Celebration IP LLC v. STMicroelectronics Inc
Petitioner: Celebration IP LLC
Respondent: STMicroelectronics Inc
Case Number: 3:2020cv03167
Filed: October 20, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Ada Brown
Nature of Suit: Property Rights: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 20, 2020 Filing 16 Report to Patent/Trademark Office of Initiating Document. Form AO 120 e-mailed to notice_of_suit@uspto.gov. (jmg)
October 19, 2020 Filing 15 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Toliver). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (jmg)
October 19, 2020 Filing 14 Case electronically transferred in from District of Texas Eastern; Case Number 2:20-cv-00162. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas should seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. Copy of NEF to be sent US Mail to parties not electronically noticed.
August 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #8 Motion to Dismiss for Improper Venue or to Transfer. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 8/20/2020. (nkl, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/20/2020.]
August 19, 2020 Filing 12 STIPULATION TO TRANSFER VENUE TO THE NORTHERN DISTRICT OF TEXAS by Celebration IP LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rabicoff, Isaac) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/20/2020.]
August 17, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Gregory Blake Thompson on behalf of STMicroelectronics Inc (Thompson, Gregory) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/20/2020.]
August 17, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by James Mark Mann on behalf of STMicroelectronics Inc (Mann, James) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/20/2020.]
August 6, 2020 Filing 9 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by STMicroelectronics Inc identifying Corporate Parent STMicroelectronics N.V. for STMicroelectronics Inc. (Patel, Vishal) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/20/2020.]
August 6, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss for Improper Venue or to Transfer by STMicroelectronics Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Patel, Vishal) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/20/2020.]
June 19, 2020 Defendant's Unopposed SECOND Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for STMicroelectronics Inc to 8/6/2020. 15 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( ch, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/20/2020.]
June 19, 2020 Filing 7 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re STMicroelectronics Inc.( Patel, Vishal) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/20/2020.]
June 18, 2020 Defendant's Unopposed FIRST Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for STMicroelectronics Inc to 7/22/2020. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( ch, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/20/2020.]
June 18, 2020 Filing 6 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re STMicroelectronics Inc.( Patel, Vishal) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/20/2020.]
May 29, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Issued as to STMicroelectronics Inc. c/o The Corporation Trust Company(nkl, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/20/2020.]
May 29, 2020 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (nkl, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/20/2020.]
May 29, 2020 Case Assigned to District Judge Rodney Gilstrap. (nkl, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/20/2020.]
May 29, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Isaac Phillip Rabicoff on behalf of Celebration IP LLC (Rabicoff, Isaac) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/20/2020.]
May 29, 2020 Filing 3 Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Rabicoff, Isaac) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/20/2020.]
May 29, 2020 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Celebration IP LLC (Rabicoff, Isaac) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/20/2020.]
May 29, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND Patent Infringement against STMicroelectronics Inc ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-7811984.), filed by Celebration IP LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Rabicoff, Isaac)[Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/20/2020.] Modified text on 10/20/2020 (jmg).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Celebration IP LLC v. STMicroelectronics Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: STMicroelectronics Inc
Represented By: G Blake Thompson
Represented By: J Mark Mann
Represented By: Vishal H Patel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Celebration IP LLC
Represented By: Isaac Philip Rabicoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?