Freele v. ADT LLC
Plaintiff: Sarah Freele
Defendant: ADT LLC
Not Classified By Court: ADR Provider
Guardian Ad Litem: Guardian Ad Litem
Case Number: 3:2021cv01104
Filed: May 17, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Brantley Starr
Nature of Suit: Torts/Pers Inj: Other Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 18, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 18, 2022 Filing 63 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL by Sarah Freele. (Davis, Heather)
October 18, 2022 Civil Case Terminated per #63 Stipulation of Dismissal. (ndt)
October 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ELECTRONIC ORDER finding as moot #26 Motion to Compel Arbitration. (Ordered by Judge Brantley Starr on 10/13/2022) (chmb)
October 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER: The Court GRANTS #57 Motion for Approval of Minor Settlement Agreement, and VACATES as moot #26 Motion to Compel Arbitration. (Ordered by Judge Brantley Starr on 10/11/2022) (chmb)
October 11, 2022 Filing 60 ELECTRONIC Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Brantley Starr: Settlement Conference held on 10/11/2022. Statements heard from Mr. Ellis, Ms. Carter and Mr. Scott. Court to enter order approving settlement. Court is adjourn. Attorney Appearances: Plaintiff - Jon-Bernard Schwartz, Amy Carter; Defense - Jason Scott. (Court Reporter: Kelli Ann Willis) (No exhibits) Time in Court - :10. (chmb)
September 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ELECTRONIC ORDER: The Court VACATES its Scheduling Order [Doc. No. 16] and all accompanying deadlines. (Ordered by Judge Brantley Starr on 9/15/2022) (chmb)
September 14, 2022 Filing 58 ELECTRONIC Notice of Hearing. Motion for Approval of Minor Settlement Agreement Hearing set for 10/11/2022 at 10:00 AM in US Courthouse, Courtroom 1525, 1100 Commerce St., Dallas, TX 75242-1310 before Judge Brantley Starr. (chmb)
September 11, 2022 Filing 57 MOTION For Approval of Minor Settlement Agreeement filed by Sarah Freele (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Approving Minor Settlement) (Branning, Elizabeth)
September 2, 2022 Filing 56 (Document Restricted) CONFIDENTIAL REPORT OF GAL AL ELLIS (Sealed pursuant to SO 19-1, statute, or rule) filed by Guardian Ad Litem (Ellis, Alfred)
August 17, 2022 Filing 55 NOTICE of Change of Address for Attorney Jon-Bernard Schwartz on behalf of Sarah Freele. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Schwartz, Jon-Bernard)
August 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER granting #53 Motion to Appoint Guardian ad Litem. Appointed Alfred W Ellis for Guardian Ad Litem. (Ordered by Judge Brantley Starr on 8/2/2022) (ndt)
July 27, 2022 Filing 53 MOTION to Appoint Guardian Ad Litem ad Litem filed by Sarah Freele (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Carter, Amy)
July 18, 2022 Filing 52 NOTICE of SETTLEMENT IN PRINCIPLE filed by Sarah Freele (Davis, Heather)
June 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 51 CONFIDENTIALITY AND PROTECTIVE ORDER. (Ordered by Judge Brantley Starr on 6/27/2022) (axm)
June 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #49 Motion to Substitute Attorney. (Ordered by Judge Brantley Starr on 6/27/2022) (chmb)
June 17, 2022 Filing 49 MOTION to Substitute Attorney Darren McDowell in place of Eric Policastro filed by Sarah Freele. (McDowell, Darren) Modified text on 6/17/2022 (rekc).
June 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER granting #47 Joint Motion for 30-Day Stay and Agreed Extension of Rebuttal Expert Designation and Discovery Deadlines. Discovery due by 8/26/2022. (Ordered by Judge Brantley Starr on 6/17/2022) (jmg)
June 16, 2022 Filing 47 Joint MOTION to Stay for 30 Days and Agreed Extension of Rebuttal Expert Designation and Discovery Deadlines filed by ADT LLC (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (McGraw, Stephanie)
June 13, 2022 Filing 46 NOTICE of Joint Letter to Court Concerning ECF 43 filed by ADT LLC (McGraw, Stephanie)
June 10, 2022 Filing 45 Joint MOTION for Protective Order And Order Regarding Electronic Discovery filed by ADT LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Exhibit(s)) (McGraw, Stephanie)
June 2, 2022 Filing 44 SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY filed by Sarah Freele re #34 Response/Objection. (oyh)
June 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #37 Motion for Leave to File. (Unless the document has already been filed, clerk to enter the document as of the date of this order.) ADT LLC may file any response to Freele's briefing on Morgan v. Sundance, Inc. by June 16, 2022. Freele may file any reply by June 23, 2022. The parties' response and reply briefs shall be limited to 10 pages. (Ordered by Judge Brantley Starr on 6/2/2022) (chmb) Modified text on 6/2/2022 (ykp).
