Commodity Futures Trading Commission et al v. TMTE Inc et al
Plaintiff: Office of the Attorney General and State of Florida Office of Financial Regulation, State of Texas, State of Florida, Dana Nessel, South Dakota Department of Labor & Regulation, Douglas M Ommen, Mississippi Secretary of State, Alabama Securities Commission, Arizona Corporation Commission, Commissioner of the Tennessee Department of Commerce and Insurance, Office of the Georgia Secretary of State, State of Maryland, Indiana Securities Commissioner, State of Alaska, West Virginia Securities Commission, State of Wisconsin, Attorney General of the State of New York, Office of the Nevada Secretary of State, Oklahoma Department of Securities, Colorado Securities Commissioner, Washington State Department of Financial Institutions, Commodity Futures Trading Commission, South Carolina Attorney General, State of Delaware, Idaho Department of Finance, Nebraska Department of Banking & Finance, The People of the State of New York, South Carolina Secretary of State, New Mexico Securities Division, California Commissioner of Business Oversight, Office of the Kansas Securities Commissioner, Division of Insurance, Maine Securities Administrator, State of Hawaii, Kentucky Department of Financial Institutions and Securities Enforcement Branch
Defendant: TMTE Inc, Lucas Thomas Erb, Lucas Asher, Luke Asher, Simon Batashvili, Metals.com, Chase Metals LLC, Tower Equity LLC, Barrick Capital Inc and Chase Metals Inc
Receiver: Kelly Crawford
Case Number: 3:2020cv02910
Filed: September 22, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Sam A Lindsay
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Securities/Commodities/Exchange
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 20, 2020 Filing 193 First MOTION for Attorney Fees 3:20-CV-2910-L filed by Kelly Crawford (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Crawford, Kelly)
November 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 192 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #190 Motion to Proceed Without Local Counsel. Accordingly, the court allows Plaintiff, Indiana Securities Commissioner to proceed without designating local counsel in this case. (Ordered by Judge Sam A. Lindsay on 11/18/2020) (chmb)
November 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 191 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #189 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Meredith B. McCutcheon. Important Reminder: Unless excused for cause, an attorney who is not an ECF user must register within 14 days of the date the attorney appears in a case pursuant to LR 5.1(f) and LCrR 49.2(g). (Ordered by Judge Sam A. Lindsay on 11/18/2020) (chmb)
November 18, 2020 Filing 190 MOTION Leave to Proceed without Local Counsel filed by Indiana Securities Commissioner (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (McCutcheon, Meredith)
November 18, 2020 Filing 189 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing (Filing fee $100; Receipt number 0539-11366466) filed by Indiana Securities Commissioner (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order)Attorney Meredith B McCutcheon added to party Indiana Securities Commissioner(pty:pla) (McCutcheon, Meredith)
November 17, 2020 Filing 188 RESPONSE filed by Lucas Thomas Erb re: #177 MOTION for Order Governing The Administration of The Receivership, Procedures Governing The Sale or Abandonment of Personal Property, Notice of Intended Sale and Disposition of Various Items, Fee Application Procedures . (Spencer, Arnold) Modified filer on 11/19/2020 (axm).
November 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 187 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #185 Motion to Proceed Without Local Counsel. Accordingly, the court allows Plaintiff, Indiana Securities Commissioner to proceed without designating local counsel in this case. (Ordered by Judge Sam A. Lindsay on 11/16/2020) (chmb)
November 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 186 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #184 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Patricia Orloff Erdmann. Important Reminder: Unless excused for cause, an attorney who is not an ECF user must register within 14 days of the date the attorney appears in a case pursuant to LR 5.1(f) and LCrR 49.2(g). (Ordered by Judge Sam A. Lindsay on 11/16/2020) (chmb)
November 13, 2020 Filing 185 MOTION for Leave to Proceed without Local Counsel filed by Indiana Securities Commissioner (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Erdmann, Patricia) Modified event text on 11/16/2020 (hml).
November 13, 2020 Filing 184 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing (Filing fee $100; Receipt number 0539-11353443) filed by Indiana Securities Commissioner (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)Attorney Patricia Orloff Erdmann added to party Indiana Securities Commissioner(pty:pla) (Erdmann, Patricia)
November 12, 2020 Filing 182 Court Request for Recusal:The referral judge for this case has been reassigned via random assignment to U.S. Magistrate Judge Renee Harris Toliver. U.S. Magistrate Judge David L. Horan is no longer assigned to the case. (cea)
November 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 183 ORDER: Before the court is Receiver Kelly M. Crawford's ("Receiver") Emergency Motion for "Show Cause" Hearing to Hold Google, Inc. in Civil Contempt ("Motion") (Doc. #180 ), filed 11/6/2020. In light of the court's busy docket and schedule, and the upcoming holidays, the earliest the court can set a hearing, in which it has ample time to hear this Motion, is 12/4/2020 at 09:00 AM. Accordingly, the hearing is set for that date in the undersigned's courtroom. (Ordered by Judge Sam A. Lindsay on 11/10/2020) (ctf)
November 10, 2020 Filing 181 First STATUS REPORT of the Receiver filed by Kelly Crawford. (Crawford, Kelly) Modified text on 11/13/2020 (mla).
November 6, 2020 Filing 180 Emergency MOTION for Order to Show Cause filed by Kelly Crawford (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Exh A, #2 Exhibit(s) Exh B, #3 Exhibit(s) Exh C, #4 Exhibit(s) Exh D, #5 Exhibit(s) Exh E)Attorney Kelly M Crawford added to party Kelly Crawford(pty:rc) (Crawford, Kelly) Modified text on 11/9/2020 (hml).
October 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 179 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #178 Motion to Proceed Without Local Counsel. Accordingly, the court allows Plaintiff State of Maine to proceed without designating local counsel in this case. (Ordered by Judge Sam A. Lindsay on 10/29/2020) (chmb)
October 27, 2020 Filing 177 MOTION for Order Governing The Administration of The Receivership, Procedures Governing The Sale or Abandonment of Personal Property, Notice of Intended Sale and Disposition of Various Items, Fee Application Procedures filed by Kelly Crawford with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Lewis, Peter) Modified docket text on 10/28/2020 (oyh).
October 26, 2020 Filing 176 NOTICE of Withdrawal of re: #175 MOTION for Order to Show Cause filed by Kelly Crawford. (Lewis, Peter)
October 23, 2020 Filing 175 MOTION for Order to Show Cause 3:20-CV-2910-L filed by Kelly Crawford (Attachments: #1 Declaration(s) Kelly Crawford Declaration, #2 Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Lewis, Peter)
October 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 174 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #172 Motion to Proceed Without Local Counsel. Accordingly, the court allows Plaintiff, Office of the Attorney General, State of Florida, Department of Legal Affairs to proceed without designating local counsel in this action. (Ordered by Judge Sam A. Lindsay on 10/23/2020) (chmb)
October 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 173 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #171 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Sarah Cortvriend. Important Reminder: Unless excused for cause, an attorney who is not an ECF user must register within 14 days of the date the attorney appears in a case pursuant to LR 5.1(f) and LCrR 49.2(g). (Ordered by Judge Sam A. Lindsay on 10/23/2020) (chmb)
October 23, 2020 Filing 172 MOTION To Proceed Without Local Counsel re #171 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing (Filing fee $100; Receipt number 0539-11297166) filed by State of Florida (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Cortvriend, Sarah)
October 23, 2020 Filing 171 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing (Filing fee $100; Receipt number 0539-11297166) filed by State of Florida (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Attorney Sarah Cortvriend added to party State of Florida(pty:pla) (Cortvriend, Sarah)
October 22, 2020 Filing 170 ***PLEASE DISREGARD - Blank Form Attached*** CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Simon Batashvili. (Spencer, Arnold) Modified on 10/24/2020 (axm).
