Courtney v. Air & Liquid Systems Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Dewey Courtney and Kimberly Courtney
Defendant: Eaton Hydraulics, Viacomcbs Inc, GlaxoSmithKline LLC, Block Drug Company Inc, ITT Inc, Genuine Parts Company, Honeywell International Inc, Chattem Inc, Himmel Management Co LLC sued individually and as successor-in-interest to Block Drug Corporation, successor-in-interest to The Gold Bond STerilizing Powder Company also known as The Gold Bond Company also known as Himmel Group doing business as Himm, Velan Valve Corp, National Automotive Parts Associations LLC, Thrush Co Inc, Eaton Hydraulics LLC, Block Drug Corporation, Eaton Hydraulics Inc, Crane Environmental Inc, McWane Inc sued individually and as successor-in-interest to Clow Corporation doing business as Clow Valve Company, Hoffman Lawler Velve, Warren Pumps LLC, Dominion Energy Gas Holdings, O'Reilly Automotive Stores Inc, General Electronic Company, Amtrol Inc, Hopeman Brothers Inc, Barretts Minerals Inc, Pfizer Inc, Westinghouse Electric Corporationn, Taco Inc, The William Powell Company, BW/IP International Inc, GP Strategies Corporation, Weir Valves & Controls USA Inc, Crane Co, Alfa Laval Inc, Pneumo Abex LLC, AutoZone Inc, CBS Corporation, Pentair Valves and Controls Inc, National Automotive Parts Association, Armstrong International Inc, Ford Motor Company, Union Carbide Corporation, NAPA, Goulds Pumps Incorporated, Aurora Pump Company, IMO Industries Inc, Virginia Electric and Power Company, Raytheon Technologies Corporation, Raytheon Company, Allied-Signal Inc, SPX Corporation, Dominion Energy Inc, Velan Valve Corporation, ITT Goulds Pumps Inc, Air & Liquid Systems Corporation, The Gold Bond Company, Tate Andale LLC, Viacom Inc, ITT Corporation, Parker-Hannifin Corporation, Thrush Company, Himmel Group and ITT Industries Inc
Cross Defendant: Himmel Management Co LLC and McWane Inc
Case Number: 3:2021cv00127
Filed: January 19, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Barbara M G Lynn
Nature of Suit: Torts/Pers Inj: Asbestos Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1442
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 13, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 98 ORDER granting #74 Motion to Remand to State Court. The case is hereby remanded to County Court at Law No. 4, Dallas County, Texas. Each party shall be responsible for its own costs and attorneys' fees incurred as a result of removal of this action to this Court. (Ordered by Chief Judge Barbara M. G. Lynn on 3/13/2021) (Attachments: #1 Remand Letter) (oyh)
March 12, 2021 Filing 97 MOTION for Leave to Proceed Without Local Counsel for Sole Purpose of Re-Filing Agreed Motion to Dismiss filed by Hopeman Brothers Inc (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Ryan, Elizabeth) Modified text on 3/15/2021 (jmg).
March 10, 2021 Filing 96 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jason James Irvin on behalf of Warren Pumps LLC. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Irvin, Jason)
March 10, 2021 Filing 95 Agreed MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Hopeman Brothers Inc Without Prejudice filed by Hopeman Brothers Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Attorney Elizabeth H Ryan added to party Hopeman Brothers Inc. (Ryan, Elizabeth) Modified text on 3/11/2021 (jmg).
March 8, 2021 Filing 94 Unopposed MOTION to Dismiss as to Defendants Dominion Energy, Inc. and Dominion Energy Gas Holdings and Virginia Electric and Power Company filed by Dewey Courtney, Kimberly Courtney (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Montemayor, Jennifer)
March 1, 2021 Filing 93 NOTICE of Dismissal Voluntary Without Prejudice as to Raytheon Technologies Corporation filed by Raytheon Technologies Corporation (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Cox, Maryalyce)
February 22, 2021 Filing 92 MOTION to Proceed Without Local Counsel (unopposed) filed by Aurora Pump Company (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Unopposed Motion to Proceed Without Local Counsel) (Dougherty, Douglas)
February 22, 2021 Filing 91 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Aurora Pump Company. (Dougherty, Douglas)
February 22, 2021 Filing 90 ANSWER to Crossclaim filed by Aurora Pump Company. Related document: #15 Answer to Complaint,,, Crossclaim,,, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants filed by Aurora Pump CompanyAttorney Douglas B Dougherty added to party Aurora Pump Company(pty:dft) (Dougherty, Douglas)
February 19, 2021 Filing 89 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Ford Motor Company. (Salenger, Mackenzie)
February 19, 2021 Filing 88 NOTICE of Supplement to Notice of Removal re: #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Ford Motor Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit(s) Exhibit B) (Salenger, Mackenzie)
February 19, 2021 Filing 87 Supplement to #1 Notice of Removal by Crane Co, Crane Environmental Inc. . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Crane Co. and Crane Environmental Inc.'s Answer, #2 Exhibit(s) Notice of Removal) (Buchanan, Angela) Modified text on 2/22/2021 (mjr).
