Taylor v. Smith & Nephew Inc et al
Plaintiff: Mary E. Taylor and Mary E Taylor
Defendant: Brian Childress, Smith & Nephew, Robert K. Leedy, LLC, Jason Henry, Robert K. Leedy, Neylu, Inc., Robert K Leedy LLC, Richard Mills Roberts, Neylu Inc, Robert K Leedy and Smith & Nephew Inc
Special Master: Special Master
Case Number: 3:2021cv00531
Filed: March 8, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Ed Kinkeade
Nature of Suit: Torts/Pers Inj: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Pers Inj/Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 25, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 25, 2021 Filing 14 Conditional Transfer Order (CTO-59): The JPML has issued the attached order in MDL 2775, and that order has now been filed in the District of Maryland. (mjr)
March 25, 2021 Interdistrict Transfer to District of Maryland; notice sent via email. All documents available electronically. If receiving court cannot upload, documents are available from PACER (record does not contain restricted documents). Counsel advised to file future documents in District of Maryland. (mjr)
March 25, 2021 Case transferred from NDTX has been opened in District of Maryland as case number 1:21-cv-00757. (oyh)
March 22, 2021 Filing 13 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing (Filing fee $100; Receipt number 0539-11714811) filed by Brian Childress, Robert K Leedy, Neylu Inc, Robert K Leedy LLC, Smith & Nephew Inc (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit(s) Certificate of Good Standing)Attorney David Wayne O'Quinn added to party Brian Childress, Robert K Leedy, Neylu Inc, Robert K Leedy LLC, Smith & Nephew Inc(pty:dft). (O'Quinn, David) Modified text on 3/23/2021 (jmg).
March 16, 2021 Filing 12 REPLY filed by Smith & Nephew Inc re: #6 MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Transfer to MDL 2775 and Brief in Support Thereof (Johnson, Brian)
March 11, 2021 Filing 11 (Document Restricted) Attorney Contact Information Sheet - Brian P. Johnson & Kealy Sehic (Sealed pursuant to SO 19-1, statute, or rule) filed by Smith & Nephew Inc (Johnson, Brian)
March 11, 2021 Filing 10 (Document Restricted) ATTORNEY CONTACT INFORMATION (Sealed pursuant to SO 19-1, statute, or rule) filed by Mary E Taylor (Petroff, Kip)
March 10, 2021 Filing 9 RESPONSE filed by Mary E Taylor re: #6 MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Transfer to MDL 2775 and Brief in Support Thereof (Petroff, Kip)
March 10, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Mary E Taylor with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Petroff, Kip)
March 9, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Transfer to MDL 2775 and Brief in Support Thereof filed by Smith & Nephew Inc with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1, #2 Proposed Order) (Johnson, Brian)
March 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ELECTRONIC ORDER: Local Rule 83.10(a) requires the appearance of local counsel where counsel of record for a party does not reside in this district. Accordingly, within twenty days of this date, Defendants, Smith and Nephew, et al., shall file the entry of appearance of local counsel satisfying the requirements of Local Rule 83.10(a). Failure to do so may result defendants' pleadings being stricken and default taken against that defendant without further notice. (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 3/9/2021) (chmb)
March 9, 2021 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Smith & Nephew Inc. (Johnson, Brian)
March 8, 2021 Filing 8 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Toliver). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (jmg)
March 8, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Related Case filed by Smith & Nephew (Johnson, Brian)
March 8, 2021 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Smith & Nephew. (Johnson, Brian)
March 8, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH JURY DEMAND filed by Smith & Nephew. (Filing fee $402; receipt number 0539-11674249) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1 - State Court Petition, #2 Exhibit(s) 2 - Amended Petition, #3 Exhibit(s) 3 - Pltfs Motion for Nonsuit Dr., #4 Exhibit(s) 4 - Order of Nonsuit for Dr., #5 Exhibit(s) 5 - State Court Filings, #6 Exhibit(s) 6 - Citation to Smith & Nephew, #7 Cover Sheet, #8 Cover Sheet Supplement) (Johnson, Brian)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Taylor v. Smith & Nephew Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Childress
Represented By: Brian P Johnson
Represented By: Kealy C Sehic
Represented By: David Wayne O'Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Smith & Nephew
Represented By: Brian P Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert K. Leedy, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason Henry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert K. Leedy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Neylu, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert K Leedy LLC
Represented By: Brian P Johnson
Represented By: Kealy C Sehic
Represented By: David Wayne O'Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Mills Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Neylu Inc
Represented By: Brian P Johnson
Represented By: Kealy C Sehic
Represented By: David Wayne O'Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert K Leedy
Represented By: Brian P Johnson
Represented By: Kealy C Sehic
Represented By: David Wayne O'Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Smith & Nephew Inc
Represented By: Brian P Johnson
Represented By: Kealy C Sehic
Represented By: David Wayne O'Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Special master: Special Master
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary E. Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary E Taylor
Represented By: Caio Formenti
Represented By: Kristopher Bonham
Represented By: Kip Allan Petroff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?