Bibbs v. Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Inc et al
Plaintiff: Korton Bibbs
Defendant: Teva Women's Health LLC, Teva Women, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Inc, Duramed Pharmaceuticals Inc a division of Barr Pharmaceuticals Inc doing business as Teva Women's Health Inc, The Cooper Companies Inc, CooperSurgical Inc and Teva Women's Health Inc
Case Number: 3:2020cv02979
Filed: September 25, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Ada Brown
Nature of Suit: Torts/Pers Inj: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Pers Inj/Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 18, 2020 Filing 25 RESPONSE filed by CooperSurgical Inc, Duramed Pharmaceuticals Inc, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Inc, Teva Women's Health Inc, Teva Women's Health LLC, Teva Women's Health LLC, The Cooper Companies Inc re: #24 MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending a Decision by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (De Santos, Laura)
October 30, 2020 Filing 24 MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending a Decision by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation filed by Korton Bibbs with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit(s) A, #3 Exhibit(s) B) (Kassan, Randi)
October 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 SCHEDULING ORDER: Trial set for three-week docket beginning 4/6/2022 before Judge Ada Brown. Joinder of Parties due by 12/16/2020. Amended Pleadings due by 12/16/2020. Motions due by 10/22/2021. Discovery due by 8/9/2021. Pretrial Order due by 3/8/2022. Pretrial Materials due by 3/8/2022. Pretrial Conference set for 4/5/2022 10:00 AM before Judge Ada Brown. Deadline for mediation is on or before 5/15/2021. (Ordered by Judge Ada Brown on 10/23/2020) (mjr)
October 20, 2020 Filing 22 Joint Submission on Discovery Matters Joint Rule 26(f) Report of Planning Conference by CooperSurgical Inc, Duramed Pharmaceuticals Inc, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Inc, Teva Women's Health Inc, Teva Women's Health LLC, Teva Women's Health LLC, The Cooper Companies Inc. (De Santos, Laura)
October 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #20 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Frederick M. Erny. Important Reminder: Unless excused for cause, an attorney who is not an ECF user must register within 14 days of the date the attorney appears in a case pursuant to LR 5.1(f) and LCrR 49.2(g). (Ordered by Judge Ada Brown on 10/16/2020) (chmb)
October 14, 2020 Filing 20 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing (Filing fee $100; Receipt number 0539-11263320) filed by CooperSurgical Inc, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Inc, Teva Women's Health Inc, Teva Women's Health LLC, Teva Women's Health LLC, The Cooper Companies Inc (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order) (Erny, Fredrick)
October 7, 2020 Filing 19 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Laura E De Santos on behalf of CooperSurgical Inc, Duramed Pharmaceuticals Inc, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Inc, Teva Women's Health Inc, Teva Women's Health LLC, Teva Women's Health LLC, The Cooper Companies Inc. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (De Santos, Laura)
October 1, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Randi Alyson Kassan on behalf of Korton Bibbs. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Kassan, Randi)
September 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ELECTRONIC ORDER: Unless exempted, Local Rule 83.10(a) requires the appearance of local counsel where counsel of record for a party does not reside in or maintain their principal office in this district. To date, one or more of the parties has failed to comply with Local Rule 83.10. The parties have twenty days from this date to comply if they have not already done so. (Ordered by Judge Ada Brown on 9/30/2020) (chmb)
September 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 STATUS REPORT ORDER: Joint Status Report Due Three (3) Weeks from the Date of this Order. (Ordered by Judge Ada Brown on 9/29/2020) (ndt)
September 25, 2020 Filing 15 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Rutherford). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (mjr)
September 25, 2020 Filing 14 Case electronically transferred in from District of Pennsylvania Eastern; Case Number 2:20-cv-04137. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas should seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. Copy of NEF to be sent US Mail to parties not electronically noticed. Modified on 9/28/2020 (mjr).
September 1, 2020 Doc. 13 mailed to Attorney TIM CLARK. (mas, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 9/28/2020.]
August 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER THAT THE STIPULATION OF THE PARTIES TO TRANSFER VENUE OF THIS ACTION IS APPROVED. THIS ACTION IS TRANSFERRED TO THE PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. &1404 (a) TO UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT FOR THE NORTHERN DISTRICT OF TEXAS, DALLAS DIVISION; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE HARVEY BARTLE, III ON 8/31/20. 9/1/20 ENTERED AND E-MAILED, NOT MAILED TO COUNSEL.(JL ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 9/28/2020.]
August 31, 2020 Filing 12 STIPULATION TO TRANSFER VENUE TO THE UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT FOR THE NORTHERN DISTRICT OF TEXAS, DALLAS DIVISION, CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. (JL ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 9/28/2020.]
August 24, 2020 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint by TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH, LLC, INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH, INC..(RUBENSTEIN, BRIAN) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 9/28/2020.]
August 24, 2020 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint by TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH INC., INDVIDIUALLY, AND AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO, DURAMED PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. A DIVISION OF BARR PHARMACEUTICALS, INC..(RUBENSTEIN, BRIAN) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 9/28/2020.]