February 19, 2021 Filing 86 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Pfizer Inc. (Frazier, Mary)
February 19, 2021 Filing 85 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Barretts Minerals Inc. (Frazier, Mary)
February 19, 2021 Filing 84 Designation of lead counsel Mary Elizondo Frazier for Defendants Barretts Minerals Inc, Pfizer Inc. (Frazier, Mary)
February 19, 2021 Filing 83 Supplement to #1 Notice of Removal by Pfizer Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B) (Frazier, Mary) Modified linkage and text on 2/22/2021 (mjr).
February 19, 2021 Filing 82 Supplement to #1 Notice of Removal by Barretts Minerals Inc . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B) (Frazier, Mary) Modified linkage and text on 2/22/2021 (mjr).
February 18, 2021 Filing 81 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to #1 Notice of Removal filed by Block Drug Company Inc, Block Drug Corporation, GlaxoSmithKline LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Keith, Jillian)
February 18, 2021 Filing 80 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Block Drug Company Inc with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: #1 Declaration(s), #2 Exhibit(s), #3 Exhibit(s))Attorney Jillian van Rensburg Keith added to party Block Drug Company Inc(pty:dft) (Keith, Jillian) Modified text on 2/19/2021 (mjr).
February 18, 2021 Filing 79 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Block Drug Corporation with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: #1 Declaration(s) Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit(s))Attorney Jillian van Rensburg Keith added to party Block Drug Corporation(pty:dft) (Keith, Jillian) Modified text on 2/19/2021 (mjr).
February 18, 2021 Filing 78 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(2) filed by GlaxoSmithKline LLC with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: #1 Declaration(s), #2 Exhibit(s)) (Keith, Jillian) Modified text and terminated second motion on 2/19/2021 (mjr).
February 18, 2021 Filing 77 MOTION to Dismiss filed by GlaxoSmithKline LLC with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: #1 Declaration(s) Exhibit A)Attorney Jillian van Rensburg Keith added to party GlaxoSmithKline LLC(pty:dft) (Keith, Jillian)
February 18, 2021 Filing 76 Joint STATUS REPORT filed by Dewey Courtney, Kimberly Courtney. (Montemayor, Jennifer)
February 18, 2021 Filing 75 Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by Dewey Courtney, Kimberly Courtney re: #74 MOTION to Remand to State Court. (Montemayor, Jennifer)
February 18, 2021 Filing 74 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Dewey Courtney, Kimberly Courtney. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Montemayor, Jennifer)
February 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER granting #69 Raytheon Company's Motion to Proceed Without Local Counsel. (Ordered by Chief Judge Barbara M. G. Lynn on 2/17/2021) (mjr)
February 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER granting #61 IMO Industries, Inc.'s Motion to Proceed Without Local Counsel. (Ordered by Chief Judge Barbara M. G. Lynn on 2/15/2021) (ndt)
February 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER granting #66 SPX Corporation's Motion for Leave to Proceed Without Local Counsel. (Ordered by Chief Judge Barbara M. G. Lynn on 2/15/2021) (ndt)
February 15, 2021 Filing 70 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Tate Andale LLC with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B) (Lowery, James)
February 15, 2021 Filing 69 MOTION for Leave to Proceed without Local Counsel filed by Raytheon Company (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Cox, Maryalyce)
February 12, 2021 Filing 68 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by AutoZone Inc. (Wehrmann, Henry)
February 12, 2021 Filing 67 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction filed by Dominion Energy Inc, Virginia Electric and Power Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Declaration of Jordan C. Saltzberg)Attorney John R Henderson added to party Dominion Energy Inc(pty:dft), Attorney John R Henderson added to party Virginia Electric and Power Company (pty:dft) (Henderson, John)
February 12, 2021 Filing 66 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to Proceed without Local Counsel filed by SPX Corporation (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Dowdy, Mari)
February 12, 2021 Filing 65 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by SPX Corporation. (Dowdy, Mari)
February 12, 2021 Filing 64 Amended ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand filed by SPX Corporation. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. Attorney Mari Bryn Dowdy added to party SPX Corporation(pty:dft) (Dowdy, Mari) Modified event text on 2/16/2021 (jmg).
