Davis v. Wal-Mart Stores Inc et al
Plaintiff: Douglas L Davis
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores Texas LLC, Angela Johnson, Wal-Mart Stores Inc, Walmart Stores Inc and Brosnan Risk Consultants Ltd
Case Number: 3:2020cv03316
Filed: November 4, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Sam R Cummings
Nature of Suit: Torts/Pers Inj: Other Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 30, 2020 Filing 14 Summons Issued as to Brosnan Risk Consultants Ltd. (mjr)
December 30, 2020 Filing 13 Request for Clerk to issue Summons filed by Douglas L Davis. (Bernal, Philip)
December 28, 2020 Filing 12 THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against Angela Johnson, Wal-Mart Stores Texas LLC, Walmart Stores Inc, Brosnan Risk Consultants Ltd filed by Douglas L Davis. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (axm)
December 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Leave to File Third Amended Complaint. (Unless the document has already been filed, clerk to enter the document as of the date of this order.) (Ordered by Senior Judge Sam R Cummings on 12/28/2020) (axm)
December 24, 2020 Filing 10 RESPONSE filed by Douglas L Davis re: #9 Response/Objection (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) EXHIBIT A, #2 Proposed Order Proposed Order on Objections) (Bernal, Philip)
December 22, 2020 Filing 9 RESPONSE filed by Wal-Mart Stores Texas LLC, Walmart Stores Inc re: #7 MOTION to Remand to 95th Judicial District Court. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A affidavit) (Rhine, Bevan)
December 22, 2020 Filing 8 First MOTION for Leave to File Third Amended Petition filed by Douglas L Davis. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Proposed Order) (Bernal, Philip)
December 1, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION to Remand to 95th Judicial District Court` filed by Douglas L Davis (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Bernal, Philip)
November 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 3/15/2021. Discovery due by 4/11/2022. Joinder of Parties due by 3/15/2021. Motions due by 11/15/2021. The above case is set for trial at 9:00 a.m. on 5/2/2022 09:00 AM, in the United States District Courtroom, Earle Cabell Federal Building, Dallas, Texas before Senior Judge Sam R Cummings. (Ordered by Senior Judge Sam R Cummings on 11/23/2020) (ykp)
November 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #4 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Philip G. Bernal. Important Reminder: Unless excused for cause, an attorney who is not an ECF user must register within 14 days of the date the attorney appears in a case pursuant to LR 5.1(f) and LCrR 49.2(g). (Ordered by Senior Judge Sam R Cummings on 11/16/2020) (ykp)
November 12, 2020 Filing 4 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing (Filing fee $100; Receipt number 0539-11352099) filed by Douglas L Davis (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Proposed Order) (Bernal, Philip)
November 4, 2020 Filing 3 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Horan). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (hml)
November 4, 2020 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Wal-Mart Stores Texas LLC Wal-Mart Stores Inc identifying Corporate Parent/other Affiliates WSE Management LLC, Wal-Mart Stores East LLC, and Sam's West Inc for Wal-Mart Stores Inc (Rhine, Bevan) Modified Corporate Parents on 11/4/2020 (hml).
November 4, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH JURY DEMAND filed by Wal-Mart Stores Texas, LLC, Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.. (Filing fee $400; receipt number 0539-11328503) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A index, #2 Exhibit(s) B state docket, #3 Exhibit(s) C state pldgs, #4 Exhibit(s) D discl stmt, #5 Cover Sheet, #6 Cover Sheet Supplement) (Rhine, Bevan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Davis v. Wal-Mart Stores Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores Texas LLC
Represented By: Bevan A Rhine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Angela Johnson
Represented By: Bevan A Rhine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores Inc
Represented By: Bevan A Rhine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walmart Stores Inc
Represented By: Bevan A Rhine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brosnan Risk Consultants Ltd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Douglas L Davis
Represented By: Philip G Bernal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?