Joe Hand Promotions Inc v. Dive on 75 Private Club Inc et al
Plaintiff: Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. and Joe Hand Promotions Inc
Defendant: Ting Y. Chen, Sangeeta Chopra, Dive on 75 Private Club, Inc. formerly named Rocky's Private Club, Inc. and d/b/a Fordtres Bar & Grill, Ting Y Chen, Dive on 75 Private Club Inc formerly named Rocky's Private Club Inc doing business as Fordtres Bar & Grill, Sandy Chopra and Andy Chen
Case Number: 3:2021cv01110
Filed: May 17, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: A Joe Fish
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Cable/Satellite TV
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1131 ca
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 23, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 23, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE of Dismissal Partial Dismissal only as to Defendant, Sangeeta Chopra, a/k/a Sandy Chopra without Prejudice filed by Joe Hand Promotions Inc (King, Jamie)
June 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 DEFAULT JUDGMENT in favor of Joe Hand Promotions Inc against Dive on 75 Private Club Inc. It is therefore ORDERED that Plaintiff hereby recovers statutory damages pursuant to 47 U.S.C. 605(e)(3)(C)(i)(II) from Defendant in the amount of $10,000.00; and that Plaintiff hereby recovers additional damages pursuant to 47 U.S.C. 605(e)(3)(C)(ii) from Defendant in the amount of $50,000.00; and that Plaintiff hereby recovers costs and attorney's fees from Defendant. The court hereby awards to Plaintiff and against Defendant post-judgment interest on the amounts awarded herein at an annual rate of 0.08% from the date of a final judgment in this case until paid. (Ordered by Senior Judge A. Joe Fish on 6/22/2021) (axm)
June 21, 2021 Filing 12 Appendix in Support filed by Joe Hand Promotions Inc re #11 MOTION for Default Judgment against Dive on 75 Private Club Inc (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B, #3 Exhibit(s) B(1), #4 Exhibit(s) B(2), #5 Exhibit(s) B(3), #6 Exhibit(s) C, #7 Exhibit(s) C(1)) (King, Jamie)
June 21, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION for Default Judgment against Dive on 75 Private Club Inc filed by Joe Hand Promotions Inc with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (King, Jamie)
June 21, 2021 Filing 10 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Dive on 75 Private Club Inc (ykp)
June 18, 2021 Filing 9 Request for Clerk to issue Entry of Default against Defendant, Dive on 75 Private Club, Inc. filed by Joe Hand Promotions Inc. (Attachments: #1 Declaration(s), #2 Exhibit(s) A, #3 Exhibit(s) B, #4 Proposed Order) (King, Jamie)
June 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ELECTRONIC ORDER: Although the defendant Dive on 75 Private Club, Inc., formerly named Rocky's Private Club, Inc. and d/b/a as Fordtres Bar & Grill ("Dive on 75 Private Club") is in default, the plaintiff has failed to move for entry of default and a default judgment. Unless the plaintiff moves for such relief by June 21, 2021, its claims against Dive on 75 Private Club will be dismissed without further notice. (Ordered by Senior Judge A. Joe Fish on 6/14/2021) (chmb)
June 10, 2021 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Dive on 75 Private Club Inc; served on 5/20/2021. (King, Jamie)
May 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ELECTRONIC ORDER: The plaintiff's motion to waive local counsel requirement (docket entry 3) is GRANTED. The plaintiff may proceed without designation of local counsel in this matter. (Ordered by Senior Judge A. Joe Fish on 5/18/2021) (chmb)
May 18, 2021 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Ting Y Chen, Sangeeta Chopra, Dive on 75 Private Club Inc. (ygl)
May 18, 2021 Filing 4 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Ramirez). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (ygl)
May 17, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION Leave to Proceed without Local Counsel filed by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (King, Jamie)
May 17, 2021 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.. (King, Jamie)
May 17, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.. (Filing fee $402; Receipt number 0539-11901319) Clerk to issue summons(es). In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet) (King, Jamie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Joe Hand Promotions Inc v. Dive on 75 Private Club Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ting Y. Chen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sangeeta Chopra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dive on 75 Private Club, Inc. formerly named Rocky's Private Club, Inc. and d/b/a Fordtres Bar & Grill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ting Y Chen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dive on 75 Private Club Inc formerly named Rocky's Private Club Inc doing business as Fordtres Bar & Grill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sandy Chopra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andy Chen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.
Represented By: Jamie Renee King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joe Hand Promotions Inc
Represented By: Jamie Renee King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?