Phu v. The Cooper Companies Inc et al
Plaintiff: Jenny Phu
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Inc, Duramed Pharmaceuticals Inc a division of Barr Pharmaceuticals Inc doing business as Teva Women's Health Inc, Teva Women's Health LLC, The Cooper Companies Inc, CooperSurgical Inc and Teva Women's Health Inc
Case Number: 3:2020cv03415
Filed: November 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Barbara M G Lynn
Nature of Suit: Torts/Pers Inj: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Pers Inj/Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 12, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 12, 2021 Interdistrict Transfer to Northern District of Georgia; notice sent via email. All documents available electronically. If receiving court cannot upload, documents are available from PACER (record does not contain restricted documents). Counsel advised to file future documents in Northern District of Georgia. (axm)
January 12, 2021 Filing 25 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO 1): The JPML has issued the attached order in MDL 2974, and that order has now been filed in the Northern District of Georgia. (axm)
December 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Trial set for three-week docket beginning 8/8/2022 09:00 AM before Chief Judge Barbara M. G. Lynn. Joinder of Parties due by 2/25/2021. Amended Pleadings due by 2/25/2021. Motions due by 4/8/2022. Fact and Expert Discovery due by 1/15/2022. Settlement Status Report due by 2/25/2021. Pretrial Order due by 7/18/2022. Pretrial Materials due by 7/18/2022. Pretrial Conference set for 8/5/2022 09:00 AM before Chief Judge Barbara M. G. Lynn. (Ordered by Chief Judge Barbara M. G. Lynn on 12/16/2020) (axm)
December 9, 2020 Filing 23 Joint STATUS REPORT Regarding Contents of Scheduling Order filed by CooperSurgical Inc, Duramed Pharmaceuticals Inc, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Inc, Teva Women's Health Inc, Teva Women's Health LLC, The Cooper Companies Inc. (De Santos, Laura)
December 9, 2020 Filing 22 MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending a Decision by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation filed by Jenny Phu with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A: MDL Motion and Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit(s) B: JPML Schedule of Actions) (Kassan, Randi)
November 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #19 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Fredrick M Erny. Important Reminder: Unless excused for cause, an attorney who is not an ECF user must register within 14 days of the date the attorney appears in a case pursuant to LR 5.1(f) and LCrR 49.2(g). (Ordered by Chief Judge Barbara M. G. Lynn on 11/30/2020) (chmb)
November 25, 2020 Filing 20 State Records from the Office of Judicial Records, First Judicial District of Pennsylvania. (jmg)
November 25, 2020 Filing 19 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing (Filing fee $100; Receipt number 0539-11389635) filed by CooperSurgical Inc, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Inc, Teva Women's Health Inc, Teva Women's Health LLC, The Cooper Companies Inc (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order) (Erny, Fredrick)
November 19, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Laura E De Santos on behalf of Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Inc, Teva Women's Health Inc, Teva Women's Health LLC, The Cooper Companies Inc. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (De Santos, Laura)
November 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER REQUIRING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE AND REPORT FOR CONTENTS OF SCHEDULING ORDER: Lead counsel for each party (or a designee attorney with appropriate authority) and any unrepresented party (except for a prisoner litigant proceeding pro se) shall confer as soon as practicable, but in any event no later than 12/2/2020. Joint Report due by 12/9/2020. (Ordered by Chief Judge Barbara M. G. Lynn on 11/18/2020) (ykp)
November 16, 2020 Filing 16 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Horan). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (jmg)
November 16, 2020 Filing 15 Case electronically transferred in from District of Pennsylvania Eastern; Case Number 2:20-cv-05054. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas should seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. Copy of NEF to be sent US Mail to parties not electronically noticed.
November 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER THAT THIS ACTION IS TRANSFERRED PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) TO UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT FOR THE NORTHERN DISTRICT OF TEXAS. SIGNED BY HONORABLE HARVEY BARTLE, III ON 11/12/20. 11/12/20 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mbh, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 11/16/2020.]
November 11, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by RANDI KASSAN on behalf of JENNY PHU (KASSAN, RANDI) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 11/16/2020.]
