Tabboula v. The Hartford Life & Accident Insurance Company
Petitioner: Layla Tabboula and Layla Lovins
Respondent: The Hartford Life & Accident Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2020cv03122
Filed: October 14, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Jane J Boyle
Nature of Suit: Labor: Employee Retirement Income Security Act (ERISA)
Cause of Action: 29:1001
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 14, 2020 Filing 11 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Horan). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (mjr)
October 14, 2020 Filing 10 Case electronically transferred in from District of Texas Eastern; Case Number 2:20-cv-00264. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas should seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. Copy of NEF to be sent US Mail to parties not electronically noticed.
October 1, 2020 NOTICE the Scheduling Conference set for October 13, 2020 at 11:00 am is CANCELLED. (bga, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/15/2020.]
September 30, 2020 NOTICE of Hearing: Scheduling Conference set for 10/13/2020 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne. (bga, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/15/2020.]
September 28, 2020 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by The Hartford Life & Accident Insurance Company.(Mathisen, Eric) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/15/2020.]
September 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Motion to Change Venue. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 9/22/2020. (nkl, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/15/2020.]
September 21, 2020 Filing 7 Unopposed MOTION to Change Venue and Brief in Support by The Hartford Life & Accident Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Mathisen, Eric) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/21/2020: #2 Revised Propsed Order) (nkl, ). [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/15/2020.]
August 31, 2020 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for The Hartford Life & Accident Insurance Company to 9/28/2020. 26 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( nkl, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/15/2020.]
August 31, 2020 Filing 6 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re The Hartford Life & Accident Insurance Company.( Mathisen, Eric) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/15/2020.]
August 31, 2020 ***FILED IN ERROR - was filed using the wrong docket event. Document # 5, Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (nkl, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/15/2020.]
August 31, 2020 Filing 5 FILED IN ERROR Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by The Hartford Life & Accident Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Mathisen, Eric) Modified on 8/31/2020 (nkl, ). [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/15/2020.]
August 31, 2020 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by The Hartford Life & Accident Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Hartford Life, Inc., Corporate Parent Hartford Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent The Hartford Financial Services Group, Inc. for The Hartford Life & Accident Insurance Company. (Mathisen, Eric) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/15/2020.]
August 31, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Eric P Mathisen on behalf of The Hartford Life & Accident Insurance Company (Mathisen, Eric) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/15/2020.]
August 12, 2020 Filing 2 SUMMONS Issued as to The Hartford Life & Accident Insurance Company By and Through Its Registered Agent CT Corporation System. (nkl, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/15/2020.]
August 12, 2020 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (nkl, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/15/2020.]
August 12, 2020 Case Assigned to District Judge Rodney Gilstrap and Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne. (nkl, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/15/2020.]
August 11, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against The Hartford Life & Accident Insurance Company ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-7941156.), filed by Layla Tabboula. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Goodman, Robert) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/15/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tabboula v. The Hartford Life & Accident Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Layla Tabboula
Represented By: Robert E Goodman, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Layla Lovins
Represented By: Robert E Goodman, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: The Hartford Life & Accident Insurance Company
Represented By: Eric P Mathisen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?