D&T Partners LLC v. Baymark Partners LP et al
Plaintiff: D&T PARTNERS, LLC (successor in interest to ACET VENTURE PARTNERS, LLC) and D&T Partners LLC
Defendant: SG Credit Partners, Inc., Zhexian "Jane&quot Lin, Baymark Partners, LP, Baymark Partners, Matthew Denegre, Dana Marie Tomerlin, Windspeed Trading, LLC, Baymark Partners Management, LLC, Paula Ketter, BAYMARK ACET HOLDCO, LLC, SUPER G CAPITAL, LLC, Baymark ACET Direct Invest, LLC, Marc Cole, Steven Bellah, William Szeto, David Hook, Padasamai Vattana, Tony Ludlow, Vanessa Torres, Baymark Partners LP, Baymark Partners Management LLC, Super G Capital LLC, SG Credit Partners Inc, Baymark ACET Holdco LLC, Baymark ACET Direct Invest LLC and Windspeed Trading LLC
Case Number: 3:2021cv01171
Filed: May 21, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Jane J Boyle
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations
Cause of Action: 18 U.S.C. ยง 1964
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 1, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER Granting #22 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer Baymark ACET Direct Invest LLC answer due 8/9/2021; Baymark ACET Holdco LLC answer due 8/9/2021; Baymark Partners answer due 8/9/2021; Baymark Partners LP answer due 8/9/2021; Baymark Partners Management LLC answer due 8/9/2021; Matthew Denegre answer due 8/9/2021; David Hook answer due 8/9/2021; Paula Ketter answer due 8/9/2021; Zhexian "Jane" Lin answer due 8/9/2021; Tony Ludlow answer due 8/9/2021; William Szeto answer due 8/9/2021; Dana Marie Tomerlin answer due 8/9/2021; Vanessa Torres answer due 8/9/2021; Padasamai Vattana answer due 8/9/2021; Windspeed Trading LLC answer due 8/9/2021. (Ordered by Judge Jane J. Boyle on 7/8/2021) (svc)
July 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Baymark ACET Direct Invest LLC, Baymark ACET Holdco LLC, Baymark Partners, Baymark Partners Management LLC, Matthew Denegre, David Hook, Paula Ketter, Zhexian "Jane" Lin, Tony Ludlow, William Szeto, Dana Marie Tomerlin, Vanessa Torres, Padasamai Vattana, Windspeed Trading LLC (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Attorney Brenda Amber Hard-Wilson added to party Paula Ketter(pty:dft), Attorney Brenda Amber Hard-Wilson added to party Zhexian "Jane" Lin(pty:dft), Attorney Brenda Amber Hard-Wilson added to party William Szeto(pty:dft), Attorney Brenda Amber Hard-Wilson added to party Dana Marie Tomerlin(pty:dft), Attorney Brenda Amber Hard-Wilson added to party Vanessa Torres(pty:dft), Attorney Brenda Amber Hard-Wilson added to party Padasamai Vattana(pty:dft), Attorney Brenda Amber Hard-Wilson added to party Windspeed Trading LLC(pty:dft) (Hard-Wilson, Brenda)
June 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Tony Ludlow. Waiver sent on 6/2/2021. (Freeman, Jason)
June 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Matthew Denegre. Waiver sent on 6/2/2021. (Freeman, Jason)
June 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to David Hook. Waiver sent on 6/2/2021. (Freeman, Jason)
June 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Baymark Partners. Waiver sent on 6/2/2021. (Freeman, Jason)
June 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Baymark Partners Management LLC. Waiver sent on 6/2/2021. (Freeman, Jason)
June 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Baymark ACET Holdco LLC. Waiver sent on 6/2/2021. (Freeman, Jason)
June 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Baymark ACET Direct Invest LLC. Waiver sent on 6/2/2021. (Freeman, Jason)
June 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Zhexian "Jane" Lin. Waiver sent on 6/2/2021. (Freeman, Jason)
June 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Windspeed Trading LLC. Waiver sent on 6/2/2021. (Freeman, Jason)
June 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to William Szeto. Waiver sent on 6/2/2021. (Freeman, Jason)
June 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Vanessa Torres. Waiver sent on 6/8/2021. (Freeman, Jason)
June 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Padasamai Vattana. Waiver sent on 6/2/2021. (Freeman, Jason) Modified text on 6/29/2021 (mjr).