October 22, 2020 Filing 169 ***PLEASE DISREGARD - Blank Form Attached*** CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Lucas Thomas Erb. (Spencer, Arnold) Modified on 10/24/2020 (axm).
October 22, 2020 Filing 168 ANSWER to #2 Complaint, filed by Lucas Thomas Erb. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Spencer, Arnold)
October 22, 2020 Filing 167 ANSWER to #2 Complaint, filed by Simon Batashvili. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Spencer, Arnold)
October 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 166 ORDER: As the court granted Plaintiffs #162 Motion to Approve Consent Orders of Preliminary Injunction on October 14, 2020 it vacates the October 27, 2020 hearing for a preliminary injunction. (Ordered by Judge Sam A. Lindsay on 10/15/2020) (svc)
October 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 165 CONSENT ORDER OF PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION AND OTHER EQUITABLE RELIEF AGAINST DEFENDANTS LUCAS THOMAS ERB a/k/a LUCAS ASHER a/k/a LUKE ASHER AND SIMON BATASHVILI. (Ordered by Judge Sam A. Lindsay on 10/14/2020) (svc)
October 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 164 CONSENT ORDER OF PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION EXECUTED (Ordered by Judge Sam A. Lindsay on 10/14/2020) (svc)
October 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 163 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #161 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Accordingly, the deadline for Plaintiffs to file briefs or memoranda of law supporting their request for a preliminary injunction is 10/13/2020 at 5:00 p.m. (Ordered by Judge Sam A. Lindsay on 10/13/2020) (chmb)
October 13, 2020 Filing 162 MOTION APPROVE CONSENT ORDERS OF PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION filed by Commodity Futures Trading Commission (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proposed Order) (Buffa, JonMarc)
October 9, 2020 Filing 161 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Briefs or Memoranda of Law Supporting Their Request for a Preliminary Injunction filed by Commodity Futures Trading Commission (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Buffa, JonMarc)
October 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 160 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #158 Motion to Proceed Without Local Counsel. Accordingly, the court allows Plaintiff State of Maryland Ex Rel Maryland Securities Commissioner to proceed without designating local counsel in this case. (Ordered by Judge Sam A. Lindsay on 10/9/2020) (chmb)
October 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 159 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #157 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Max F. Brauer. Important Reminder: Unless excused for cause, an attorney who is not an ECF user must register within 14 days of the date the attorney appears in a case pursuant to LR 5.1(f) and LCrR 49.2(g). (Ordered by Judge Sam A. Lindsay on 10/9/2020) (chmb)
October 9, 2020 Filing 158 MOTION for Leave to Proceed Without Local Counsel re #157 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing (Clerk Note: Filer states no fee is to be collected due to prior payment or waiver by MO 16 or prior order.) filed by State of Maryland (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Motion to Proceed Without Local Counsel) (Brauer, Max)
October 9, 2020 Filing 157 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing (Filing fee $100; Receipt number 0539-11249174) filed by State of Maryland (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order Granting Admission Pro Hac Vice) (Brauer, Max) Modified receipt information on 10/14/2020 (axm). (Main Document 157 replaced on 10/14/2020 to flatten pdf) (axm).
October 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 156 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting 143 Motion to Proceed Without Local Counsel. Accordingly, the court allows Plaintiff California Commissioner of Business Oversight to proceed without designating local counsel in this case. (Ordered by Judge Sam A. Lindsay on 10/9/2020) (chmb)
October 8, 2020 Filing 155 ***PLEASE DISREGARD PER ATTORNEY WILL REFILE*** Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing (Filing fee $100; Receipt number 0539-11249174) filed by State of Maryland (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Motion to Proceed Without Local Counsel, #3 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Motion to Proceed Without Local Counsel, #4 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Pro Hac Vice Application) (Brauer, Max) Modified on 10/9/2020 (ndt).
October 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 154 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #152 Motion to Proceed Without Local Counsel. Accordingly, the court allows Plaintiff Nevada Secretary of State, SecuritiesDivision to proceed without designating local counsel in this case. (Ordered by Judge Sam A. Lindsay on 10/6/2020) (chmb)
October 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 153 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #151 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Erin M. Houston. Important Reminder: Unless excused for cause, an attorney who is not an ECF user must register within 14 days of the date the attorney appears in a case pursuant to LR 5.1(f) and LCrR 49.2(g). (Ordered by Judge Sam A. Lindsay on 10/6/2020) (chmb)
October 6, 2020 Filing 152 MOTION for Leave to Proceed without Local Counsel re #151 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing (Filing fee $100; Receipt number 0539-11238060) filed by Office of the Nevada Secretary of State (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Houston, Erin)
October 6, 2020 Filing 151 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing (Filing fee $100; Receipt number 0539-11238060) filed by Office of the Nevada Secretary of State (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order) (Houston, Erin)
October 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 150 SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER: Plaintiffs shall file their brief or memorandum of law supporting their request for a preliminary injunction by 5:00 p.m., Friday, October 9, 2020. (Ordered by Judge Sam A. Lindsay on 10/5/2020) (svc)
October 5, 2020 Filing 149 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Peter C Lewis on behalf of Kelly Crawford. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Lewis, Peter)
October 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 148 ORDER denying as moot #144 Unopposed Motion for Continuance; granting #147 Amended Unopposed Motion for Continuance. Accordingly, given that the parties agree, the preliminary injunction hearing scheduled for October 6, 2020 is hereby vacated, and reset for October 27, 2020, at 9:00 a.m. Defendants response or memorandum of law must be filed by 5:00 p.m., October 15, 2020; and any reply by Plaintiffs must be filed by 5:00 p.m., October 20, 2020. (Ordered by Judge Sam A. Lindsay on 10/5/2020) (svc)
October 5, 2020 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:148. Mon Oct 5 15:35:46 CDT 2020 (crt)
October 5, 2020 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:150. Mon Oct 5 16:24:27 CDT 2020 (crt)
October 2, 2020 Filing 147 Amended MOTION to Continue filed by Simon Batashvili, Lucas Thomas Erb (Spencer, Arnold)
October 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 146 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #145 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of John Haley. Important Reminder: Unless excused for cause, an attorney who is not an ECF user must register within 14 days of the date the attorney appears in a case pursuant to LR 5.1(f) and LCrR 49.2(g). (Ordered by Judge Sam A. Lindsay on 10/2/2020) (chmb)
October 2, 2020 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:. NEF of Document 146 Fri Oct 2 12:01:43 CDT 2020 (crt)
October 2, 2020 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:140, 141. NEF of Fri Oct 2 08:16:58 CDT 2020 (crt)
October 1, 2020 Filing 145 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing (Fee: $100.00, Receipt Number: 0539-11219740) filed by State of Alaska (Attachments: #1 Additional Page(s) Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order). Party John Haley added. (Haley, John) Modified to add payment information on 10/2/2020 (cea).