February 12, 2021 Filing 63 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by ITT Inc identifying Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate ITT LLC, Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate ITT LLC for ITT Inc. (Edwards, Brady)
February 11, 2021 Filing 62 NOTICE of Dismissal without Prejudice filed by National Automotive Parts Associations LLC. (Kugler, Laura)
February 10, 2021 Filing 61 MOTION for Leave to File Proceed Without Local Counsel filed by IMO Industries Inc (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Prazak, Jonathan)
February 10, 2021 Filing 60 Notice of Appearance/ ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand filed by ITT Inc. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) ITT LLC's Original Answer to Plaintiffs' Original Petition and Jury Demand)Attorney Brady Sherrod Edwards added to party ITT Inc (pty:dft) (Edwards, Brady) Modified text on 2/11/2021 (ndt).
February 10, 2021 Filing 59 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Goulds Pumps Incorporated identifying Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate Goulds Pumps LLC, Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate Goulds Pumps LLC, Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate Goulds Pumps LLC for Goulds Pumps Incorporated. (Edwards, Brady)
February 10, 2021 Filing 58 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Taco Inc. (Helling, Troy)
February 10, 2021 Filing 57 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Troy Helling on behalf of Taco Inc. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Helling, Troy)
February 10, 2021 Filing 56 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) with Jury Demand filed by McWane Inc (Sprague, Wes)
February 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER granting #51 Motion to Withdraw. The Motion to Dismiss [ECF No. #6 ] is withdrawn. The relief requested in the Notice is GRANTED. All of Plaintiffs' claims and causes of action against Alfa Laval are DISMISSED without prejudice. (Ordered by Chief Judge Barbara M. G. Lynn on 2/10/2021) (oyh)
February 10, 2021 Filing 54 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Henry Scott Wehrmann on behalf of AutoZone Inc. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A) (Wehrmann, Henry)
February 10, 2021 Filing 53 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Raytheon Technologies Corporation. (Cox, Maryalyce)
February 9, 2021 Filing 52 NOTICE of Dismissal filed by Alfa Laval Inc (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Voluntary Dismissal) (Elliston, Gary)
February 9, 2021 Filing 51 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw #6 First MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Alfa Laval Inc (Elliston, Gary)
February 9, 2021 Filing 50 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Genuine Parts Company. (Kugler, Laura)
February 9, 2021 Filing 49 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand filed by Genuine Parts Company. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. Attorney Laura E Kugler added to party Genuine Parts Company(pty:dft) (Kugler, Laura)
February 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER: Before the Court is Defendant National Automotive Parts Association, LLC's Unopposed Motion to Withdraw its Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint [ECF No. #39 ]. The Motion is GRANTED. The Motion to Dismiss [ECF No. #29 ] is withdrawn. (Ordered by Chief Judge Barbara M. G. Lynn on 2/9/2021) (ctf)
February 9, 2021 Filing 47 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Amtrol Inc identifying Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate Worthington Steel of Michigan, Inc. for Amtrol Inc. (Helling, Troy)
February 9, 2021 Filing 46 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand filed by Amtrol Inc. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. Attorney Troy Helling added to party Amtrol Inc(pty:dft) (Helling, Troy)
February 9, 2021 CROSSCLAIM filed by Goulds Pumps Incorporated. (See document #44 for image.) (jmg)
February 8, 2021 Filing 45 NOTICE of Defendant IMO Industries, Inc.'s Supplement to Notice of Removal re: #1 Notice of Removal, filed by IMO Industries Inc (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A) (Prazak, Jonathan)
February 8, 2021 Filing 44 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand filed by Goulds Pumps Incorporated. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. Attorney Brady Sherrod Edwards added to party Goulds Pumps Incorporated(pty:dft) (Edwards, Brady)
February 8, 2021 Filing 43 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Pneumo Abex LLC identifying Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate Pneumo Abex Asbestos Claims Settlement Trust for Pneumo Abex LLC. (Elliston, Gary)
