Beauty Plus Trading Co Inc et al v. I & I Hair Corporation
Plaintiff: Beauty Plus Trading Co Inc doing business as Janet Collection and Hair Plus Trading Co Inc doing business as Femi Collection
Defendant: I & I Hair Corporation
Case Number: 3:2020cv03213
Filed: October 21, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Office: Dallas Office
Presiding Judge: Ada Brown
Nature of Suit: Property Rights: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1051
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 21, 2020 Filing 22 Report to Patent/Trademark Office of Initiating Document. Form AO 120 e-mailed to notice_of_suit@uspto.gov. (mjr)
October 21, 2020 Filing 21 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Horan). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (mjr)
October 21, 2020 Filing 20 Case electronically transferred in from District of New Jersey; Case Number 2:20-cv-09268. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas should seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. Copy of NEF to be sent US Mail to parties not electronically noticed.
October 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #10 Motion to Dismiss; that, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a), this action be and hereby is TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the Northern District of Texas. ***CIVIL CASE TERMINATED. Signed by Judge Stanley R. Chesler on 10/21/2020. (ld, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 10/21/2020.]
October 21, 2020 Filing 18 OPINION. Signed by Judge Stanley R. Chesler on 10/21/2020. (ld, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 10/21/2020.]
September 29, 2020 Filing 17 Letter from John H. Choi, Esq. to Hon. Stanley R. Chesler Requesting Oral Argument re #10 MOTION to Dismiss . (CHOI, JOHN) [Transferred from New Jersey on 10/21/2020.]
September 29, 2020 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor: Telephone Conference held on 9/29/2020. (tjg, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 10/21/2020.]
September 28, 2020 Filing 16 REPLY to Response to Motion filed by I & I HAIR CORPORATION re #10 MOTION to Dismiss (BENTLEY, LISA) [Transferred from New Jersey on 10/21/2020.]
September 21, 2020 Filing 15 MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by BEAUTY PLUS TRADING CO. INC., HAIR PLUS TRADING CO., INC. re #10 MOTION to Dismiss (Attachments: #1 Declaration of John H. Choi, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit 14, #16 Exhibit 15, #17 Text of Proposed Order)(CHOI, JOHN) [Transferred from New Jersey on 10/21/2020.]
September 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 TEXT ORDER: The Court will convert the September 29,2020 R. 16 conference to a telephone status conference.. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 9/1/20. (tjg, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 10/21/2020.]
August 31, 2020 Filing 13 Letter from I&I Hair Corporation. (BENTLEY, LISA) [Transferred from New Jersey on 10/21/2020.]
August 26, 2020 Filing 12 Letter from John H. Choi, Esq. to William T. Walsh, Clerk of Court re #10 MOTION to Dismiss , Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings,. (CHOI, JOHN) [Transferred from New Jersey on 10/21/2020.]
August 21, 2020 Notice of Judicial Preferences. #Click here for the Judge's Individual Procedure Requirements. (tjg, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 10/21/2020.]
August 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 TEXT ORDER: The Court will hold an initial conference (rule 16) before U.S.M.J. C. Waldor by telephone on 9/29/20 at 10am. Plaintiff shall initiate the call and local counsel for any/all parties must participate. Parties are to submit a completed Pretrial Scheduling Order (for Judge Salas cases, please use her dedicated PTSO found in the same location) found in the Notice of Judicial Preferences link to chambers via email at CLW_Orders@njd.uscourts.gov no later than 3 days before the scheduled conference.. Please contact chambers with any questions or concerns at (973) 776 7862. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 8/21/20. (tjg, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 10/21/2020.]
August 19, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #10 MOTION to Dismiss . Motion set for 9/21/2020 before Judge Stanley R. Chesler. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (ld, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 10/21/2020.]
August 18, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss by I & I HAIR CORPORATION. Responses due by 9/8/2020 (Attachments: #1 Brief Opening Brief, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(BENTLEY, LISA) [Transferred from New Jersey on 10/21/2020.]
August 18, 2020 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by I & I HAIR CORPORATION identifying None as Corporate Parent.. (BENTLEY, LISA) [Transferred from New Jersey on 10/21/2020.]
August 18, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by LISA D. BENTLEY on behalf of I & I HAIR CORPORATION (BENTLEY, LISA) [Transferred from New Jersey on 10/21/2020.]
July 24, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS ISSUED as to I & I HAIR CORPORATION. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (ld, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 10/21/2020.]
July 24, 2020 Filing 6 Corrected AO120 Patent/Trademark Form filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2) (ld, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 10/21/2020.]
July 24, 2020 Filing 5 AO120 Patent/Trademark Form filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2) (ld, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 10/21/2020.]
July 22, 2020 Case assigned to Judge Stanley R. Chesler and Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor. (jr) [Transferred from New Jersey on 10/21/2020.]
July 22, 2020 Filing 4 Exhibit to #1 Complaint, Exhibit 5 by BEAUTY PLUS TRADING CO. INC.. (CHOI, JOHN) [Transferred from New Jersey on 10/21/2020.]
July 22, 2020 Filing 3 Exhibit to #1 Complaint, Civil Cover Sheet by BEAUTY PLUS TRADING CO. INC.. (CHOI, JOHN) [Transferred from New Jersey on 10/21/2020.]
July 22, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by BEAUTY PLUS TRADING CO. INC.. (CHOI, JOHN) [Transferred from New Jersey on 10/21/2020.]
July 22, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against I & I HAIR CORPORATION, INC. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number ANJDC-11107753) with JURY DEMAND, filed by BEAUTY PLUS TRADING CO. INC., HAIR PLUS TRADING CO., INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(CHOI, JOHN). [Transferred from New Jersey on 10/21/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Beauty Plus Trading Co Inc et al v. I & I Hair Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Beauty Plus Trading Co Inc doing business as Janet Collection
Represented By: John Hoon Choi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hair Plus Trading Co Inc doing business as Femi Collection
Represented By: John Hoon Choi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: I & I Hair Corporation
Represented By: Lisa D Bentley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?