Wells v. Youtube LLC
Plaintiff: Kandance A Wells
Defendant: Youtube LLC
Case Number: 3:2020cv02849
Filed: September 14, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Irma Carrillo Ramirez
Referring Judge: Karen Gren Scholer
Nature of Suit: Contract: Contract Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 13, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Youtube LLC identifying Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate Google LLC for Youtube LLC. (Allen, Aden) (Main Document 18 replaced with flattened document on 11/5/2020) (ykp).
November 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 RESPONSE filed by Kandance A Wells re: #10 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint (hml)
October 29, 2020 Opinion or Order ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:14. Thu Oct 29 09:12:38 CDT 2020 (crt)
October 29, 2020 Opinion or Order ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:16. Thu Oct 29 09:02:33 CDT 2020 (crt)
October 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER re: #10 YouTube's Rule 12(b)(6) Motion to Dismiss the Complaint. The plaintiff may file a response by 11/17/2020. The defendant may file a reply by 12/1/2020. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Irma Carrillo Ramirez on 10/28/2020) (mcrd)
October 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #13 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Brian J. Levy. Important Reminder: Unless excused for cause, an attorney who is not an ECF user must register within 14 days of the date the attorney appears in a case pursuant to LR 5.1(f) and LCrR 49.2(g). (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Irma Carrillo Ramirez on 10/28/2020) (Magistrate Judge Irma Carrillo Ramirez)
October 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #12 Defendant YouTube,LLC's Motion to Waive Local Rule 83.10(a). (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Irma Carrillo Ramirez on 10/28/2020) (Magistrate Judge Irma Carrillo Ramirez)
October 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing (Filing fee $100; Receipt number 0539-11306874) filed by Youtube LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A - Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order)Attorney Brian J Levy added to party Youtube LLC(pty:dft) (Levy, Brian)
October 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MOTION to Waive Local Rule 83.10(a) filed by Youtube LLC with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Allen, Aden)
October 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by Youtube LLC re #10 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint (Allen, Aden)
October 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint filed by Youtube LLC (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Attorney Aden M Allen added to party Youtube LLC(pty:dft) (Allen, Aden)
October 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Return of Service Executed on 10/7/2020 as to Youtube LLC re: #5 Summons Issued. (hml)
September 28, 2020 Opinion or Order ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:8. Mon Sep 28 12:37:44 CDT 2020 (crt)
September 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER denying #7 Motion for USMS to serve Summons. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Irma Carrillo Ramirez on 9/25/2020) (Magistrate Judge Irma Carrillo Ramirez)
September 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Request for USMS to serve Summons filed by Kandance A Wells. (oyh)
September 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: Because she paid the fee, the plaintiff is now responsible for serving the defendant with a summons and a copy of the complaint in this case as provided by Rule 4(c) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. If the defendant is not served within 90 days after the filing of the complaint, the action is subject to dismissal without prejudice. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Irma Carrillo Ramirez on 9/16/2020) (mcrd)
September 16, 2020 Opinion or Order ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:6. Wed Sep 16 10:14:25 CDT 2020 (crt)
September 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Youtube LLC. (mjr)
September 15, 2020 Opinion or Order ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:1, 2. Tue Sep 15 10:01:10 CDT 2020 (crt)
September 15, 2020 Opinion or Order ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:5. Tue Sep 15 10:01:39 CDT 2020 (crt)
September 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Request for Clerk to issue Summons filed by Kandance A Wells. (mjr)
September 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 COMPLAINT against Youtube LLC filed by Kandance A Wells. (Filing fee $400; Receipt number DS126578) Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Additional Page(s), #2 Protective Order) (mjr)
September 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party. (mjr)
September 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. CASREF case referral set and case referred to Magistrate Judge Ramirez (see Special Order 3). Initiating documents received by mail. No prior sanctions found. (For court use only - links to the #national and #circuit indexes.) Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Ramirez). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (mjr) Modified on 9/15/2020 (mjr).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wells v. Youtube LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kandance A Wells
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Youtube LLC
Represented By: Aden M Allen
Represented By: Brian J Levy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?