McCray et al v. United States of America
Plaintiff: Nikki S McCray, Stewart Phillip McCray and Nikki Slaughter McCray
Defendant: United States of America
Receiver: Howard M. Spector
Case Number: 3:2021cv00580
Filed: March 12, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Ada Brown
Nature of Suit: Federal Tax Suits: Taxes (US Plaintiff or Defendant)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 10, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 10, 2021 Filing 16 Agreed MOTION to Remand to State Court [Partial Remand of Certain Matters] filed by Stewart Phillip McCray (Arnett, J)
April 21, 2021 Filing 15 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Howard Marc Spector on behalf of Howard M. Spector. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Spector, Howard)
April 19, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE of Dismissal re: #12 Complaint filed by Howard M Spector. (Jenevein, Robert)
April 13, 2021 Filing 13 ELECTRONIC Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Ada Brown: Status Conference held on 4/13/2021. Attorney Appearances: Plaintiff - J. Robert Arnett; Plaintiff- Clint Westhoff; Defense- Michelle Johns; Receiver - Robert Jenevein. (Court Reporter: Nikki Barr) (No exhibits) Time in Court - :25. (chmb)
April 13, 2021 Filing 12 Receiver's Original Complaint for Declaratory Judgment against All Plaintiffs filed by Howard M. Spector. (Filer fee note- Clerk to add prior fee payment info here.) Summons(es) not requested at this time. In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B) (Jenevein, Robert) Modified on 4/14/2021 (ykp).
April 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #8 Stewart Phillip McCray's Unopposed Motion for Status Conference. Video conference will be held on April 13, 2021, at 2 p.m. (Ordered by Judge Ada Brown on 4/8/2021) (chmb)
April 8, 2021 Filing 10 ELECTRONIC Notice of Informal Status Conference via VTC set for 4/13/2021 at 02:00 PM before Judge Ada Brown. (chmb)
April 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #4 Motion for Substitution of Counsel for Receiver. Robert C. Jenevein of Waddell Serafino Geary Rechner Jenevein P.C. is substituted as counsel of record for receiver Howard Spector in place of Kevin Buchanan, who is permitted to withdraw. (Ordered by Judge Ada Brown on 4/8/2021) (chmb)
April 5, 2021 Filing 8 Unopposed MOTION for Status Conference filed by Stewart Phillip McCray. (Arnett, J) Modified text on 4/6/2021 (mjr).
March 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #6 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Clint Westhoff. Important Reminder: Unless excused for cause, an attorney who is not an ECF user must register within 14 days of the date the attorney appears in a case pursuant to LR 5.1(f) and LCrR 49.2(g). (Ordered by Judge Ada Brown on 3/26/2021) (chmb)
March 25, 2021 Filing 6 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing (Filing fee $100; Receipt number 0539-11733468) filed by Nikki S McCray (Westhoff, Clint)
March 19, 2021 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:3. Fri Mar 19 09:03:04 CDT 2021 (crt)
March 18, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Supplement to the Record from State Court filed by United States of America (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A - Part 1, #2 Exhibit(s) A - Part 2, #3 Exhibit(s) A - Part 3, #4 Exhibit(s) A - Part 4, #5 Exhibit(s) A - Part 5) (Johns, Michelle)
March 17, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION to Substitute Attorney, for Receiver. Motion filed by Howard M. Spector. Attorney Robert C Jenevein added to party Howard M. Spector(pty:rc) (Jenevein, Robert)
March 12, 2021 Filing 3 New Case Notes: A filing fee is not due for this case. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Ramirez). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (oyh)
March 12, 2021 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by United States of America. (Johns, Michelle)
March 12, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by United States of America. (Filer fee note- Filed by the USA) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Cover Sheet Supplement) (Johns, Michelle)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McCray et al v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nikki S McCray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stewart Phillip McCray
Represented By: J Robert Arnett, II
Represented By: Linda R Stahl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nikki Slaughter McCray
Represented By: Clint Joseph Westhoff
Represented By: Kathryn Murphy Johnk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: Michelle C Johns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Receiver: Howard M. Spector
Represented By: Chad T McLain
Represented By: Howard Marc Spector
Represented By: Robert C Jenevein, C.
Represented By: G Kevin Buchanan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?