October 1, 2020 Filing 144 Unopposed MOTION to Continue filed by Simon Batashvili, Lucas Thomas Erb (Spencer, Arnold)
October 1, 2020 Filing 142 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Arnold Augur Spencer on behalf of Simon Batashvili. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Spencer, Arnold)
September 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 141 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #139 Motion to Proceed Without Local Counsel. Accordingly, the court allows Plaintiff State of South Dakota Department of Labor and Regulation, Division of Insurance to proceed without designating local counsel in this case. (Ordered by Judge Sam A. Lindsay on 9/30/2020) (chmb)
September 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 140 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #138 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Clayton Grueb. Important Reminder: Unless excused for cause, an attorney who is not an ECF user must register within 14 days of the date the attorney appears in a case pursuant to LR 5.1(f) and LCrR 49.2(g). (Ordered by Judge Sam A. Lindsay on 9/30/2020) (chmb)
September 30, 2020 Filing 139 MOTION Proceed without locol counsel filed by South Dakota Department of Labor & Regulation (Grueb, Clayton)
September 30, 2020 Filing 138 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing (Filing fee $100; Receipt number 0539-11221869) filed by South Dakota Department of Labor & Regulation (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Certificate of Good Standing) (Grueb, Clayton)
September 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 137 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #133 Motion to Proceed Without Local Counsel. Accordingly, the court allows Plaintiff Arizona Corporation Commission to proceed without designating local counsel in this case. (Ordered by Judge Sam A. Lindsay on 9/30/2020) (chmb)
September 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 136 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #132 Motion to Proceed Without Local Counsel. Accordingly, the court allows Plaintiff State of Alaska, Attorney Generals Office to proceed without designating local counsel in this case. (Ordered by Judge Sam A. Lindsay on 9/30/2020) (chmb)
September 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 135 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #131 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Christopher Nichols. Important Reminder: Unless excused for cause, an attorney who is not an ECF user must register within 14 days of the date the attorney appears in a case pursuant to LR 5.1(f) and LCrR 49.2(g). (Ordered by Judge Sam A. Lindsay on 9/30/2020) (chmb)
September 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 134 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #130 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Robert H. Schmidt. Important Reminder: Unless excused for cause, an attorney who is not an ECF user must register within 14 days of the date the attorney appears in a case pursuant to LR 5.1(f) and LCrR 49.2(g). (Ordered by Judge Sam A. Lindsay on 9/30/2020) (chmb)
September 30, 2020 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:. NEF of document 104, 106, 107, 108, 109 Wed Sep 30 10:58:08 CDT 2020 (crt)
September 29, 2020 Filing 133 MOTION for Leave to File Leave to Proceed filed by Arizona Corporation Commission (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Nichols, Christopher)
September 29, 2020 Filing 132 MOTION for Leave to File Motion for Leave to Proceed without Local Counsel filed by State of Alaska (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Motion For Leave to Proceed without Local Counsel) (Schmidt, Robert)
September 29, 2020 Filing 131 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing (Filing fee $100; Receipt number 0539-11219813) filed by Arizona Corporation Commission (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Nichols, Christopher)
September 29, 2020 Filing 130 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing (Filing fee $100; Receipt number 0539-11219774) filed by State of Alaska (Attachments: #1 Additional Page(s) Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order). Party Robert Schmidt added. (Schmidt, Robert)
September 29, 2020 Filing 129 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Arnold Augur Spencer on behalf of Lucas Thomas Erb. (Filer will update contact info in ECF.) (Spencer, Arnold)
September 29, 2020 Filing 128 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Barrick Capital Inc ; served on 9/25/2020. (Buffa, JonMarc)
September 29, 2020 Filing 127 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Simon Batashvili ; served on 9/24/2020. (Buffa, JonMarc)
September 29, 2020 Filing 126 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Lucas Thomas Erb ; served on 9/26/2020. (Buffa, JonMarc)
September 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 125 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #120 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Shannon A. Conlin. Important Reminder: Unless excused for cause, an attorney who is not an ECF user must register within 14 days of the date the attorney appears in a case pursuant to LR 5.1(f) and LCrR 49.2(g). (Ordered by Judge Sam A. Lindsay on 9/29/2020) (chmb)
September 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 124 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #122 Motion to Proceed Without Local Counsel. Accordingly, the court allows Plaintiff Washington State Department of FinancialInstitutions to proceed without designating local counsel in this case. (Ordered by Judge Sam A. Lindsay on 9/29/2020) (chmb)
September 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 123 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #121 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Ian S. McDonald. Important Reminder: Unless excused for cause, an attorney who is not an ECF user must register within 14 days of the date the attorney appears in a case pursuant to LR 5.1(f) and LCrR 49.2(g). (Ordered by Judge Sam A. Lindsay on 9/29/2020) (chmb)
September 29, 2020 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:111,112,114,115. Tue Sep 29 09:52:38 CDT 2020 (crt)
September 29, 2020 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:116,117,118,119. NEF Tue Sep 29 10:00:02 CDT 2020 (crt)
September 28, 2020 Filing 122 MOTION for Leave to File Leave to Proceed filed by Washington State Department of Financial Institutions (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (McDonald, Ian)
September 28, 2020 Filing 121 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing (Filing fee $100; Receipt number 0539-11215790) filed by Washington State Department of Financial Institutions (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (McDonald, Ian)
September 28, 2020 Filing 120 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing (Filing fee $100; Receipt number 0539-11215359) filed by State of Wisconsin (Attachments: #1 Pro Hac Vice Application, #2 Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order Prposed Order for Pro Hac Vice) (Conlin, Shannon)
September 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 119 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #113 Motion to Proceed Without Local Counsel. Accordingly, the court allows Plaintiff State of Idaho to proceed without designating local counsel in this case. (Ordered by Judge Sam A. Lindsay on 9/28/2020) (chmb)
September 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 118 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #105 Motion to Proceed Without Local Counsel. Accordingly, the court allows Plaintiff State of Hawaii, Securities EnforcementBranch to proceed without designating local counsel. (Ordered by Judge Sam A. Lindsay on 9/28/2020) (chmb)
September 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 117 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #103 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Shannon A. Wiley. Important Reminder: Unless excused for cause, an attorney who is not an ECF user must register within 14 days of the date the attorney appears in a case pursuant to LR 5.1(f) and LCrR 49.2(g). (Ordered by Judge Sam A. Lindsay on 9/28/2020) (chmb)
September 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 116 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #110 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Loren Messerly. Important Reminder: Unless excused for cause, an attorney who is not an ECF user must register within 14 days of the date the attorney appears in a case pursuant to LR 5.1(f) and LCrR 49.2(g). (Ordered by Judge Sam A. Lindsay on 9/28/2020) (chmb)
September 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 115 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #102 Motion to Proceed Without Local Counsel. Accordingly, the court allows Plaintiff Office of the Georgia Secretary of State to proceed without designating local counsel in this case. (Ordered by Judge Sam A. Lindsay on 9/28/2020) (chmb)
September 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 114 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #101 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Logan B. Winkles. Important Reminder: Unless excused for cause, an attorney who is not an ECF user must register within 14 days of the date the attorney appears in a case pursuant to LR 5.1(f) and LCrR 49.2(g). (Ordered by Judge Sam A. Lindsay on 9/28/2020) (chmb)
September 28, 2020 Filing 113 MOTION Leave to Proceed without Local Counsel re #110 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing (Filing fee $100; Receipt number 0539-11214813) filed by Idaho Department of Finance (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order - Leave to Proceed without Local Counsel) (Messerly, Loren)
September 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 112 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #100 Motion to Proceed Without Local Counsel. Accordingly, the court allows Plaintiff, Office of the Attorney General, State ofFlorida, Department of Legal Affairs to proceed without designating local counsel in this case. (Ordered by Judge Sam A. Lindsay on 9/28/2020) (chmb)
