan E Jarreau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKesson Corporation
Represented By: Melissa Dorman Matthews
Represented By: Jordan E Jarreau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C R Bard Inc
Represented By: Melissa Dorman Matthews
Represented By: Jordan E Jarreau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 100 Inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jimmy Sullivan
Represented By: Darren McDowell
Represented By: Eric Martin Przybysz
Represented By: Steven Scott Schulte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?