UBS Securities LLC et al v. Highland Capital Management LP
Appellee: Highland Capital Management, L.P. and Highland Capital Management LP
Appellant: UBS AG, London Branch, UBS Securities LLC and UBS AG London Branch
Not Classified By Court: Case Admin Sup and Stacey G Jernigan
Intervenor Defendant: Highland Crusader Fund, Ltd., Highland Crusader Fund, L.P., Redeemer Committee of Highland Crusader Fund, Highland Crusader Fund II, Ltd. and Highland Crusader Offshore Partners, L.P.
Case Number: 3:2020cv03408
Filed: November 13, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: A Joe Fish
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy: Appeal 28 USC 158
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 28, 2020 Filing 26 REPLY filed by Highland Crusader Fund II, Ltd, Highland Crusader Fund, L.P., Highland Crusader Fund, Ltd, Highland Crusader Offshore Partners, L.P., Redeemer Committee of Highland Crusader Fund re: #15 MOTION to Intervene as Appellees (Platt, Mark)
December 22, 2020 Filing 25 ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to #20 Certificate Of Interested Persons/Disclosure Statement by Appellee Highland Capital Management LP. (Annable, Zachery) Modified text on 12/23/2020 (mjr).
December 21, 2020 Filing 24 Appendix in Support filed by UBS AG London Branch, UBS Securities LLC re #23 Response/Objection (Tomkowiak, Sarah)
December 21, 2020 Filing 23 OBJECTION filed by UBS AG London Branch, UBS Securities LLC re: #15 MOTION to Intervene as Appellees (Tomkowiak, Sarah) Modified text on 12/22/2020 (jmg).
December 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ELECTRONIC ORDER: The appellants' unopposed motion to accept sealed records designated as part of the record on appeal pursuant to Federal Rule of Bankruptcy Procedure 8009(f) (docket entry 21) is GRANTED. SO ORDERED. (Ordered by Senior Judge A. Joe Fish on 12/21/2020) (chmb)
December 21, 2020 Filing 21 Unopposed MOTION to Accept Sealed Records Designated as Part of the Record on Appeal filed by UBS AG London Branch, UBS Securities LLC (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Tomkowiak, Sarah)
December 16, 2020 Filing 20 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Highland Capital Management LP. (Annable, Zachery)
December 16, 2020 Filing 19 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Highland Crusader Fund II, Ltd, Highland Crusader Fund, LP, Highland Crusader Fund, Ltd, Highland Crusader Offshore Partners, LP, Redeemer Committee of Highland Crusader Fund. (Platt, Mark)
December 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ELECTRONIC ORDER: The court has considered the application of admission pro hac vice of Terri L. Mascherin (docket entry 17). It is ORDERED that the application of Terri L. Mascherin is GRANTED. The clerk of court shall deposit the application fee to the account of the Non-Appropriated Fund of this court. It is further ORDERED that if the applicant has not already done so, the applicant must register as an ECF user within 14 days. See L.R. 5.1(f). (Ordered by Senior Judge A. Joe Fish on 12/16/2020) (chmb)
December 15, 2020 Filing 17 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing for Attorney Terri L. Mascherin (Filing fee $100; Receipt number 0539-11444937) filed by Highland Crusader Fund II, Ltd., Highland Crusader Fund, L.P., Highland Crusader Fund, Ltd., Highland Crusader Offshore Partners, L.P., Redeemer Committee of Highland Crusader Fund (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Platt, Mark)
December 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ELECTRONIC ORDER: The court has considered the application of admission pro hac vice of Marc B. Hankin (docket entry 14). It is ORDERED that the application of Marc B. Hankin is GRANTED. The clerk of court shall deposit the application fee to the account of the Non-Appropriated Fund of this court. It is further ORDERED that if the applicant has not already done so, the applicant must register as an ECF user within 14 days. See L.R. 5.1(f). (Ordered by Senior Judge A. Joe Fish on 12/14/2020) (chmb)
December 14, 2020 Filing 15 MOTION to Intervene as Appellees filed by Highland Crusader Fund II, Ltd., Highland Crusader Fund, L.P., Highland Crusader Fund, Ltd., Highland Crusader Offshore Partners, L.P., Redeemer Committee of Highland Crusader Fund (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Platt, Mark) (Document 15 replaced on 12/14/2020 to remove duplicative documents) (ctf).