September 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 111 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #99 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Ronald J. Stay. Important Reminder: Unless excused for cause, an attorney who is not an ECF user must register within 14 days of the date the attorney appears in a case pursuant to LR 5.1(f) and LCrR 49.2(g). (Ordered by Judge Sam A. Lindsay on 9/28/2020) (chmb)
September 28, 2020 Filing 110 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing (Filing fee $100; Receipt number 0539-11214813) filed by Idaho Department of Finance (Attachments: #1 Additional Page(s) Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order Proposed Order For Admission Pro Hac Vice) (Messerly, Loren)
September 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 109 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #98 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Victoria Butler. Important Reminder: Unless excused for cause, an attorney who is not an ECF user must register within 14 days of the date the attorney appears in a case pursuant to LR 5.1(f) and LCrR 49.2(g). (Ordered by Judge Sam A. Lindsay on 9/28/2020) (chmb)
September 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 108 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #97 Motion to Proceed Without Local Counsel. Accordingly, the court allows Plaintiff Indiana Securities Commission to proceed without designating local counsel in this case. (Ordered by Judge Sam A. Lindsay on 9/28/2020) (chmb)
September 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 107 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #96 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Jefferson S. Garn. Important Reminder: Unless excused for cause, an attorney who is not an ECF user must register within 14 days of the date the attorney appears in a case pursuant to LR 5.1(f) and LCrR 49.2(g). (Ordered by Judge Sam A. Lindsay on 9/28/2020) (chmb)
September 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 106 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #95 Motion to Proceed Without Local Counsel. Accordingly, the court allows Plaintiff West Virginia Securities Commission to proceed without designating local counsel in this case. (Ordered by Judge Sam A. Lindsay on 9/28/2020) (chmb)
September 28, 2020 Filing 105 MOTION LEAVE TO PROCEED WITHOUT LOCAL COUNSEL filed by State of Hawaii (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Nakamura-Watanabe, Rayni)
September 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 104 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #94 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Michael Nusbaum. Important Reminder: Unless excused for cause, an attorney who is not an ECF user must register within 14 days of the date the attorney appears in a case pursuant to LR 5.1(f) and LCrR 49.2(g). (Ordered by Judge Sam A. Lindsay on 9/28/2020) (chmb)
September 28, 2020 Filing 103 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing (Filing fee $100; Receipt number 0539-11214140) filed by South Carolina Secretary of State (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing) (Wiley, Shannon)
September 28, 2020 Filing 102 MOTION Leave to Proceed Without Local Counsel re #99 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing (Filing fee $100; Receipt number 0539-11213752), #101 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing for Attorney Logan B. Winkles (Filing fee $100; Receipt number 0539-11213768) filed by Office of the Georgia Secretary of State (Stay, Ronald)
September 28, 2020 Filing 101 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing for Attorney Logan B. Winkles (Filing fee $100; Receipt number 0539-11213768) filed by Office of the Georgia Secretary of State (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order) (Stay, Ronald)
September 28, 2020 Filing 100 MOTION For Leave to Proceed Without Local Counsel filed by State of Florida (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Butler, Victoria)
September 28, 2020 Filing 99 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing (Filing fee $100; Receipt number 0539-11213752) filed by Office of the Georgia Secretary of State (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order) (Stay, Ronald)
September 28, 2020 Filing 98 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing (Filing fee $100; Receipt number 0539-11213687) filed by State of Florida (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Butler, Victoria)
September 28, 2020 Filing 97 MOTION Proceed without Local Counsel filed by Indiana Securities Commissioner (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Garn, Jefferson)
September 28, 2020 Filing 96 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing (Filing fee $100; Receipt number 0539-11213571) filed by Indiana Securities Commissioner (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Garn, Jefferson)
September 28, 2020 Filing 95 MOTION For Leave to Proceed Without Local Counsel filed by West Virginia Securities Commission (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed order granting motion for leave to proceed without local counsel, #2 Proposed Order certificate of service) (Nusbaum, Michael) Docket event and text modified on 9/28/2020 (twd).
September 28, 2020 Filing 94 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing (Filing fee $100; Receipt number 0539-11213020) filed by West Virginia Securities Commission (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order pro hac vic proposed order, #2 Proposed Order certificate of good standing, #3 Proposed Order Certificate of Service) (Nusbaum, Michael)
September 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #90 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Gregg D. Bernstein. Important Reminder: Unless excused for cause, an attorney who is not an ECF user must register within 14 days of the date the attorney appears in a case pursuant to LR 5.1(f) and LCrR 49.2(g). (Ordered by Judge Sam A. Lindsay on 9/28/2020) (chmb)
September 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #89 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Danielle A. Stoumbos. Important Reminder: Unless excused for cause, an attorney who is not an ECF user must register within 14 days of the date the attorney appears in a case pursuant to LR 5.1(f) and LCrR 49.2(g). (Ordered by Judge Sam A. Lindsay on 9/28/2020) (chmb)
September 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #88 Motion to Proceed Without Local Counsel. Accordingly, the court allows Plaintiff State of Florida, Office of FinancialRegulation to proceed without designating local counsel in this case. (Ordered by Judge Sam A. Lindsay on 9/28/2020) (chmb)
September 28, 2020 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:. NEF of Document 91, 92, 93 Mon Sep 28 10:30:03 CDT 2020 (crt)
September 25, 2020 Filing 178 MOTION to Proceed Without Local Counsel filed by Maine Securities Administrator (originally attached to #90 phv) (ykp)
September 25, 2020 Filing 143 Motion for Leave to Proceed Without Local Counsel filed by California Commissioner of Business Oversight. Please see doc. #89 for image. (ctf)
September 25, 2020 Filing 90 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing (Filing fee $100; Receipt number 0539-11210048) filed by Commodity Futures Trading Commission (Attachments: #1 Motion to Proceed, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Good Standing). Party Maine Securities Administrator added.Attorney Gregg D Bernstein added to party Commodity Futures Trading Commission(pty:pla) (Bernstein, Gregg)
September 25, 2020 Filing 89 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing (Filing fee $100; Receipt number 0539-11210015) filed by California Commissioner of Business Oversight (Attachments: #1 Motion to Proceed without Local Counsel, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Proposed Order). Party State of California added. (Stoumbos, Danielle)
September 25, 2020 Filing 88 MOTION Leave to Proceed Without Local Counsel filed by State of Florida (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Melchior, Albert)
September 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #86 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of A. Gregory Melchior. Important Reminder: Unless excused for cause, an attorney who is not an ECF user must register within 14 days of the date the attorney appears in a case pursuant to LR 5.1(f) and LCrR 49.2(g). (Ordered by Judge Sam A. Lindsay on 9/25/2020) (chmb)
September 25, 2020 Filing 86 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing (Filing fee $100; Receipt number 0539-11209754) filed by State of Florida (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Melchior, Albert)
September 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER: The court and the clerk's office have spent most of the day correcting documents that have been filed incorrectly in this action in the court's Case Management Electronic Case Filing ("ECF") system. The court directs all parties to contact the court's clerks office ECF Help Desk at 214-753-2633 or toll free 866-243-2866 with any filing questions prior to filing any documents. (Ordered by Judge Sam A. Lindsay on 9/25/2020) (axm)
September 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #83 Motion to Proceed Without Local Counsel. Accordingly, the court allows Plaintiff People of Michigan to proceed without designating local counsel in this case. (Ordered by Judge Sam A. Lindsay on 9/25/2020) (chmb)
September 25, 2020 Filing 83 MOTION for Leave to Proceed without Local Counsel filed by Dana Nessel (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Levin, Aaron)
September 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #80 Motion to Proceed Without Local Counsel. Accordingly, the court allows Plaintiff the People of the State of New York to proceed without designating local counsel in this case. (Ordered by Judge Sam A. Lindsay on 9/25/2020) (chmb)
September 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #79 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Rayni M. Nakamura-Watanabe. Important Reminder: Unless excused for cause, an attorney who is not an ECF user must register within 14 days of the date the attorney appears in a case pursuant to LR 5.1(f) and LCrR 49.2(g). (Ordered by Judge Sam A. Lindsay on 9/25/2020) (chmb)
September 25, 2020 Filing 80 MOTION Motion for Leave to Proceed Without Local Counsel filed by Attorney General of the State of New York (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Trakht, Tatyana) Modified text and linkage on 9/28/2020 (axm).
