OM Prosperity LLC et al v. Northfield Insurance Company
Plaintiff: OM Prosperity, LLC, Anjum Varshney and OM Prosperity LLC
Defendant: Northfield Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2021cv01671
Filed: July 20, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Ed Kinkeade
Nature of Suit: Contract: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 15, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 15, 2021 Filing 23 Designation of Mediator by OM Prosperity LLC, Anjum Varshney. (Kucera, Brennan)
August 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Trial set for 6/6/2022 09:00 AM before Judge Ed Kinkeade. Deadline for mediation is on or before 12/8/2021. Joinder of Parties due by 10/15/2021. Amended Pleadings due by 10/15/2021. Discovery due by 1/18/2022. Motions due by 2/1/2022. Pretrial Order due by 5/6/2022. Pretrial Materials due by 5/6/2022. (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 8/19/2021) (chmb)
August 19, 2021 Filing 21 AMENDED ANSWER to Complaint filed by Northfield Insurance Company. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (ndt)
August 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #19 Motion for Leave to File First Amended Answer. (Unless the document has already been filed, clerk to enter the document as of the date of this order.) (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 8/19/2021) (chmb)
August 19, 2021 Filing 19 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Answer filed by Northfield Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit(s) Exhibit 2, #3 Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Scheihing, Robert)
August 11, 2021 Filing 18 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Brennan Michael Kucera for Benjamin Tenenholtz on behalf of OM Prosperity LLC, Anjum Varshney. (Kucera, Brennan)
August 9, 2021 Filing 17 Joint REPORT Regarding Contents of Scheduling Order filed by Northfield Insurance Company. (Scheihing, Robert)
August 9, 2021 Filing 16 SECOND AMENDED NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Anjum Varshney, OM Prosperity LLC. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (mla)
August 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #14 Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Notice of Removal. (Unless the document has already been filed, clerk to enter the document as of the date of this order.) (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 8/9/2021) (chmb)
August 6, 2021 Filing 14 MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Notice of Removal filed by Northfield Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit(s) Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit(s) Exhibit B-1, #4 Exhibit(s) Exhibit B-2, #5 Exhibit(s) Exhibit B-3, #6 Exhibit(s) Exhibit B-4, #7 Exhibit(s) Exhibit B-5, #8 Exhibit(s) Exhibit B-6, #9 Exhibit(s) Exhibit B-7, #10 Cover Sheet Exhibit C, #11 Cover Sheet Supplement Exhibit C-1, #12 Exhibit(s) Exhibit D, #13 Exhibit(s) Exhibit E, #14 Exhibit(s) Exhibit F, #15 Exhibit(s) Exhibit G, #16 Exhibit(s) Exhibit I, #17 Exhibit(s) Exhibit J, #18 Exhibit(s) Exhibit K, #19 Exhibit(s) Exhibit L, #20 Exhibit(s) Exhibit M, #21 Exhibit(s) Exhibit N, #22 Exhibit(s) Exhibit O, #23 Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Scheihing, Robert)
August 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ELECTRONIC ORDER denying #11 Motion for Leave to Proceed without Local Counsel. Plaintiffs must designate local counsel within 14 days from the date of this order. Further, the Court reminds the parties that local counsel must sign all documents submitted, or they will be subject to being stricken without further notice. (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 8/2/2021) (chmb)
July 28, 2021 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by OM Prosperity LLC, Anjum Varshney. (Kucera, Brennan)
July 28, 2021 Filing 11 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to Proceed without Local Counsel filed by OM Prosperity LLC, Anjum Varshney (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Kucera, Brennan).