June 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #41 Motion to Extend Time. (Ordered by Judge Brantley Starr on 6/2/2022) (chmb)
June 1, 2022 Filing 41 Unopposed MOTION to Extend Time For Agreed Extension of Rebuttal Expert Designation Deadline filed by ADT LLC (McGraw, Stephanie)
May 31, 2022 Filing 40 REPLY filed by ADT LLC re: #28 MOTION to Stay Proceedings (McGraw, Stephanie)
May 26, 2022 Filing 39 REPLY filed by ADT LLC re: #26 MOTION to Compel Arbitration (McGraw, Stephanie)
May 26, 2022 Filing 38 Appendix in Support filed by Sarah Freele re #37 MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Authorityin Support of Response to Defendant's Motion to Compel (dkt 34) (Davis, Heather)
May 26, 2022 Filing 37 MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Authorityin Support of Response to Defendant's Motion to Compel (dkt 34) filed by Sarah Freele (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Davis, Heather)
May 18, 2022 Filing 36 RESPONSE AND OBJECTION filed by Sarah Freele re: #28 MOTION to Stay Proceedings (Davis, Heather)
May 12, 2022 Filing 35 Appendix in Support filed by Sarah Freele re #34 Response/Objection (Davis, Heather)
May 12, 2022 Filing 34 RESPONSE AND OBJECTION filed by Sarah Freele re: #26 MOTION to Compel Arbitration (Davis, Heather)
May 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #29 Motion to Extend Time to File Response/Reply. (Ordered by Judge Brantley Starr on 5/9/2022) (chmb)
May 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #27 Motion to Extend Time. (Ordered by Judge Brantley Starr on 5/9/2022) (chmb)
May 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #30 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Eric Policastro. Important Reminder: Unless excused for cause, an attorney who is not an ECF user must register within 14 days of the date the attorney appears in a case pursuant to LR 5.1(f) and LCrR 49.2(g). (Ordered by Judge Brantley Starr on 5/5/2022) (chmb)
May 4, 2022 Filing 30 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing (Filing fee $100; Receipt number 0539-12800849) filed by Sarah Freele (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Admitted to Practice, #2 Exhibit(s) Certificate of Good Standing)Attorney Eric Policastro added to party Sarah Freele(pty:pla) (Policastro, Eric)
May 4, 2022 Filing 29 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to #26 MOTION to Compel Arbitration filed by Sarah Freele (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Davis, Heather)
April 28, 2022 Filing 28 MOTION to Stay Proceedings filed by ADT LLC (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (McGraw, Stephanie)
April 20, 2022 Filing 27 Unopposed MOTION to Extend Time - Expert Designation Deadlines filed by Sarah Freele (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Davis, Heather)
April 14, 2022 Filing 26 MOTION to Compel Arbitration filed by ADT LLC with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing Index to ADT's Motion to Compel) (McGraw, Stephanie)
March 18, 2022 Filing 25 NOTICE of Related Case filed by ADT LLC (McGraw, Stephanie)
March 8, 2022 Filing 24 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Stephanie S McGraw on behalf of ADT LLC. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (McGraw, Stephanie)
January 27, 2022 Filing 23 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Heather Venrick Davis on behalf of Sarah Freele. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Davis, Heather)
January 21, 2022 Filing 22 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by John Raggio on behalf of Sarah Freele. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Raggio, John)
January 13, 2022 Filing 21 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Amy Kay Carter on behalf of Sarah Freele. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Carter, Amy)
December 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #19 Motion to Extend Time. (Ordered by Judge Brantley Starr on 12/21/2021) (chmb)
December 20, 2021 Filing 19 Unopposed MOTION to Extend Time Expert Designation Deadlines filed by Sarah Freele (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Branning, Elizabeth)
November 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MEDIATION ORDER. The court appoints Adam B LeCrone as mediator. #Alternative Dispute Resolution Summary form provided electronically or by US Mail as appropriate. Deadline for mediation is on or before 8/26/2022. ADR Summary form due 9/9/2022. (Ordered by Judge Brantley Starr on 11/5/2021) (oyh)
November 4, 2021 Filing 17 Designation of Mediator by ADT LLC. (Cassis, Kerensa)