September 25, 2020 Filing 79 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing (Filing fee $100; Receipt number 0539-11209180) filed by State of Hawaii (Attachments: #1 Additional Page(s) Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Nakamura-Watanabe, Rayni)
September 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting 77 Motion to Proceed Without Local Counsel. Accordingly, the court allows Plaintiff Commonwealth of Kentucky to proceed without designating local counsel in this action. (Ordered by Judge Sam A. Lindsay on 9/25/2020) (chmb)
September 25, 2020 Filing 77 Motion for Leave to Proceed Without Local Counsel filed by Kentucky Department of Financial Institutions. Please see doc. #73 for image. (ctf)
September 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #73 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Gary A. Stephens. Important Reminder: Unless excused for cause, an attorney who is not an ECF user must register within 14 days of the date the attorney appears in a case pursuant to LR 5.1(f) and LCrR 49.2(g). (Ordered by Judge Sam A. Lindsay on 9/25/2020) (chmb)
September 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #72 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Tatyana (Tanya) Trakht. Important Reminder: Unless excused for cause, an attorney who is not an ECF user must register within 14 days of the date the attorney appears in a case pursuant to LR 5.1(f) and LCrR 49.2(g). (Ordered by Judge Sam A. Lindsay on 9/25/2020) (chmb)
September 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #38 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Aaron W. Levin. Important Reminder: Unless excused for cause, an attorney who is not an ECF user must register within 14 days of the date the attorney appears in a case pursuant to LR 5.1(f) and LCrR 49.2(g). (Ordered by Judge Sam A. Lindsay on 9/25/2020) (chmb)
September 25, 2020 Filing 73 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing (Filing fee $100; Receipt number 0539-11209309) filed by Kentucky Department of Financial Institutions with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Motion to Proceed, #3 Proposed Order) (Stephens, Gary)
September 25, 2020 Filing 72 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing (Filing fee $100; Receipt number 0539-11209260) filed by Attorney General of the State of New York (Attachments: #1 Certificate of good standing, #2 Proposed Order) (Trakht, Tatyana)
September 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #37 Motion to Proceed Without Local Counsel. Accordingly, the court allows Plaintiff Iowa Insurance Commissioner, Douglas M. Ommen to proceed without designating local counsel in this case. (Ordered by Judge Sam A. Lindsay on 9/25/2020) (chmb)
September 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting 68 Motion to Proceed Without Local Counsel. Accordingly, the court allows Plaintiff Tung Chan, Securities Commissioner for the State of Colorado to proceed without designating local counsel in this case. (Ordered by Judge Sam A. Lindsay on 9/25/2020) (chmb)
September 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #34 Motion to Proceed Without Local Counsel. Accordingly, the court allows Plaintiff New Mexico Securities Division to proceed without designating local counsel in this case. (Ordered by Judge Sam A. Lindsay on 9/25/2020) (chmb)
September 25, 2020 Filing 68 Motion for Leave to Proceed Without Local Counsel filed by Colorado Securities Commissioner. Please see doc. #50 for image. (ctf)
September 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting 66 Motion to Proceed Without Local Counsel. Accordingly, the court allows Plaintiff Nebraska Department of Banking and Finance to proceed without designating local counsel in this case. (Ordered by Judge Sam A. Lindsay on 9/25/2020) (chmb)
September 25, 2020 Filing 66 Motion for Leave to Proceed Without Local Counsel filed by Nebraska Department of Banking & Finance. Please see doc. #48 for image. (ctf)
September 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #50 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Janna K. Fischer. Important Reminder: Unless excused for cause, an attorney who is not an ECF user must register within 14 days of the date the attorney appears in a case pursuant to LR 5.1(f) and LCrR 49.2(g). (Ordered by Judge Sam A. Lindsay on 9/25/2020) (chmb)
September 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #48 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Joshua R. Shasserre. Important Reminder: Unless excused for cause, an attorney who is not an ECF user must register within 14 days of the date the attorney appears in a case pursuant to LR 5.1(f) and LCrR 49.2(g). (Ordered by Judge Sam A. Lindsay on 9/25/2020) (chmb)
September 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #57 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Robert W. Finke. Important Reminder: Unless excused for cause, an attorney who is not an ECF user must register within 14 days of the date the attorney appears in a case pursuant to LR 5.1(f) and LCrR 49.2(g). (Ordered by Judge Sam A. Lindsay on 9/25/2020) (chmb)
September 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #59 Motion to Proceed Without Local Counsel. Accordingly, the court allows Plaintiff Commissioner of the Tennessee Department of Commerce and Insurance to proceed without designating local counsel in this case. (Ordered by Judge Sam A. Lindsay on 9/25/2020) (chmb)
September 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #56 Motion to Proceed Without Local Counsel. Accordingly, the court allows Plaintiff New Mexico Securities Division to proceed without designating local counsel in this case. (Ordered by Judge Sam A. Lindsay on 9/25/2020) (chmb)
September 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #55 Motion to Proceed Without Local Counsel. Accordingly, the court allows Plaintiff Office of the Kansas Securities Commissioner to proceed without designating local counsel in this case. (Ordered by Judge Sam A. Lindsay on 9/25/2020) (chmb)
September 25, 2020 Filing 59 MOTION Leave to Proceed Without Local Counsel re 31 Order on Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice, filed by Commissioner of the Tennessee Department of Commerce and Insurance (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Urban, James)
September 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #53 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Thomas E. Knutzen. Important Reminder: Unless excused for cause, an attorney who is not an ECF user must register within 14 days of the date the attorney appears in a case pursuant to LR 5.1(f) and LCrR 49.2(g). (Ordered by Judge Sam A. Lindsay on 9/25/2020) (chmb)
September 25, 2020 Filing 57 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing (Filing fee $100; Receipt number 0539-11208949) filed by Colorado Securities Commissioner . (Finke, Robert)
September 25, 2020 Filing 56 MOTION for Leave Proceed Without Local Counsel filed by New Mexico Securities Division (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Berger, Alissa)
September 25, 2020 Filing 55 MOTION Leave to Proceed Without Local Counsel filed by Office of the Kansas Securities Commissioner (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Knutzen, Thomas) Modified text and linkage on 9/28/2020 (axm).
September 25, 2020 Filing 54 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Tower Equity LLC; served on 9/24/2020. (Buffa, JonMarc)
September 25, 2020 Filing 53 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing (Filing fee $100; Receipt number 0539-11208880) filed by Office of the Kansas Securities Commissioner (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order) (Knutzen, Thomas)
September 25, 2020 Filing 52 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to TMTE Inc; served on 9/24/2020. (Buffa, JonMarc)
September 25, 2020 Filing 51 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Chase Metals LLC; served on 9/24/2020. (Buffa, JonMarc)
September 25, 2020 Filing 50 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing (Filing fee $100; Receipt number 0539-11208797) filed by Colorado Securities Commissioner. (Fischer, Janna) Modified text on 9/25/2020 (ykp).