July 27, 2021 Filing 10 AMENDED NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Northfield Insurance Company. Amendment to #1 Notice of Removal. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B-1, #3 Exhibit B-2, #4 Exhibit B-3, #5 Exhibit(s) Exhibit B-4, #6 Exhibit B-5, #7 Exhibit B-6, #8 Exhibit B-7, #9 Cover Sheet Exhibit C, #10 Cover Sheet Supplement Exhibit C-1, #11 Exhibit D, #12 Exhibit E, #13 Exhibit F, #14 Exhibit G, #15 Exhibit I, #16 Exhibit J, #17 Exhibit K, #18 Exhibit L, #19 Exhibit M, #20 Exhibit N, #21 Exhibit O) (Scheihing, Robert) Modified text on 7/29/2021 (mla).
July 27, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by J Richard Harmon on behalf of Northfield Insurance Company. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Harmon, J)
July 23, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Docket Text/Document Modification. Document 8 filed on 7/23/2021 was removed from the Court's docket and will be retained by the Clerk's Office in the appropriate file. (twd)
July 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REQUIRING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE AND REPORT FOR CONTENTS OF SCHEDULING ORDER. (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 7/21/2021) (chmb)
July 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: Federal courts are vested with subject matter jurisdiction over all civil actions "arising under the Constitution, laws, or treaties of the United States," or where the case in controversy exceeds $75,000 and is between citizens of different states, or between citizens of a state and citizens or subjects of a foreign state. 28 U.S.C. 1331, 1332(a)(1)-(2). The Court orders Defendant to properly amend its Notice of Removal to reflect Plaintiffs' citizenship within ten (10) days from the date this order is signed. Failure to comply with this order will result in remand of the case without further notice. See FED. R. CIV. P. 12(h)(3); Stafford, 945 F.2d at 805. (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 7/21/2021) (chmb)
July 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ELECTRONIC ORDER: Local Rule 83.10(a) requires the appearance of local counsel where counsel of record for a party does not reside in this district. Accordingly, within twenty days of this date, Defendant, Northfield Insurance Company shall file the entry of appearance of local counsel satisfying the requirements of Local Rule 83.10(a). Failure to do so may result defendant's pleadings being stricken and default taken against that defendant without further notice. (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 7/21/2021) (chmb)
July 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ELECTRONIC ORDER: Local Rule 83.10(a) requires the appearance of local counsel where counsel of record for a party does not reside in this district. Accordingly, within twenty days of this date, plaintiffs OM Prosperity, LLC and Anjum Varshney shall file the entry of appearance of local counsel satisfying the requirements of Local Rule 83.10(a). Failure to do so may result in dismissal of this case without prejudice and without further notice. (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 7/21/2021) (chmb)
July 20, 2021 Filing 7 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Horan). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (mla)
July 20, 2021 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Northfield Insurance Company. (Scheihing, Robert)
July 20, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH JURY DEMAND filed by Northfield Insurance Company. (Filing fee $402; receipt number 0539-12067500) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit(s) Exhibit B-1, #3 Exhibit(s) Exhibit B-2, #4 Exhibit(s) Exhibit B-3, #5 Exhibit(s) Exhibit B-4, #6 Exhibit(s) Exhibit B-5, #7 Exhibit(s) Exhibit B-6, #8 Cover Sheet Exhibit C, #9 Cover Sheet Supplement Exhibit C-1, #10 Exhibit(s) Exhibit D, #11 Exhibit(s) Exhibit E, #12 Exhibit(s) Exhibit F, #13 Exhibit(s) Exhibit G, #14 Exhibit(s) Exhibit H, #15 Exhibit(s) Exhibit I) (Scheihing, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: OM Prosperity LLC et al v. Northfield Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: OM Prosperity, LLC
Represented By: Benjamin Crowell
Represented By: Brennan Michael Kucera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anjum Varshney
Represented By: Benjamin Crowell
Represented By: Brennan Michael Kucera
Represented By: Benjamin Micah Tenenholtz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: OM Prosperity LLC
Represented By: Brennan Michael Kucera
Represented By: Benjamin Crowell
Represented By: Benjamin Micah Tenenholtz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Northfield Insurance Company
Represented By: Robert F. Scheihing
Represented By: J Richard Harmon
Represented By: Linda Szuhy Ressetar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?