United States of America v. Coe et al
Plaintiff: United States of Americ and United States of America
Defendant: Morris Russell Coe, Jr., Minister Morris Russell Coe-Bey II, Citizens National Bank of Texas, Dallas County Texas, Grace Foundation Inc and Morris Russell Coe, Jr
Claimant: Dallas County Community College District, Dallas County School Equalization Fund, City of DeSoto, Parkland Hospital District and DeSoto Independent School District
Case Number: 3:2021cv00566
Filed: March 11, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: David L Horan
Referring Judge: Ed Kinkeade
Nature of Suit: Federal Tax Suits: Taxes (US Plaintiff or Defendant)
Cause of Action: 26 U.S.C. ยง 7401
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 5, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 5, 2021 Filing 27 Copy Request by Morris Russell Coe, Jr with Deputy Clerk Response. (cdt)
May 4, 2021 Filing 25 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Grace Foundation Inc. (mjr)
April 30, 2021 Filing 24 MOTION for Default Judgement Against Grace Foundation Inc filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Service Per 28 U.S.C. Section 1746 in Support of United States' Motion for Judgment by Default Against Defendant Grace Foundation, Inc.) (Notinger, Ramona) Modified event, text and linkage on 5/3/2021 (mjr).
April 30, 2021 Filing 23 Request for Clerk to issue Clerk's Entry of Default filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Clerk's Entry of Default Against Defendant Grace Foundation, Inc.) (Notinger, Ramona) Modified event and text on 5/3/2021 (mjr).
April 29, 2021 Filing 26 AFFIDAVIT in Support of Claim by Morris Russell Coe, Jr. (jmg)
April 27, 2021 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:22. Tue Apr 27 14:16:27 CDT 2021 (crt)
April 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 12/6/2021. Discovery due by 7/1/2022. Joinder of Parties due by 12/6/2021. Motions due by 8/1/2022. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge David L. Horan on 4/26/2021) (ndt)
April 26, 2021 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:21. Mon Apr 26 09:09:00 CDT 2021 (crt)
April 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Joinder of Parties due by 12/6/2021. Amended Pleadings due by 12/6/2021. Discovery due by 7/1/2022. Motions due by 8/1/2022. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge David L. Horan on 4/23/2021) (mjr)
April 22, 2021 Filing 20 NOTICE of United State's Portion of Rule 26(f) Report re: #11 Order Setting Deadline/Hearing, filed by United States of Americ (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1) (Notinger, Ramona)
April 6, 2021 Filing 18 (Document Restricted) Attorney Contact Information (Sealed pursuant to SO 19-1, statute, or rule) filed by Citizens National Bank of Texas (Wray, John)
April 5, 2021 Filing 17 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Citizens National Bank of Texas identifying Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate First Citizens Bancshares, Inc. for Citizens National Bank of Texas. (Wray, John)
April 5, 2021 Filing 16 ANSWER to #1 Complaint filed by Citizens National Bank of Texas. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. Attorney John C Wray added to party Citizens National Bank of Texas(pty:dft) (Wray, John)
March 29, 2021 Filing 15 NOTICE of Verified Claim of Dallas County, Texas et al. filed by City of DeSoto, Dallas County Community College District, Dallas County School Equalization Fund, Dallas County Texas, DeSoto Independent School District, Parkland Hospital District (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1) (Bird, Douglas)
March 29, 2021 Filing 14 ANSWER to #1 Complaint filed by City of DeSoto, Dallas County Community College District, Dallas County School Equalization Fund, Dallas County Texas, DeSoto Independent School District, Parkland Hospital District. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. Attorney Douglas Steve Bird added to party City of DeSoto(pty:clm), Attorney Douglas Steve Bird added to party Dallas County Community College District(pty:clm), Attorney Douglas Steve Bird added to party Dallas County School Equalization Fund(pty:clm), Attorney Douglas Steve Bird added to party Dallas County Texas(pty:dft), Attorney Douglas Steve Bird added to party DeSoto Independent School District(pty:clm), Attorney Douglas Steve Bird added to party Parkland Hospital District(pty:clm) (Bird, Douglas)
March 29, 2021 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Dallas County Texas, City of DeSoto, DeSoto Independent School District, Dallas County Community College District, Dallas County School Equalization Fund, Parkland Hospital District. (Bird, Douglas)
March 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 STANDING ORDER ON DISCOVERY AND OTHER NON-DISPOSITIVE MOTIONS (Ordered by Magistrate Judge David L. Horan on 3/26/2021) (ykp)
March 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER REQUIRING RULE 26(f) REPORT: Counsel for the United States and Coe must confer over the telephone or through videoconferencing not later than 4/19/2021. Rule 26(f) Report due by 4/26/2021. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge David L. Horan on 3/26/2021) (ykp)
March 26, 2021 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:11. Fri Mar 26 16:01:08 CDT 2021 (crt)
March 26, 2021 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:12. Fri Mar 26 16:03:36 CDT 2021 (crt)
March 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ELECTRONIC ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge David L. Horan for Pretrial Management. (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 3/25/2021) (chmb)
March 25, 2021 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Grace Foundation Inc; served on 3/18/2021. (Notinger, Ramona)
March 24, 2021 Filing 9 Response to #1 Complaint filed by Morris Russell Coe, Jr.. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (jmg)
March 24, 2021 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Morris Russell Coe, Jr; served on 3/18/2021. (Notinger, Ramona)
March 22, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Citizens National Bank of Texas; served on 3/17/2021. (Notinger, Ramona)
March 11, 2021 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by United States of Americ. (Notinger, Ramona)
March 11, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Citizens National Bank of Texas, Morris Russell Coe, Jr., Dallas County Texas, Grace Foundation Inc. (oyh)
March 11, 2021 Filing 3 New Case Notes: A filing fee is not due for this case. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Horan). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (oyh)
March 11, 2021 Filing 2 Request for Clerk to issue Summonses filed by United States of Americ. (Attachments: #1 Summons - Grace Foundation Inc, #2 Summons - Citizens National Bank of Texas, #3 Summons - Dallas County Texas) (Notinger, Ramona)
March 11, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by United States of Americ. (Filer fee note- Filed by the USA) Plaintiff will submit summons(es) for issuance. In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet) (Notinger, Ramona)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Coe et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Morris Russell Coe, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Minister Morris Russell Coe-Bey II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Citizens National Bank of Texas
Represented By: Kevin Andrew Kosoris
Represented By: John C Wray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dallas County Texas
Represented By: Douglas Steve Bird
Represented By: Lori Gruver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grace Foundation Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Morris Russell Coe, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of Americ
Represented By: Ramona S Notinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Ramona S Notinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Dallas County Community College District
Represented By: Douglas Steve Bird
Represented By: Lori Gruver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Dallas County School Equalization Fund
Represented By: Douglas Steve Bird
Represented By: Lori Gruver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: City of DeSoto
Represented By: Douglas Steve Bird
Represented By: Lori Gruver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Parkland Hospital District
Represented By: Douglas Steve Bird
Represented By: Lori Gruver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: DeSoto Independent School District
Represented By: Douglas Steve Bird
Represented By: Lori Gruver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?