MedARC LLC v. Texas Municipal League Intergovernmental Risk Pool et al
Plaintiff: MedARC, LLC and MedARC LLC
Defendant: Texas Municipal League Intergovernmental Risk Pool and Does 1-10
Not Classified By Court: Case Admin Sup and Harlin D Hale
Case Number: 3:2020cv03041
Filed: October 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: David C Godbey
Referring Judge: Ed Kinkeade
Nature of Suit: Contract: Insurance
Cause of Action: 29:1001
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 17, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Victoria W Thomas on behalf of Texas Municipal League Intergovernmental Risk Pool. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Thomas, Victoria)
November 2, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Extension of Time to File Answer and/or other responses to Plaintiff's Original Complaint filed by Texas Municipal League Intergovernmental Risk Pool (Thomas, Victoria)
October 27, 2020 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint , Civil Case Cover Sheet, Certificate of Interested Persons and Notice of Related Case served on Registered Agent, Leah Simon on 10/21/2020. (Biermacher, Kenneth)
October 23, 2020 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint served on Patti Ledesma of Texas Municipal League on 10/21/2020. (Biermacher, Kenneth)
October 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER OF REFERENCE: Under authority of 28 U.S.C. sec. 157(a), this case is referred to United States Bankruptcy Judge Harlin D. Hale, who has a related case, for pretrial management. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 10/14/2020) (jmg)
October 6, 2020 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Does 1-10, Texas Municipal League Intergovernmental Risk Pool. (mla)
October 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ELECTRONIC ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge David C Godbey for all further proceedings. Judge Ed Kinkeade no longer assigned to case. (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 10/5/2020) (chmb)
October 2, 2020 Filing 4 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Rutherford). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (jmg)
October 2, 2020 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by MedARC, LLC. (Biermacher, Kenneth)
October 2, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Related Case filed by MedARC, LLC (Biermacher, Kenneth)
October 2, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against Texas Municipal League Intergovernmental Risk Pool filed by MedARC, LLC. (Filing fee $400; Receipt number 0539-11231774) Clerk to issue summons(es). In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Cover Sheet) (Biermacher, Kenneth)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MedARC LLC v. Texas Municipal League Intergovernmental Risk Pool et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Texas Municipal League Intergovernmental Risk Pool
Represented By: Peter G Smith
Represented By: Victoria W Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MedARC, LLC
Represented By: Donald A Waltz
Represented By: Kenneth W Biermacher
Represented By: Andrew D Robertson
Represented By: Lawrence T Bowman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MedARC LLC
Represented By: Donald A Waltz
Represented By: Kenneth W Biermacher
Represented By: Andrew D Robertson
Represented By: Lawrence T Bowman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Case Admin Sup
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Harlin D Hale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?