June 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Dana Marie Tomerlin. Waiver sent on 6/2/2021. (Freeman, Jason)
June 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Super G Capital LLC. Waiver sent on 6/8/2021. (Freeman, Jason)
June 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Steven Bellah. Waiver sent on 6/8/2021. (Freeman, Jason)
June 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to SG Credit Partners Inc. Waiver sent on 6/8/2021. (Freeman, Jason)
June 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Marc Cole. Waiver sent on 6/8/2021. (Freeman, Jason)
May 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to #1 Complaint by Plaintiff D&T Partners LLC. (Freeman, Jason)
May 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Baymark ACET Direct Invest LLC, Baymark ACET Holdco LLC, Baymark Partners, Baymark Partners LP, Baymark Partners Management LLC, Steven Bellah, Marc Cole, Matthew Denegre, David Hook, Paula Ketter, Zhexian "Jane" Lin, Tony Ludlow, SG Credit Partners Inc, Super G Capital LLC, William Szeto, Dana Marie Tomerlin, Vanessa Torres, Padasamai Vattana, Windspeed Trading LLC. (ygl)
May 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Ramirez). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (ygl)
May 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by D&T PARTNERS, LLC (successor in interest to ACET VENTURE PARTNERS, LLC). (Filing fee $402; Receipt number 0539-11917719) Clerk to issue summons(es). In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1, #2 Exhibit(s) 2, #3 Exhibit(s) 3, #4 Exhibit(s) 4, #5 Exhibit(s) 5, #6 Exhibit(s) 6, #7 Exhibit(s) 7, #8 Exhibit(s) 8, #9 Exhibit(s) 9, #10 Exhibit(s) 10, #11 Exhibit(s) 11, #12 Exhibit(s) 12, #13 Exhibit(s) 13, #14 Exhibit(s) 14, #15 Exhibit(s) 15, #16 Exhibit(s) 16, #17 Exhibit(s) 17, #18 Exhibit(s) 18, #19 Exhibit(s) 19, #20 Exhibit(s) 20, #21 Exhibit(s) 21, #22 Exhibit(s) 22, #23 Exhibit(s) 23, #24 Exhibit(s) 24, #25 Exhibit(s) 25, #26 Exhibit(s) 26, #27 Exhibit(s) 27, #28 Exhibit(s) 28, #29 Exhibit(s) 29, #30 Exhibit(s) 30, #31 Exhibit(s) 31, #32 Exhibit(s) 32, #33 Exhibit(s) 33, #34 Exhibit(s) 34, #35 Exhibit(s) 35, #36 Exhibit(s) 36, #37 Exhibit(s) 37, #38 Exhibit(s) 38, #39 Exhibit(s) 39, #40 Exhibit(s) 40, #41 Exhibit(s) 41) (Freeman, Jason)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: D&T Partners LLC v. Baymark Partners LP et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SG Credit Partners, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zhexian "Jane&quot Lin
Represented By: Timothy P Woods
Represented By: Brenda Amber Hard-Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Baymark Partners, LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Baymark Partners
Represented By: Edward P Perrin, Jr
Represented By: Jennifer R Poe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Denegre
Represented By: Edward P Perrin, Jr
Represented By: Jennifer R Poe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dana Marie Tomerlin
Represented By: Timothy P Woods
Represented By: Brenda Amber Hard-Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Windspeed Trading, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Baymark Partners Management, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paula Ketter
Represented By: Timothy P Woods
Represented By: Brenda Amber Hard-Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BAYMARK ACET HOLDCO, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SUPER G CAPITAL, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Baymark ACET Direct Invest, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marc Cole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven Bellah
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Szeto
Represented By: Timothy P Woods
Represented By: Brenda Amber Hard-Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Hook
Represented By: Edward P Perrin, Jr
Represented By: Jennifer R Poe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Padasamai Vattana
Represented By: Timothy P Woods
Represented By: Brenda Amber Hard-Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tony Ludlow
Represented By: Edward P Perrin, Jr
Represented By: Jennifer R Poe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vanessa Torres
Represented By: Timothy P Woods
Represented By: Brenda Amber Hard-Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Baymark Partners LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Baymark Partners Management LLC
Represented By: Edward P Perrin, Jr
Represented By: Jennifer R Poe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Super G Capital LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SG Credit Partners Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Baymark ACET Holdco LLC
Represented By: Edward P Perrin, Jr
Represented By: Jennifer R Poe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Baymark ACET Direct Invest LLC
Represented By: Edward P Perrin, Jr
Represented By: Jennifer R Poe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Windspeed Trading LLC
Represented By: Timothy P Woods
Represented By: Brenda Amber Hard-Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: D&T PARTNERS, LLC (successor in interest to ACET VENTURE PARTNERS, LLC)
Represented By: Jason B Freeman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: D&T Partners LLC
Represented By: Jason B Freeman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?