Poulter et al v. Assaf et al
Plaintiff: Preston Poulter and John T Lamont
Defendant: Victoria C Kundert, Dean Assaf, VikkiVerse, Ethan Van Sciver, Da Talk and Ali "Dean&quot Assaf
Case Number: 3:2021cv01176
Filed: May 23, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Ed Kinkeade
Nature of Suit: Torts/Pers Inj: Assault, Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 22, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 22, 2021 Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Dean Assaf; served on 7/13/2021. (Ahmed, Mohammed)
July 19, 2021 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Ethan Van Sciver ; served on 7/14/2021. (Ahmed, Mohammed)
June 28, 2021 Filing 14 Summons Issued as to Ali "Dean" Assaf, Victoria C Kundert, Ethan Van Sciver. (mjr)
June 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ELECTRONIC Order Returning Case to District Judge. (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 6/28/2021) (chmb)
June 25, 2021 Filing 12 Request for Clerk to issue Summons filed by Preston Poulter. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet Summons 2, #2 Cover Sheet Summons 3) (Ahmed, Mohammed)
June 25, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Mohammed S Ahmed on behalf of Preston Poulter. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Ahmed, Mohammed)
June 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ELECTRONIC ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge David L. Horan for pretrial management. (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 6/23/2021) (chmb)
June 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #7 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Vickie S Brandt and Eric D Fein Withdrawn. (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 6/23/2021) (chmb)
June 17, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney (With Consent) filed by John T Lamont, Preston Poulter. (Fein, Eric) Modified text on 6/18/2021 (mjr).
June 3, 2021 Filing 6 AMENDED COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against All Defendants filed by Preston Poulter, John T Lamont. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Fein, Eric)
May 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: Federal courts are vested with subject-matter jurisdiction over all civil actions "arising under the Constitution, laws, or treaties of the United States," or where the case in controversy exceeds $75,000 and is between citizens of different states, or between citizens of a state and citizens or subjects of a foreign state. 28 U.S.C. 1331, 1332(a)(1)(2). Plaintiffs may amend their Complaint within ten (10) days from the date this Order is signed. Failure to properly establish this Courts subject-matter jurisdiction will result in dismissal without further notice. See FED. R. CIV. P. 12(h)(3) ("If the court determines at any time that it lacks subject-matter jurisdiction, the court must dismiss the action."). (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 5/25/2021) (chmb)
May 24, 2021 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by John T Lamont, Preston Poulter. (Fein, Eric)
May 24, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Dean Assaf, Victoria C Kundert, Ethan Van Sciver. (ygl)
May 23, 2021 Filing 2 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Horan). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (ygl)
May 23, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against All Defendants filed by Preston Poulter, John T. Lamont. (Filing fee $402; Receipt number 0539-11918273) Clerk to issue summons(es). In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet) (Fein, Eric)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Poulter et al v. Assaf et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Victoria C Kundert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dean Assaf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VikkiVerse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ethan Van Sciver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Da Talk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ali "Dean&quot Assaf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Preston Poulter
Represented By: Eric D Fein
Represented By: Vickie S Brandt
Represented By: Jeremy M Masten
Represented By: Mohammed S Ahmed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John T Lamont
Represented By: Eric D Fein
Represented By: Vickie S Brandt
Represented By: Jeremy M Masten
Represented By: Mohammed S Ahmed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?