Tehuti v. Collie et al
Plaintiff: Sheik Tehuti
Defendant: Christopher C Collie, John Ivie, III, Cyrus Raoufpur, Hon Craig Smith, Colven Tran & Meredith PLC, Trans-Atlas Fin and Armani Family Trust
Case Number: 3:2021cv01582
Filed: July 8, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Ada Brown
Referring Judge: David L Horan
Nature of Suit: Real Property: All Other Real Property
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 31, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 JUDGMENT: It is ORDERED that Plaintiff Sheik Tehuti's motion for a preliminary injunction [Dkt. No. #8 ] and his motions for default judgment [Dkt. Nos. #10 - #13 ] are DENIED; his amended complaint [Dkt. No. #7 ] is DISMISSED; and this FILING SANCTION IS IMPOSED: Tehuti is BARRED from proceeding either in forma pauperis or pro se in any action in this Court whether filed here; filed in state court and removed to this Court; or filed in another federal court and transferred to this Court without first obtaining leave of the Court in writing. All future actions in which Tehuti is proceeding either in forma pauperis or pro se without obtaining written leave of the Court should be docketed and then administratively closed. (Ordered by Judge Ada Brown on 8/31/2021) (ykp)
August 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER ACCEPTING #14 FINDINGS, CONCLUSIONS, AND RECOMMENDATION OF THE UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE. (Ordered by Judge Ada Brown on 8/31/2021) (ykp)
August 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER denying #16 , #17 Motion for Recusal. (Ordered by Judge Ada Brown on 8/31/2021) (ykp)
August 31, 2021 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:18,19,20. Tue Aug 31 16:05:55 CDT 2021 (crt)
August 30, 2021 Filing 17 MOTION to Recuse Judge David L Horan Violation of Rule 309 filed by Sheik Tehuti. (mjr)
August 30, 2021 Filing 16 MOTION to Recuse Judge David L Horan for Alleged Judicial Criminal Conduct filed by Sheik Tehuti. (mjr)
August 27, 2021 Filing 15 OBJECTION filed by Sheik Tehuti re: #14 Findings and Recommendations on Motions. (mjr)
August 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 FINDINGS, CONCLUSIONS, AND RECOMMENDATION OF THE UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE: The Court should deny Plaintiff Sheik Tehuti's motion for a preliminary injunction [Dkt. No. #8 ] and his motions for default judgment [Dkt. Nos. #10 , #11 , #12 , #13 ]; dismiss his amended complaint [Dkt. No. #7 ]; and impose the filing sanction recommended. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge David L. Horan on 8/13/2021) (ygl)
August 13, 2021 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:14. Fri Aug 13 15:43:57 CDT 2021 (crt)
August 11, 2021 Clerk declines to enter default as summons was not issued re: #9 Request for Clerk to issue Entry of Default. (mjr)
August 11, 2021 Filing 13 AFFIDAVIT of Fact re: #12 MOTION for Default Judgment against Christopher C Collie, Colven Tran & Meredith PLC, John Ivie, III, Cyrus Raoufpur, Craig Smith by Sheik Tehuti. (mjr)
August 11, 2021 Filing 12 MOTION for Entry of Default Judgment against Christopher C Collie, Colven Tran & Meredith PLC, John Ivie, III, Cyrus Raoufpur, Craig Smith filed by Sheik Tehuti. (mjr)
August 11, 2021 Filing 11 AFFIDAVIT in Support re: #10 MOTION for Default Judgment against Christopher C Collie, Colven Tran & Meredith PLC, John Ivie, III, Cyrus Raoufpur, Craig Smith by Sheik Tehuti. (mjr)
August 11, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION for Default Judgment against Christopher C Collie, Colven Tran & Meredith PLC, John Ivie, III, Cyrus Raoufpur, Craig Smith filed by Sheik Tehuti. (mjr)
August 11, 2021 Filing 9 Request for Clerk to issue Entry of Default filed by Sheik Tehuti. (mjr)
August 11, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Application for an Order Requiring the Defendant to Show Cause Why the Injunction Should Not by Granted filed by Sheik Tehuti. (mjr)
August 11, 2021 Filing 7 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Christopher C Collie, John Ivie, III, Cyrus Raoufpur, Craig Smith, Colven Tran & Meredith PLC, Trans-Atlas Fin, Armani Family Trust filed by Sheik Tehuti. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (mjr)
July 9, 2021 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:1, 2. Re-mailed Fri Jul 9 15:08:28 CDT 2021 (crt)
July 8, 2021 Filing 6 Petition in the Nature of a Quiet Title Action and Claim/Judicial Notice filed by Sheik Tehuti (ykp)
July 8, 2021 Filing 5 Petition in the Nature of a Petition to Vacate a Void Judgment and Collateral Attack FRCP Rule 60 filed by Sheik Tehuti (ykp)
July 8, 2021 Filing 4 Petition for Judicial Review of Administrative Action Under Texas Code 2001.145 Federal Rule 201 Mandatory Administrative Fact filed by Sheik Tehuti (ykp)
July 8, 2021 Filing 3 COMPLAINT against Christopher C Collie, John Ivie, III, Cyrus Raoufpur, Craig Smith filed by Sheik Tehuti. (Filing fee $402; Receipt number DS132416) Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (ykp)
July 8, 2021 Filing 2 Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party (ykp)
July 8, 2021 Filing 1 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. CASREF case referral set and case referred to Magistrate Judge Horan (see Special Order 3). Case received over counter or electronically. (For court use only - links to the #national index and to the prior sanctions found within the #circuit index.) Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Horan). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (ykp)
July 8, 2021 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:1,2. Thu Jul 8 13:51:29 CDT 2021 (crt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tehuti v. Collie et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sheik Tehuti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher C Collie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Ivie, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cyrus Raoufpur
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hon Craig Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Colven Tran & Meredith PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trans-Atlas Fin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Armani Family Trust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?