September 25, 2020 Filing 49 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Chase Metals Inc; served on 9/24/2020. (Buffa, JonMarc)
September 25, 2020 Filing 48 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing (Filing fee $100; Receipt number 0539-11208772) filed by Nebraska Department of Banking & Finance (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #2 Additional Page(s) Motion for Leave to Proceed without Local Counsel, #3 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Proceed without Local Counsel, #4 Additional Page(s) Certificate of Good Standing) (Shasserre, Joshua)
September 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #43 Motion to Proceed Without Local Counsel. Accordingly, Plaintiff State of Delaware may proceed without designating local counsel in this case. (Ordered by Judge Sam A. Lindsay on 9/25/2020) (chmb)
September 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #42 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Jonathan B. Williams. Important Reminder: Unless excused for cause, an attorney who is not an ECF user must register within 14 days of the date the attorney appears in a case pursuant to LR 5.1(f) and LCrR 49.2(g). (Ordered by Judge Sam A. Lindsay on 9/25/2020) (chmb)
September 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #41 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Katherine M. Devanney. Important Reminder: Unless excused for cause, an attorney who is not an ECF user must register within 14 days of the date the attorney appears in a case pursuant to LR 5.1(f) and LCrR 49.2(g). (Ordered by Judge Sam A. Lindsay on 9/25/2020) (chmb)
September 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #40 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Seth Shannon. Important Reminder: Unless excused for cause, an attorney who is not an ECF user must register within 14 days of the date the attorney appears in a case pursuant to LR 5.1(f) and LCrR 49.2(g). (Ordered by Judge Sam A. Lindsay on 9/25/2020) (chmb)
September 25, 2020 Filing 43 MOTION Leave to Proceed Without Local Counsel re #41 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing (Filing fee $100; Receipt number 0539-11208042) filed by State of Delaware (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Order Granting Leave) (Devanney, Katherine)
September 25, 2020 Filing 42 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing (Filing fee $100; Receipt number 0539-11208389) filed by South Carolina Attorney General (Attachments: #1 Motion to Proceed without Local Counsel, #2 Proposed Order) (Williams, Jonathan)
September 25, 2020 Filing 41 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing (Filing fee $100; Receipt number 0539-11208042) filed by State of Delaware (Attachments: #1 Additional Page(s) Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order Order Approving Admission) (Devanney, Katherine)
September 25, 2020 Filing 40 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing & Motion for Leave to Proceed without Local Counsel (Filing fee $100; Receipt number 0539-11208138) filed by Mississippi Secretary of State (Attachments: #1 Letter of Good Standing, #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed, #3 Proposed Order, #4 Proposed Order) (Shannon, Seth) Modified text on 9/28/2020 (axm).
September 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #36 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Adam J. Kenworthy. Important Reminder: Unless excused for cause, an attorney who is not an ECF user must register within 14 days of the date the attorney appears in a case pursuant to LR 5.1(f) and LCrR 49.2(g). (Ordered by Judge Sam A. Lindsay on 9/25/2020) (chmb)
September 25, 2020 Filing 38 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing (Filing fee $100; Receipt number 0539-11208046) filed by Dana Nessel (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Levin, Aaron) (Main Document 38 replaced on 9/25/2020) (ctf).
September 25, 2020 Filing 37 Motion for Leave to Proceed Without Local Counsel filed by Douglas M Ommen (Kenworthy, Adam) Modified on 9/25/2020 to correct title. (ctf).
September 25, 2020 Filing 36 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing (Filing fee $100; Receipt number 0539-11208049) filed by Douglas M Ommen (Attachments: #1 Additional Page(s) Certificate of good standing) (Kenworthy, Adam)
September 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #33 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Alissa N. Berger. Important Reminder: Unless excused for cause, an attorney who is not an ECF user must register within 14 days of the date the attorney appears in a case pursuant to LR 5.1(f) and LCrR 49.2(g). (Ordered by Judge Sam A. Lindsay on 9/25/2020) (chmb)
September 25, 2020 Filing 34 Motion for Leave to Proceed Without Local Counsel filed by New Mexico Securities Division (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Berger, Alissa) Modified on 9/25/2020 to correct title (ctf).
September 25, 2020 Filing 33 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing (Filing fee $100; Receipt number 0539-11208055) filed by New Mexico Securities Division (Attachments: #1 Affidavit(s), #2 Proposed Order) (Berger, Alissa)
September 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #30 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Robert Fagnant. Important Reminder: Unless excused for cause, an attorney who is not an ECF user must register within 14 days of the date the attorney appears in a case pursuant to LR 5.1(f) and LCrR 49.2(g). (Ordered by Judge Sam A. Lindsay on 9/25/2020) (chmb)
September 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #29 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of James P. Urban. Important Reminder: Unless excused for cause, an attorney who is not an ECF user must register within 14 days of the date the attorney appears in a case pursuant to LR 5.1(f) and LCrR 49.2(g). (Ordered by Judge Sam A. Lindsay on 9/25/2020) (chmb)
September 25, 2020 Filing 30 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing & Motion for Leave to Proceed without Local Counsel (Filing fee $100; Receipt number 0539-11207935) filed by Oklahoma Department of Securities (Attachments: #1 Additional Page(s) Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Additional Page(s) Motion for Leave to Proceed, #3 Proposed Order Order Granting Leave, #4 Proposed Order Order for Admission) (Fagnant, Robert) Modified text on 9/28/2020 (axm).
September 25, 2020 Filing 29 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing & Motion for Leave to Proceed without Local Counsel (Filing fee $100; Receipt number 0539-11207813) filed by Commissioner of the Tennessee Department of Commerce and Insurance (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Motion to Proceed without Local Counsel, #3 Proposed Order) (Urban, James) Modified text on 9/28/2020 (axm).
September 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #22 Motion for Leave to File. Accordingly, Plaintiffs' Memorandum in Support of Plaintiffs' Emergency Ex Parte Motion for a Statutory Restraining Order (Doc. 5) may exceed the 25 page limitation by 19 pages. (Unless the document has already been filed, clerk to enter the document as of the date of this order.) (Ordered by Judge Sam A. Lindsay on 9/25/2020) (chmb)
September 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #25 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Anne W. Gunter. Important Reminder: Unless excused for cause, an attorney who is not an ECF user must register within 14 days of the date the attorney appears in a case pursuant to LR 5.1(f) and LCrR 49.2(g). (Ordered by Judge Sam A. Lindsay on 9/25/2020) (chmb)
September 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #24 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Jeffery A. "Beau" Brown, Jr. Important Reminder: Unless excused for cause, an attorney who is not an ECF user must register within 14 days of the date the attorney appears in a case pursuant to LR 5.1(f) and LCrR 49.2(g). (Ordered by Judge Sam A. Lindsay on 9/25/2020) (chmb)
September 25, 2020 Filing 25 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing & Motion for Leave to Proceed without Local Counsel (Filing fee $100; Receipt number 0539-11207735) filed by Alabama Securities Commission (Gunter, Anne) Modified text on 9/28/2020 (axm).
September 25, 2020 Filing 24 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing & Motion for Leave to Proceed without Local Counsel (Filing fee $100; Receipt number 0539-11207675) filed by Alabama Securities Commission (Brown, Jeffrey) Modified text on 9/28/2020 (axm).
