MedARC LLC v. Meritain Health Inc
Plaintiff: MedARC LLC
Defendant: Meritain Health Inc and Case Admin Sup
Interested Party: Harlin D Hale
Case Number: 3:2020cv03281
Filed: October 30, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: David C Godbey
Referring Judge: Sam A Lindsay
Nature of Suit: Contract: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER OF REFERENCE: Under authority of 28 U.S.C. sec. 157(a), this case is referred to United States Bankruptcy Judge Harlin D. Hale, who has a related case, for pretrial management. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 11/13/2020) (ykp)
November 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge David C Godbey for all further proceedings. Judge Sam A. Lindsay no longer assigned to case. (Ordered by Judge Sam A. Lindsay on 11/6/2020) (mjr)
October 30, 2020 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT, see document #1 for image, by Meritain Health Inc identifying Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate CVS Health Corporation, Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate Prodigy Health Group Inc for Meritain Health Inc. (mla)
October 30, 2020 Filing 4 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Horan). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (hml)
October 30, 2020 Filing 3 Payment for #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Meritain Health Inc. ($400; Receipt number 0539-11315852). (Shely, John)
October 30, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Related Case filed by Meritain Health Inc. (twd)
October 30, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Meritain Health Inc. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (twd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MedARC LLC v. Meritain Health Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MedARC LLC
Represented By: Jonathan A Aldaco
Represented By: Craig A Albert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Meritain Health Inc
Represented By: John B Shely
Represented By: Kelsey J Hope
Represented By: Tonya M Gray
Represented By: M Katherine Strahan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Case Admin Sup
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Harlin D Hale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?