December 14, 2020 Filing 14 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing for Attorney Marc B. Hankin (Filing fee $100; Receipt number 0539-11438476) filed by Redeemer Committee of Highland Crusader Fund, Highland Crusader Offshore Partners, L.P., Highland Crusader Fund, L.P., Highland Crusader Fund, Ltd., Highland Crusader Fund II, Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order). Party Redeemer Committee of Highland Capital Crusader Fund, Highland Crusader Offshore Partners, L.P., Highland Crusader Fund, L.P., Highland Crusader Fund, Ltd., and Highland Crusader Fund II, Ltd. added. (Platt, Mark)
December 7, 2020 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by UBS AG London Branch, UBS Securities LLC identifying Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate UBS AG, Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate UBS Americas Inc., Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate UBS Group AG, Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate UBS Americas Holding LLC for UBS Securities LLC; Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate UBS AG, Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate UBS Group AG for UBS AG London Branch. (Tomkowiak, Sarah)
December 4, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Melissa S Hayward on behalf of Highland Capital Management LP. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Hayward, Melissa)
December 4, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Zachery Z. Annable on behalf of Highland Capital Management LP. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Annable, Zachery)
December 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ELECTRONIC ORDER: The court has considered the application of admission pro hac vice of Andrew B. Clubok (docket entry #9 ). It is ORDERED that the application of Andrew B. Clubok is GRANTED. The clerk of court shall deposit the application fee to the account of the Non-Appropriated Fund of this court. It is further ORDERED that if the applicant has not already done so, the applicant must register as an ECF user within 14 days. See L.R. 5.1(f). (Ordered by Senior Judge A. Joe Fish on 12/4/2020) (chmb)
December 3, 2020 Filing 9 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing (Filing fee $100; Receipt number 0539-11409353) filed by UBS AG London Branch, UBS Securities LLC (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Attorney Andrew B Clubok added to party UBS AG London Branch(pty:a), Attorney Andrew B Clubok added to party UBS Securities LLC(pty:a) (Clubok, Andrew)
December 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ELECTRONIC ORDER: The court has considered the application of admission pro hac vice of Sarah A. Tomkowiak (docket entry #7 ). It is ORDERED that the application of Sarah A. Tomkowiak is GRANTED. The clerk of court shall deposit the application fee to the account of the Non-Appropriated Fund of this court. It is further ORDERED that if the applicant has not already done so, the applicant must register as an ECF user within 14 days. See L.R. 5.1(f). (Ordered by Senior Judge A. Joe Fish on 12/2/2020) (chmb)
December 2, 2020 Filing 7 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing (Filing fee $100; Receipt number 0539-11405096) filed by UBS AG London Branch, UBS Securities LLC (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Attorney Sarah A Tomkowiak added to party UBS AG London Branch(pty:a), Attorney Sarah A Tomkowiak added to party UBS Securities LLC(pty:a) (Tomkowiak, Sarah)
December 1, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Martin Allen Sosland on behalf of UBS AG London Branch, UBS Securities LLC. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Sosland, Martin)
December 1, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Candice Marie Carson on behalf of UBS AG London Branch, UBS Securities LLC. (Filer will update contact info in ECF.) (Carson, Candice)
November 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ELECTRONIC ORDER: The court has considered the application of admission pro hac vice of John A. Morris (docket entry 3). It is ORDERED that the application of John A. Morris is GRANTED. The clerk of court shall deposit the application fee to the account of the Non-Appropriated Fund of this court. It is further ORDERED that if the applicant has not already done so, the applicant must register as an ECF user within 14 days. See L.R. 5.1(f). (Ordered by Senior Judge A. Joe Fish on 11/25/2020) (chmb)
November 24, 2020 Filing 3 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing for Attorney John A. Morris (Filing fee $100; Receipt number 0539-11387220) filed by Highland Capital Management LP (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Proposed Order) (Annable, Zachery)
November 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ELECTRONIC ORDER: The appellant has yet to provide the clerk with a certificate of interested persons. N.D. TEX. CIV. R. 3.1(c) and 3.2(e) requires that "[w]hen a complaint is filed, the plaintiff must provide the clerk with... a separately signed certificate of interested persons that contains a complete list of all persons, associations of persons, firms, partnerships, corporations, guarantors, insurers, affiliates, parent or subsidiary corporations, or other legal entities who or which are financially interested in the outcome of the case. If a large group of persons or firms can be specified by a generic description, individual listing is not necessary." Accordingly, no later than 20 days after this order is filed, the plaintiff must comply with Rule 3.1(c) or 3.2(e) so that the court can ensure that recusal is not required in this case. (Ordered by Senior Judge A. Joe Fish on 11/16/2020) (chmb)
November 13, 2020 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. (mjr)
November 13, 2020 Filing 1 Pursuant to Fed. R. Bankr. P. 8003(d), the bankruptcy clerk has transmitted the notice of appeal filed in #bankruptcy case number 19-34054 and the notice of appeal has now been docketed in the district court in case 3:20-cv-3408. (The filing fee has been paid in the Bankruptcy Court.) Pursuant to #Fed. R. Bankr. P. 8009, before the record on appeal can be assembled and filed in the district court, designations of items to be included in the record on appeal and statements of issues must be filed in the bankruptcy case. If a sealed document is designated, the designating party must file a motion in the district court case for the document to be accepted under seal. See also #District Court Local Bankruptcy Rule 8012.1. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: #Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Notice of appeal and supporting documents) (Whitaker - TXNB, Sheniqua)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: UBS Securities LLC et al v. Highland Capital Management LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Highland Capital Management, L.P.
Represented By: Melissa S Hayward
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Highland Capital Management LP
Represented By: Melissa S Hayward
Represented By: John A Morris
Represented By: Zachery Z. Annable
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: UBS AG, London Branch
Represented By: Martin Allen Sosland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: UBS Securities LLC
Represented By: Martin Allen Sosland
Represented By: Andrew B Clubok
Represented By: Candice Marie Carson
Represented By: Sarah A Tomkowiak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: UBS AG London Branch
Represented By: Martin Allen Sosland
Represented By: Andrew B Clubok
Represented By: Candice Marie Carson
Represented By: Sarah A Tomkowiak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Case Admin Sup
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Stacey G Jernigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: Highland Crusader Fund, Ltd.
Represented By: Marc B Hankin
Represented By: Terri L Mascherin
Represented By: Mark A Platt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: Highland Crusader Fund, L.P.
Represented By: Marc B Hankin
Represented By: Terri L Mascherin
Represented By: Mark A Platt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: Redeemer Committee of Highland Crusader Fund
Represented By: Marc B Hankin
Represented By: Terri L Mascherin
Represented By: Mark A Platt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: Highland Crusader Fund II, Ltd.
Represented By: Marc B Hankin
Represented By: Terri L Mascherin
Represented By: Mark A Platt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: Highland Crusader Offshore Partners, L.P.
Represented By: Marc B Hankin
Represented By: Terri L Mascherin
Represented By: Mark A Platt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?