October 28, 2020 Filing 12 Original Record together with certified copy of docket entries received from Court of Common Pleas of PHILADELPHIA County. (JL ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 11/16/2020.]
October 16, 2020 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint by COOPERSURGICAL, INC..(RUBENSTEIN, BRIAN) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 11/16/2020.]
October 16, 2020 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint by THE COOPER COMPANIES, INC.(RUBENSTEIN, BRIAN) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 11/16/2020.]
October 13, 2020 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint by TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH, LLC f/k/a TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH, INC..(RUBENSTEIN, BRIAN) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 11/16/2020.]
October 13, 2020 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint by TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH INC., INDIVIDUALLY, AND AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO, DURAMED PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., A DIVISION OF BARR PHARMACEUTICALS, INC..(RUBENSTEIN, BRIAN) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 11/16/2020.]
October 13, 2020 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint by TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC.(RUBENSTEIN, BRIAN) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 11/16/2020.]
October 13, 2020 Filing 6 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS INDUSTRIES LTD. by TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH, LLC f/k/a TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH, INC..(RUBENSTEIN, BRIAN) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 11/16/2020.]
October 13, 2020 Filing 5 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS INDUSTRIES LTD. by TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH INC., INDIVIDUALLY, AND AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO, DURAMED PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., A DIVISION OF BARR PHARMACEUTICALS, INC..(RUBENSTEIN, BRIAN) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 11/16/2020.]
October 13, 2020 Filing 4 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS INDUSTRIES LTD. by TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC.(RUBENSTEIN, BRIAN) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 11/16/2020.]
October 13, 2020 Filing 3 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including THE COOPER COMPANIES, INC. by COOPERSURGICAL, INC..(RUBENSTEIN, BRIAN) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 11/16/2020.]
October 13, 2020 Filing 2 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including VANGUARD GROUP INC. by THE COOPER COMPANIES, INC.(RUBENSTEIN, BRIAN) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 11/16/2020.]
October 13, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by THE COOPER COMPANIES, INC, TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH INC., INDIVIDUALLY, AND AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO, DURAMED PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., A DIVISION OF BARR PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., DURAMED PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. A DIVISION OF BARR PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. D/B/A TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH, INC., TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH, LLC, INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO TEVA'S WOMEN'S HEALTH, INC., COOPERSURGICAL, INC., TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC, TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH, LLC f/k/a TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH, INC. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0313-14632058), filed by THE COOPER COMPANIES, INC, TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH INC., INDIVIDUALLY, AND AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO, DURAMED PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., A DIVISION OF BARR PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., DURAMED PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. A DIVISION OF BARR PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. D/B/A TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH, INC., TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH, LLC, INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO TEVA'S WOMEN'S HEALTH, INC., COOPERSURGICAL, INC., TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC, TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH, LLC f/k/a TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH, INC..(RUBENSTEIN, BRIAN) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 11/16/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Phu v. The Cooper Companies Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Inc
Represented By: Fredrick M Erny
Represented By: Brian Rubenstein
Represented By: Sona J Garcia
Represented By: Laura E De Santos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Duramed Pharmaceuticals Inc a division of Barr Pharmaceuticals Inc doing business as Teva Women's Health Inc
Represented By: Fredrick M Erny
Represented By: Brian Rubenstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Women's Health LLC
Represented By: Fredrick M Erny
Represented By: Brian Rubenstein
Represented By: Sona J Garcia
Represented By: Laura E De Santos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Cooper Companies Inc
Represented By: Fredrick M Erny
Represented By: Brian Rubenstein
Represented By: Sona J Garcia
Represented By: Laura E De Santos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CooperSurgical Inc
Represented By: Fredrick M Erny
Represented By: Brian Rubenstein
Represented By: Sona J Garcia
Represented By: Laura E De Santos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Women's Health Inc
Represented By: Fredrick M Erny
Represented By: Brian Rubenstein
Represented By: Sona J Garcia
Represented By: Laura E De Santos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jenny Phu
Represented By: Tobias Millrood
Represented By: Lauren A Welling
Represented By: Randi Alyson Kassan
Represented By: Kara D HIll
Represented By: Tim Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?