February 8, 2021 Filing 42 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Weir Valves & Controls USA Inc. (Adams, Kent)
February 8, 2021 Filing 41 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Union Carbide Corporation identifying Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate Dow Chemical Company for Union Carbide Corporation. (Elliston, Gary)
February 8, 2021 Filing 40 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand filed by Weir Valves & Controls USA Inc. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. Attorney Kent M Adams added to party Weir Valves & Controls USA Inc (pty:dft) (Adams, Kent)
February 8, 2021 Filing 39 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw #29 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(2) filed by National Automotive Parts Associations LLC (Kugler, Laura)
February 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #32 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Laura Rahman. Important Reminder: Unless excused for cause, an attorney who is not an ECF user must register within 14 days of the date the attorney appears in a case pursuant to LR 5.1(f) and LCrR 49.2(g). (Ordered by Chief Judge Barbara M. G. Lynn on 2/8/2021) (chmb)
February 5, 2021 CROSSCLAIM filed by Pneumo Abex LLC. (See document #37 for image.) (jmg)
February 5, 2021 Filing 37 ANSWER to Complaint filed by Pneumo Abex LLC. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. Attorney Gary D Elliston added to party Pneumo Abex LLC(pty:dft) (Elliston, Gary)
February 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER granting Defendant Air & Liquid Systems Corporation's #35 Motion for Leave to Proceed Without Local Counsel. (Ordered by Chief Judge Barbara M. G. Lynn on 2/5/2021) (twd)
February 3, 2021 Filing 35 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO PROCEED WITHOUT LOCAL COUNSEL filed by Air & Liquid Systems Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Rahman, Laura) Modified text on 2/4/2021 (mjr).
February 3, 2021 Filing 34 ANSWER to Complaint filed by Union Carbide Corporation. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. Attorney Gary D Elliston added to party Union Carbide Corporation(pty:dft) (Elliston, Gary)
February 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER granting Defendant BW/IP Inc and its Wholly Owned Subsidiaries' #24 Motion for Leave to Proceed Without Local Counsel (Ordered by Chief Judge Barbara M. G. Lynn on 2/2/2021) (twd)
February 2, 2021 Filing 32 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing (Filing fee $100; Receipt number 0539-11572224) filed by Air & Liquid Systems Corporation (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Attorney Laura Spadafora Rahman added to party Air & Liquid Systems Corporation(pty:dft) (Rahman, Laura)
February 1, 2021 Filing 31 Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by National Automotive Parts Associations LLC re #29 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(2) (Attachments: #1 Affidavit(s) of Whitney Swingle) (Kugler, Laura)
February 1, 2021 Filing 30 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by National Automotive Parts Associations LLC identifying Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate Genuine Parts Company for National Automotive Parts Associations LLC. (Kugler, Laura)
February 1, 2021 Filing 29 ***WITHDRAWN PER ORDER (DOC. #48 )*** MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(2) filed by National Automotive Parts Associations LLC. Attorney Laura E Kugler added to party National Automotive Parts Associations LLC(pty:dft) (Kugler, Laura) Modified text on 2/2/2021 (jmg). Modified on 2/9/2021 (ctf).
February 1, 2021 Filing 28 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Honeywell International Inc. (Randel, Reed)
February 1, 2021 Filing 27 Supplement to #1 Notice of Removal by Honeywell International Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A (Defendant Honeywell's Answer filed in the state court action), #2 Exhibit(s) B (Defendant Eaton Hydraulics' correspondence filed in the state court action)) (Pevsner, Joseph) Modified text on 2/2/2021 (jmg).
February 1, 2021 Filing 26 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Air & Liquid Systems Corporation identifying Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate Ampco-Pittsburgh Corporation for Air & Liquid Systems Corporation. (Broocks, Linda)
February 1, 2021 Filing 25 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand filed by Air & Liquid Systems Corporation. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. CROSSCLAIM filed by Air & Liquid Systems Corporation. Attorney Linda J Broocks added to party Air & Liquid Systems Corporation(pty:dft) (Broocks, Linda) Modified text on 2/2/2021 (axm).
