MedARC LLC v. Healthspring Inc
Plaintiff: MedARC LLC
Defendant: Healthspring, Inc. and Healthspring Inc
Case Number: 3:2020cv03559
Filed: December 3, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Jane J Boyle
Referring Judge: David C Godbey
2 Judge: Irma Carrillo Ramirez
Nature of Suit: Contract: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 29, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ELECTRONIC ORDER: Status Conference set for 2/4/2021 at 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Irma Carrillo Ramirez via Zoom. Email with link to follow. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Irma Carrillo Ramirez on 1/29/2021) (chmb)
January 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER OF REFERENCE: Under Authority of 28 U.S.C. 636(b), this case is referred to United States Magistrate Judge Irma Carrillo Ramirez for pretrial management who has a related case. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 1/28/2021) (mjr)
January 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER OF TRANSFER: Case reassigned to Judge David C Godbey for all further proceedings. Judge Jane J. Boyle no longer assigned to case. (Ordered by Judge Jane J. Boyle on 1/26/2021) (svc)
January 26, 2021 Filing 7 Joint STATUS REPORT filed by MedARC LLC. (Albert, Craig)
January 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STATUS REPORT ORDER: Status Report due by 1/26/2021. (Ordered by Judge Jane J. Boyle on 1/5/2021) (svc)
January 4, 2021 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint filed by Healthspring Inc. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Burriss, Eliot)
December 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #3 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer Healthspring Inc answer due 12/30/2020. (Ordered by Judge Jane J. Boyle on 12/21/2020) (chmb)
December 18, 2020 Filing 3 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Healthspring Inc (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Burriss, Eliot)
December 3, 2020 Filing 2 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Toliver). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (hml)
December 3, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Healthspring, Inc.. (Filing fee $402; receipt number 0539-11409552) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B, #3 Exhibit(s) C, #4 Exhibit(s) D, #5 Exhibit(s) E, #6 Cover Sheet, #7 Cover Sheet Supplement) (Burriss, Eliot)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MedARC LLC v. Healthspring Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Healthspring, Inc.
Represented By: Eliot T Burriss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Healthspring Inc
Represented By: Eliot T Burriss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MedARC LLC
Represented By: Craig A Albert
Represented By: Jonathan A Aldaco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?