August 24, 2020 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint by THE COOPER COMPANIES, INC..(RUBENSTEIN, BRIAN) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 9/28/2020.]
August 24, 2020 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint by COOPERSURGICAL, INC..(RUBENSTEIN, BRIAN) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 9/28/2020.]
August 24, 2020 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint by TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC..(RUBENSTEIN, BRIAN) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 9/28/2020.]
August 24, 2020 Filing 6 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by COOPERSURGICAL, INC., DURAMED PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. A DIVISION OF BARR PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. D/B/A TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH, INC., TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC., TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH INC., INDVIDIUALLY, AND AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO, DURAMED PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. A DIVISION OF BARR PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH, LLC f/k/a TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH, INC., TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH, LLC, INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH, INC., THE COOPER COMPANIES, INC..(RUBENSTEIN, BRIAN) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 9/28/2020.]
August 24, 2020 Filing 5 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by COOPERSURGICAL, INC., DURAMED PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. A DIVISION OF BARR PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. D/B/A TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH, INC., TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC., TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH INC., INDVIDIUALLY, AND AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO, DURAMED PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. A DIVISION OF BARR PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH, LLC f/k/a TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH, INC., TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH, LLC, INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH, INC., THE COOPER COMPANIES, INC..(RUBENSTEIN, BRIAN) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 9/28/2020.]
August 24, 2020 Filing 4 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by COOPERSURGICAL, INC., DURAMED PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. A DIVISION OF BARR PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. D/B/A TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH, INC., TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC., TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH INC., INDVIDIUALLY, AND AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO, DURAMED PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. A DIVISION OF BARR PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH, LLC f/k/a TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH, INC., TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH, LLC, INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH, INC., THE COOPER COMPANIES, INC..(RUBENSTEIN, BRIAN) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 9/28/2020.]
August 24, 2020 Filing 3 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by COOPERSURGICAL, INC., DURAMED PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. A DIVISION OF BARR PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. D/B/A TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH, INC., TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC., TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH INC., INDVIDIUALLY, AND AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO, DURAMED PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. A DIVISION OF BARR PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH, LLC f/k/a TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH, INC., TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH, LLC, INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH, INC., THE COOPER COMPANIES, INC..(RUBENSTEIN, BRIAN) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 9/28/2020.]
August 24, 2020 Filing 2 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by COOPERSURGICAL, INC., DURAMED PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. A DIVISION OF BARR PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. D/B/A TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH, INC., TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC., TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH INC., INDVIDIUALLY, AND AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO, DURAMED PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. A DIVISION OF BARR PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH, LLC f/k/a TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH, INC., TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH, LLC, INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH, INC., THE COOPER COMPANIES, INC..(RUBENSTEIN, BRIAN) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 9/28/2020.]
August 24, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by DURAMED PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. A DIVISION OF BARR PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. D/B/A TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH, INC., THE COOPER COMPANIES, INC., TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH INC., INDVIDIUALLY, AND AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO, DURAMED PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. A DIVISION OF BARR PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH, LLC, INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH, INC., TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH, LLC f/k/a TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH, INC., COOPERSURGICAL, INC., TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0313-14514466), from the Court of Common Pleas of Philadelphia County Case No. 200401402, filed by DURAMED PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. A DIVISION OF BARR PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. D/B/A TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH, INC., THE COOPER COMPANIES, INC., TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH INC., INDVIDIUALLY, AND AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO, DURAMED PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. A DIVISION OF BARR PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH, LLC, INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH, INC., TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH, LLC f/k/a TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH, INC., COOPERSURGICAL, INC., TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC..(RUBENSTEIN, BRIAN) Modified on 8/24/2020 (md, ).[Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 9/28/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bibbs v. Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Women's Health LLC
Represented By: Fredrick M Erny
Represented By: Brian Rubenstein
Represented By: Sona J Garcia
Represented By: Laura E De Santos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Women
Represented By: Fredrick M Erny
Represented By: Brian Rubenstein
Represented By: Sona J Garcia
Represented By: Laura E De Santos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Inc
Represented By: Fredrick M Erny
Represented By: Brian Rubenstein
Represented By: Sona J Garcia
Represented By: Laura E De Santos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Duramed Pharmaceuticals Inc a division of Barr Pharmaceuticals Inc doing business as Teva Women's Health Inc
Represented By: Brian Rubenstein
Represented By: Fredrick M Erny,
Represented By: Laura E De Santos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Cooper Companies Inc
Represented By: Fredrick M Erny
Represented By: Brian Rubenstein
Represented By: Sona J Garcia
Represented By: Laura E De Santos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CooperSurgical Inc
Represented By: Fredrick M Erny
Represented By: Brian Rubenstein
Represented By: Laura E De Santos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Women's Health Inc
Represented By: Fredrick M Erny
Represented By: Brian Rubenstein
Represented By: Sona J Garcia
Represented By: Laura E De Santos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Korton Bibbs
Represented By: Kara D HIll
Represented By: Tobias Millrood
Represented By: Tim Clark
Represented By: Randi Alyson Kassan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?