September 25, 2020 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:85. Fri Sep 25 15:32:40 CDT 2020 (crt)
September 25, 2020 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:. NEF for Documents 26, 27, 28, 31, 32, 35, 39, 44, 45, 46, 47, 58, 60, 61, 61, 63, 64, 65, 67, 69, 70, 71, 74, 75, 76, 78, 81, 82, 84, 87 Fri Sep 25 16:02:53 CDT 2020 (crt)
September 24, 2020 Filing 23 NOTICE TO LIFT SEAL filed by Commodity Futures Trading Commission, et al (svc)
September 24, 2020 Filing 22 MOTION for Leave to File Memorandum in Support of Plaintiffs Emergency Ex Parte Motion for a Statutory Restraining Order filed by Commodity Futures Trading Commission, et al (svc)
September 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER: It is ordered that the #3 Motion Temporarily Seal the Entire Docket and File is granted and that the entire docket and file in this matter shall be sealed. It is further hereby ordered that the seal shall expire upon the earlier of (l) seventy-two hours following the issuance of the ex parte restraining order sought by Plaintiffs or (2) Plaintiffs provide the court with Notice that Defendants have been served with the Complaint. (Ordered by Judge Sam A. Lindsay on 9/23/2020) (svc)
September 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER denying without prejudice #11 MOTION for Leave to File a Brief in Excess of the Page Limit in Support of Its Motion for An Emergency Ex Parte Statutory Restraining Order (Ordered by Judge Sam A. Lindsay on 9/23/2020) (svc)
September 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #7 Motion for Leave to Proceed Without Local Counsel. Accordingly, Plaintiff may proceed without designating local counsel in this case. (Ordered by Judge Sam A. Lindsay on 9/23/2020) (chmb)
September 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #10 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Richard P. Foelber. Important Reminder: Unless excused for cause, an attorney who is not an ECF user must register within 14 days of the date the attorney appears in a case pursuant to LR 5.1(f) and LCrR 49.2(g). (Ordered by Judge Sam A. Lindsay on 9/23/2020) (chmb)
September 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #9 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of JonMarc Buffa. Important Reminder: Unless excused for cause, an attorney who is not an ECF user must register within 14 days of the date the attorney appears in a case pursuant to LR 5.1(f) and LCrR 49.2(g). (Ordered by Judge Sam A. Lindsay on 9/23/2020) (chmb)
September 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Ex Parte ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' EMERGENCY EX PARTE MOTION FOR STATUTORY RESTRAINING ORDER, APPOINTMENT OF RECEIVER, AND OTHER EQUITABLE RELIEF: Plaintiffs' motion for a preliminary injunction and extending the appointment of the Temporary Receiver is set for hearing on 10/6/2020 at 10:00 AM before Judge Sam A. Lindsay. This Order shall remain in full force and effect until 10/6/2020 at 5:00 p.m., unless extended further by order of this Court pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 65(b)(2), and this Court retains jurisdiction of this matter for all purposes. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 9/22/2020) (ctf)
September 22, 2020 Filing 15 PLAINTIFFS' RECOMMENDATION FOR A TEMPORARY RECEIVER filed by Commodity Futures Trading Commission. (ctf)
September 22, 2020 Filing 14 BENCH MEMORANDUM filed by All Plaintiffs. (axm)
September 22, 2020 Filing 13 Summons Issued as to Barrick Capital Inc, Simon Batashvili, Chase Metals Inc, Chase Metals LLC, Lucas Thomas Erb, TMTE Inc, Tower Equity LLC. (axm)
September 22, 2020 Filing 12 Ex Parte Appendix in Support re: #5 Sealed Brief/Memorandum in Supportto #4 Emergency Motion for Statutory Restraining Order filed by State of Texas, South Carolina Secretary of State, State of Wisconsin, California Commissioner of Business Oversight, Washington State Department of Financial Institutions, Commodity Futures Trading Commission, State of Hawaii, Mississippi Secretary of State, State of Florida, Office of the Nevada Secretary of State, Oklahoma Department of Securities, West Virginia Securities Commission, The People of the State of New York, Douglas M Ommen, State of Maryland, Iowa Insurance Commissioner, Office of Financial Regulation, Idaho Department of Finance, Division of Insurance, Arizona Corporation Commission, Office of the Kansas Securities Commissioner, State of Delaware, South Dakota Department of Labor & Regulation, Kentucky Department of Financial Institutions, New Mexico Securities Division, Office of the Attorney General and State of Florida, Indiana Securities Commissioner, Maine Securities Administrator, Colorado Securities Commissioner, Alabama Securities Commission, Attorney General of the State of New York, Nebraska Department of Banking & Finance, Commissioner of the Tennessee Department of Commerce and Insurance, Securities Enforcement Branch, Office of the Georgia Secretary of State, South Carolina Attorney General, Dana Nessel, State of Alaska. (Attachments: #1 Additional Page(s) 239-9 - 382, #2 Additional Page(s) 383 - 500, #3 Additional Page(s) 501 - 586, #4 Additional Page(s) 587 - 691, #5 Additional Page(s) 692 - 779, #6 Additional Page(s) 780 - 1036, #7 Additional Page(s) 1037 - 1125, #8 Additional Page(s) 1126 - 1235, #9 Additional Page(s) 1236 - 1321, #10 Additional Page(s) 1322 - 1423, #11 Additional Page(s) 1424 - 1492) (axm)
September 22, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION for Leave to File a Brief in Excess of the Page Limit in Support of Its Motion for An Emergency Ex Parte Statutory Restraining Order filed by Alabama Securities Commission, Arizona Corporation Commission, Attorney General of the State of New York, California Commissioner of Business Oversight, Colorado Securities Commissioner, Commissioner of the Tennessee Department of Commerce and Insurance, Commodity Futures Trading Commission, Division of Insurance, Idaho Department of Finance, Indiana Securities Commissioner, Iowa Insurance Commissioner, Kentucky Department of Financial Institutions, Maine Securities Administrator, Mississippi Secretary of State, Nebraska Department of Banking & Finance, Dana Nessel, New Mexico Securities Division, Office of Financial Regulation, Office of the Attorney General and State of Florida, Office of the Georgia Secretary of State, Office of the Kansas Securities Commissioner, Office of the Nevada Secretary of State, Oklahoma Department of Securities, Douglas M Ommen, Securities Enforcement Branch, South Carolina Attorney General, South Carolina Secretary of State, South Dakota Department of Labor & Regulation, State of Alaska, State of Delaware, State of Florida, State of Hawaii, State of Maryland, State of Texas, State of Wisconsin, The People of the State of New York, Washington State Department of Financial Institutions, West Virginia Securities Commission. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (axm)
September 22, 2020 Filing 10 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing for Attorney Richard P. Foelber (Clerk Note: Filer states no fee is to be collected due to prior payment or waiver by MO 16 or prior order.) filed by Commodity Futures Trading Commission. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (axm)
September 22, 2020 Filing 9 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing for Attorney JonMarc Buffa (Clerk Note: Filer states no fee is to be collected due to prior payment or waiver by MO 16 or prior order.) filed by Commodity Futures Trading Commission. (axm) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/22/2020: #1 Proposed Order) (axm).