February 1, 2021 Filing 24 MOTION for Leave to File Proceed without Local Counsel filed by BW/IP International Inc (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Strelitz, Peter)
February 1, 2021 Filing 23 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by BW/IP International Inc identifying Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate Flowserve Corporation for BW/IP International Inc. (Strelitz, Peter)
February 1, 2021 Filing 22 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand filed by BW/IP International Inc. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. Attorney Peter J Strelitz added to party BW/IP International Inc(pty:dft) (Strelitz, Peter)
January 29, 2021 Filing 21 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Crane Environmental Inc. (Buchanan, Angela)
January 29, 2021 Filing 20 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Crane Co. (Buchanan, Angela)
January 29, 2021 Filing 19 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by GP Strategies Corporation. (Kugler, Laura)
January 29, 2021 Filing 18 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand filed by GP Strategies Corporation. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. Attorney Laura E Kugler added to party GP Strategies Corporation(pty:dft) (Kugler, Laura)
January 28, 2021 Filing 17 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Alfa Laval Inc identifying Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate Alfa Laval AB (Publ) for Alfa Laval Inc. (Elliston, Gary)
January 28, 2021 Filing 16 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Chattem Inc. (Elliston, Gary)
January 28, 2021 Filing 15 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand filed by Chattem Inc. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants filed by Chattem Inc. Attorney Gary D Elliston added to party Chattem Inc(pty:dft) (Elliston, Gary)
January 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER REQUIRING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE AND REPORT FOR CONTENTS OF SCHEDULING ORDER: The Joint Report shall be filed on or before 2/18/2021. (Ordered by Chief Judge Barbara M. G. Lynn on 1/28/2021) (ctf)
January 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER: Before the Court is Defendant The William Powell Company's #12 Motion for Leave to Proceed Without Local Counsel. The Motion is GRANTED. The William Powell Company may proceed in this case without local counsel. (Ordered by Chief Judge Barbara M. G. Lynn on 1/28/2021) (twd)
January 27, 2021 Filing 12 MOTION for Leave to File to Proceed Without Local Counsel filed by The William Powell Company (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Attorney Barbara Jane Barron added to party The William Powell Company (pty:dft) (Barron, Barbara)
January 27, 2021 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by The William Powell Company. (Barron, Barbara)
January 27, 2021 Filing 10 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by The William Powell Company. (Barron, Barbara)
January 27, 2021 Filing 9 Supplement to #1 Notice of Removal filed by The William Powell Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Exhibit(s)) (Barron, Barbara) Modified event text on 1/27/2021 (jmg).
January 26, 2021 Filing 8 Amended MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(2) filed by Eaton Hydraulics LLC with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: #1 Additional Page(s) Appendix, #2 Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Marshall, H) Modified to terminate and remove the motion to expedite on 1/27/2021 (cea). Modified text on 1/27/2021 (jmg).
January 26, 2021 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Alfa Laval Inc. (Williams, Pamela)
January 26, 2021 Filing 6 ***WITHDRAWN PER #55 ORDER*** First MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Alfa Laval Inc with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Appendix, #2 Proposed Order Order)Attorney Pamela J Williams added to party Alfa Laval Inc(pty:dft) (Williams, Pamela) Modified docket text on 2/10/2021 (oyh).
January 26, 2021 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Eaton Hydraulics LLC identifying Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate Eaton Corporation plc for Eaton Hydraulics LLC. (Marshall, H)
January 26, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction filed by Eaton Hydraulics LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Complaint, #2 Exhibit(s) Affidavit of Paul Smith)Attorney H Barret Marshall, Jr added to party Eaton Hydraulics LLC(pty:dft) (Marshall, H)
January 25, 2021 Filing 3 STIPULATION to Extend Deadline to Respond to Plaintiffs' Original Petition by SPX Corporation. (Horne, Nathan)
January 20, 2021 Filing 2 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Horan). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (oyh)
January 20, 2021 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:2. Wed Jan 20 15:52:27 CST 2021 (crt)
January 19, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Eaton Hydraulics LLC. (Filing fee $402; receipt number 0539-11529042) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet Supplement, #2 Cover Sheet Supplement, #3 Exhibit(s), #4 Cover Sheet Supplement) (Marshall, H) Modified docket text on 1/20/2021 (oyh).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Courtney v. Air & Liquid Systems Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dewey Courtney
Represented By: Jennifer Ivett Montemayor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kimberly Courtney
Represented By: Jennifer Ivett Montemayor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eaton Hydraulics
Represented By: H Barret Marshall, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Viacomcbs Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GlaxoSmithKline LLC
Represented By: Jillian van Rensburg Keith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Block Drug Company Inc
Represented By: Jillian van Rensburg Keith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ITT Inc
Represented By: Brady Sherrod Edwards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Genuine Parts Company
Represented By: Troy Helling
Represented By: Laura E Kugler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Honeywell International Inc
Represented By: Reed Cullen Randel
Represented By: Joseph S Pevsner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chattem Inc