September 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Trial set for two-week docket beginning 11/7/2022 10:00 AM before Judge Brantley Starr. Pretrial Conference set for 10/31/2022 10:00 AM before Judge Brantley Starr. Joinder of Parties due by 10/11/2021. Amended Pleadings due by 10/11/2021. Discovery due by 8/12/2022. Deadline for mediation is on or before 8/26/2022. Joint Status of Settlement Report due by 9/2/2022. Motions due by 9/9/2022. Pretrial Order due by 10/24/2022. Pretrial Materials due by 10/24/2022. (Ordered by Judge Brantley Starr on 9/20/2021) (ygl)
September 9, 2021 Filing 15 Joint Proposal for contents of scheduling and discovery order by ADT LLC. (Cassis, Kerensa)
August 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER REQUIRING ATTORNEY CONFERENCE AND PROPOSAL FOR CONTENTS OF SCHEDULING AND DISCOVERY ORDER: Proposed Scheduling Order due by 9/9/2021. (Ordered by Judge Brantley Starr on 8/9/2021) (ygl)
August 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #12 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Kerensa Cassis. Important Reminder: Unless excused for cause, an attorney who is not an ECF user must register within 14 days of the date the attorney appears in a case pursuant to LR 5.1(f) and LCrR 49.2(g). (Ordered by Judge Brantley Starr on 8/5/2021) (chmb)
August 4, 2021 Filing 12 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing (Filing fee $100; Receipt number 0539-12111490) filed by ADT LLC (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order, #2 Additional Page(s) Certificate of Good Standing)Attorney Kerensa Cassis added to party ADT LLC(pty:dft) (Cassis, Kerensa)
July 30, 2021 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by ADT LLC. (Rawson, Brian)
July 30, 2021 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint filed by ADT LLC. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. Attorney Brian Rawson added to party ADT LLC(pty:dft) (Rawson, Brian)
July 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #7 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Jason R. Scott. Important Reminder: Unless excused for cause, an attorney who is not an ECF user must register within 14 days of the date the attorney appears in a case pursuant to LR 5.1(f) and LCrR 49.2(g). (Ordered by Judge Brantley Starr on 7/29/2021) (chmb)
July 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #6 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Charles C. Eblen. Important Reminder: Unless excused for cause, an attorney who is not an ECF user must register within 14 days of the date the attorney appears in a case pursuant to LR 5.1(f) and LCrR 49.2(g). (Ordered by Judge Brantley Starr on 7/29/2021) (chmb)
July 28, 2021 Filing 7 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing (Filing fee $100; Receipt number 0539-12092687) filed by ADT LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A - Admissions List, #2 Exhibit(s) Certificate of Good Standing)Attorney Jason R Scott added to party ADT LLC(pty:dft) (Scott, Jason)
July 28, 2021 Filing 6 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing (Filing fee $100; Receipt number 0539-12092800) filed by ADT LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Admissions List, #2 Exhibit(s) Other PHVs, #3 Exhibit(s) Certificate of Good Standing)Attorney Charles Carson Eblen added to party ADT LLC(pty:dft) (Eblen, Charles)
June 17, 2021 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to ADT LLC. Waiver sent on 6/1/2021. (Branning, Elizabeth)
May 17, 2021 Filing 4 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Horan). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (ndt)
May 17, 2021 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Sarah Freele. (Branning, Elizabeth)
May 17, 2021 Filing 2 ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to #1 Complaint by Plaintiff Sarah Freele. (Branning, Elizabeth)
May 17, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against ADT LLC filed by Sarah Freele. (Filing fee $402; Receipt number 0539-11899837) Summons(es) not requested at this time. In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Branning, Elizabeth)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Freele v. ADT LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ADT LLC
Represented By: Brian Rawson
Represented By: Charles Carson Eblen
Represented By: Holly Naehritz
Represented By: Jason R Scott
Represented By: Kerensa E Cassis
Represented By: Roy Bradford McKay
Represented By: Stephanie S McGraw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sarah Freele
Represented By: Elizabeth Mitchell Branning
Represented By: Jon-Bernard Schwartz
Represented By: Amy Kay Carter
Represented By: Heather Venrick Davis
Represented By: John Raggio
Represented By: Eric Policastro
Represented By: Darren McDowell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: ADR Provider
Represented By: Adam B LeCrone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Guardian ad litem: Guardian Ad Litem
Represented By: Alfred W Ellis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?