September 22, 2020 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Commodity Futures Trading Commission. (axm)
September 22, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Proceed Without Local Counsel filed by Commodity Futures Trading Commission. (axm)
September 22, 2020 Filing 6 Ex Parte Certification of JonMarc P Buffa in Support of Ex Parte Emergency Motion for Statutory Restraining Order filed by Commodity Futures Trading Commission. (axm)
September 22, 2020 Filing 5 Ex Parte Brief/Memorandum in Support re: #4 Ex Parte Emergency Motion for Statutory Restraining Order filed by Alabama Securities Commission, Arizona Corporation Commission, Attorney General of the State of New York, California Commissioner of Business Oversight, Colorado Securities Commissioner, Commissioner of the Tennessee Department of Commerce and Insurance, Commodity Futures Trading Commission, Division of Insurance, Idaho Department of Finance, Indiana Securities Commissioner, Iowa Insurance Commissioner, Kentucky Department of Financial Institutions, Maine Securities Administrator, Mississippi Secretary of State, Nebraska Department of Banking & Finance, Dana Nessel, New Mexico Securities Division, Office of Financial Regulation, Office of the Attorney General and State of Florida, Office of the Georgia Secretary of State, Office of the Kansas Securities Commissioner, Office of the Nevada Secretary of State, Oklahoma Department of Securities, Douglas M Ommen, Securities Enforcement Branch, South Carolina Attorney General, South Carolina Secretary of State, South Dakota Department of Labor & Regulation, State of Alaska, State of Delaware, State of Florida, State of Hawaii, State of Maryland, State of Texas, State of Wisconsin, The People of the State of New York, Washington State Department of Financial Institutions, West Virginia Securities Commission. (axm)
September 22, 2020 Filing 4 Ex Parte Emergency Motion for Statutory Restraining Order filed by Commodity Futures Trading Alabama Securities Commission, Arizona Corporation Commission, Attorney General of the State of New York, California Commissioner of Business Oversight, Colorado Securities Commissioner, Commissioner of the Tennessee Department of Commerce and Insurance, Commodity Futures Trading Commission, Division of Insurance, Idaho Department of Finance, Indiana Securities Commissioner, Iowa Insurance Commissioner, Kentucky Department of Financial Institutions, Maine Securities Administrator, Mississippi Secretary of State, Nebraska Department of Banking & Finance, Dana Nessel, New Mexico Securities Division, Office of Financial Regulation, Office of the Attorney General and State of Florida, Office of the Georgia Secretary of State, Office of the Kansas Securities Commissioner, Office of the Nevada Secretary of State, Oklahoma Department of Securities, Douglas M Ommen, Securities Enforcement Branch, South Carolina Attorney General, South Carolina Secretary of State, South Dakota Department of Labor & Regulation, State of Alaska, State of Delaware, State of Florida, State of Hawaii, State of Maryland, State of Texas, State of Wisconsin, The People of the State of New York, Washington State Department of Financial Institutions, West Virginia Securities Commission. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (axm)
September 22, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION to Temporarily Seal File filed by Commodity Futures Trading Commission with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (axm)
September 22, 2020 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against TMTE Inc, Barrick Capital Inc, Simon Batashvili, Chase Metals Inc, Chase Metals LLC, Lucas Thomas Erb, Tower Equity LLC filed by Arizona Corporation Commission, Alabama Securities Commission, Arizona Corporation Commission, Attorney General of the State of New York, California Commissioner of Business Oversight, Colorado Securities Commissioner, Commissioner of the Tennessee Department of Commerce and Insurance, Commodity Futures Trading Commission, Division of Insurance, Idaho Department of Finance, Indiana Securities Commissioner, Iowa Insurance Commissioner, Kentucky Department of Financial Institutions, Maine Securities Administrator, Mississippi Secretary of State, Nebraska Department of Banking & Finance, Dana Nessel, New Mexico Securities Division, Office of Financial Regulation, Office of the Attorney General and State of Florida, Office of the Georgia Secretary of State, Office of the Kansas Securities Commissioner, Office of the Nevada Secretary of State, Oklahoma Department of Securities, Douglas M Ommen, Securities Enforcement Branch, South Carolina Attorney General, South Carolina Secretary of State, South Dakota Department of Labor & Regulation, State of Alaska, State of Delaware, State of Florida, State of Hawaii, State of Maryland, State of Texas, State of Wisconsin, The People of the State of New York, Washington State Department of Financial Institutions, West Virginia Securities Commission. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (axm)
September 22, 2020 Filing 1 New Case Notes: A filing fee is not due for this case. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Horan). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (axm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Commodity Futures Trading Commission et al v. TMTE Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TMTE Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lucas Thomas Erb
Represented By: Arnold Augur Spencer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lucas Asher
Represented By: Arnold Augur Spencer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Luke Asher
Represented By: Arnold Augur Spencer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Simon Batashvili
Represented By: Arnold Augur Spencer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metals.com
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chase Metals LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tower Equity LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barrick Capital Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chase Metals Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Office of the Attorney General and State of Florida Office of Financial Regulation
Represented By: Victoria Ann Butler
Represented By: Albert Gregory Melchior
Represented By: Sarah Cortvriend
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Texas
Represented By: Lea N Brigtsen
Represented By: Christina Cella
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Florida
Represented By: Victoria Ann Butler
Represented By: Albert Gregory Melchior
Represented By: Sarah Cortvriend
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dana Nessel
Represented By: Crystal Utley Secoy
Represented By: Aaron W Levin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: South Dakota Department of Labor & Regulation
Represented By: Clayton Grueb
Represented By: Clayton Edward Grueb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Douglas M Ommen
Represented By: Adam Joseph Kenworthy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mississippi Secretary of State
Represented By: Seth Whittaker Shannon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alabama Securities Commission
Represented By: Jeffrey Adrian Brown, Jr
Represented By: Anne Withers Gunter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arizona Corporation Commission
Represented By: Christopher Alexander Nichols
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Commissioner of the Tennessee Department of Commerce and Insurance
Represented By: James Patrick Urban
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Office of the Georgia Secretary of State
Represented By: Ronald J Stay
Represented By: Logan B Winkles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Maryland
Represented By: Max F Brauer
Represented By: Max Frederick Brauer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Indiana Securities Commissioner
Represented By: Jefferson Stewart Garn
Represented By: Meredith B McCutcheon
Represented By: Patricia Orloff Erdmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Alaska
Represented By: John Hassell Haley
Represented By: Robert Schmidt
Represented By: Robert Hans Schmidt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: West Virginia Securities Commission
Represented By: Michael Benjamin Nusbaum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Wisconsin
Represented By: Shannon A Conlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Attorney General of the State of New York
Represented By: Tatyana Trakht
Represented By: Peter Pope
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Office of the Nevada Secretary of State
Represented By: Erin Houston
Represented By: Erin Marie Houston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Oklahoma Department of Securities
Represented By: Robert Edward Fagnant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Colorado Securities Commissioner
Represented By: Janna K. Fischer
Represented By: Robert William Finke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Washington State Department of Financial Institutions
Represented By: Ian McDonald
Represented By: Ian S McDonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Commodity Futures Trading Commission
Represented By: JonMarc Phillip Buffa
Represented By: Gregg D Bernstein
Represented By: Richard P Foelber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: South Carolina Attorney General
Represented By: Shannon A Wiley
Represented By: Jonathan Blanton Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Delaware
Represented By: Katherine M Devanney
Represented By: Jillian Lazar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Idaho Department of Finance
Represented By: Loren Messerly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nebraska Department of Banking & Finance
Represented By: Joshua Rand Shasserre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The People of the State of New York
Represented By: Tatyana Trakht
Represented By: Peter Pope
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: South Carolina Secretary of State
Represented By: Shannon A Wiley
Represented By: Jonathan Blanton Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: New Mexico Securities Division
Represented By: Alissa Nicole Berger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: California Commissioner of Business Oversight
Represented By: Sean Rooney
Represented By: Mary Ann Smith
Represented By: Danielle A Stoumbos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Office of the Kansas Securities Commissioner
Represented By: Thomas E Knutzen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Division of Insurance
Represented By: Clayton Grueb
Represented By: Clayton Edward Grueb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maine Securities Administrator
Represented By: Gregg D Bernstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Hawaii
Represented By: Patricia Moy
Represented By: Rayni Mayuri Nakamura-Watanabe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kentucky Department of Financial Institutions
Represented By: Catherine Falconer
Represented By: Gary Allan Stephens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Securities Enforcement Branch
Represented By: Patricia Moy
Represented By: Rayni Mayuri Nakamura-Watanabe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Receiver: Kelly Crawford
Represented By: Peter C Lewis
Represented By: Kelly M Crawford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?