Represented By: Gary D Elliston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Himmel Management Co LLC sued individually and as successor-in-interest to Block Drug Corporation, successor-in-interest to The Gold Bond STerilizing Powder Company also known as The Gold Bond Company also known as Himmel Group doing business as Himm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Velan Valve Corp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Automotive Parts Associations LLC
Represented By: Laura E Kugler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thrush Co Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eaton Hydraulics LLC
Represented By: H Barret Marshall, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Block Drug Corporation
Represented By: Jillian van Rensburg Keith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eaton Hydraulics Inc
Represented By: H Barret Marshall, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crane Environmental Inc
Represented By: Artoush Varshosaz
Represented By: Angela M Buchanan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McWane Inc sued individually and as successor-in-interest to Clow Corporation doing business as Clow Valve Company
Represented By: Wes Sprague
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hoffman Lawler Velve
Represented By: Brady Sherrod Edwards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warren Pumps LLC
Represented By: Jason James Irvin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dominion Energy Gas Holdings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: O'Reilly Automotive Stores Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Electronic Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amtrol Inc
Represented By: Laura E Kugler
Represented By: Troy Helling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hopeman Brothers Inc
Represented By: Elizabeth H Ryan
Represented By: James M Riley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barretts Minerals Inc
Represented By: Andrew R Stubblefield
Represented By: Jeffrey Stewart Davis
Represented By: Mary Elizondo Frazier
Represented By: Andrew William Bell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pfizer Inc
Represented By: Andrew R Stubblefield
Represented By: Jeffrey Stewart Davis
Represented By: Mary Elizondo Frazier
Represented By: Andrew William Bell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Westinghouse Electric Corporationn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Taco Inc
Represented By: Troy Helling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The William Powell Company
Represented By: Barbara Jane Barron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BW/IP International Inc
Represented By: Peter J Strelitz
Represented By: Arturo M Aviles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GP Strategies Corporation
Represented By: Laura E Kugler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Weir Valves & Controls USA Inc
Represented By: Kent M Adams
Represented By: Jillian van Rensburg Keith
Represented By: Sarah M Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crane Co
Represented By: Artoush Varshosaz
Represented By: Angela M Buchanan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alfa Laval Inc
Represented By: Gary D Elliston
Represented By: Pamela J Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pneumo Abex LLC
Represented By: Gary D Elliston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AutoZone Inc
Represented By: Henry Scott Wehrmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CBS Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pentair Valves and Controls Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Automotive Parts Association
Represented By: Laura E Kugler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Armstrong International Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ford Motor Company
Represented By: Mackenzie Salenger
Represented By: Dawn M Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Union Carbide Corporation
Represented By: Misti D Mosteller
Represented By: Gary D Elliston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NAPA
Represented By: Troy Helling
Represented By: Laura E Kugler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Goulds Pumps Incorporated
Represented By: Brady Sherrod Edwards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aurora Pump Company
Represented By: Douglas B Dougherty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IMO Industries Inc
Represented By: Jonathan Ross Prazak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Virginia Electric and Power Company
Represented By: John R Henderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Raytheon Technologies Corporation
Represented By: Maryalyce Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Raytheon Company
Represented By: Maryalyce Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allied-Signal Inc
Represented By: Reed Cullen Randel
Represented By: Joseph S Pevsner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SPX Corporation
Represented By: Mari Bryn Dowdy
Represented By: Nathan Horne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dominion Energy Inc
Represented By: John R Henderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Velan Valve Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ITT Goulds Pumps Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Air & Liquid Systems Corporation
Represented By: Linda J Broocks
Represented By: Laura Spadafora Rahman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Gold Bond Company
Represented By: Gary D Elliston
Represented By: Jillian van Rensburg Keith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tate Andale LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Viacom Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ITT Corporation
Represented By: Brady Sherrod Edwards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Parker-Hannifin Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thrush Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Himmel Group
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ITT Industries Inc
Represented By: Brady Sherrod Edwards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: Himmel Management Co LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: McWane Inc
Represented By: Wes Sprague
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?