Carstar Franchisor SPV LLC v. Simple Yes Corp et al
Plaintiff: CARSTAR FRANCHISOR SPV LLC
Defendant: SIMPLE YES CORP DBA CARSTAR GUARDIAN AUTO BODY, ODED GABBAY and Simple Yes Corp doing business as Carstar Guardian Auto Body
Case Number: 3:2021cv01723
Filed: July 23, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Barbara M G Lynn
Nature of Suit: Contract: Franchise
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 16, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER REQUIRING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE AND REPORT FOR CONTENTS OF SCHEDULING ORDER: Lead counsel for each party (or a designee attorney with appropriate authority) and any unrepresented party (except for a prisoner litigant proceeding pro se) shall confer as soon as practicable, but in any event no later than 9/30/2021. Joint Report due by 10/7/2021. (Ordered by Chief Judge Barbara M. G. Lynn on 9/16/2021) (ykp)
September 15, 2021 Filing 16 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand filed by Oded Gabbay, Simple Yes Corp. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Landerman, Allen)
August 24, 2021 Filing 15 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Oded Gabbay, Simple Yes Corp. (Landerman, Allen)
August 24, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Allen Landerman on behalf of Oded Gabbay, Simple Yes Corp. (Filer will update contact info in ECF.) (Landerman, Allen)
August 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #10 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Dennis Leone. Important Reminder: Unless excused for cause, an attorney who is not an ECF user must register within 14 days of the date the attorney appears in a case pursuant to LR 5.1(f) and LCrR 49.2(g). (Ordered by Chief Judge Barbara M. G. Lynn on 8/16/2021) (chmb)
August 12, 2021 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Oded Gabbay; served on 7/28/2021. (Leone, Dennis)
August 12, 2021 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Carstar Franchisor SPV LLC; served on 7/29/2021. (Leone, Dennis)
August 2, 2021 Filing 10 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing (Filing fee $100; Receipt number 0539-12102604) filed by Carstar Franchisor SPV LLC Attorney Dennis Dean Leone added to party Carstar Franchisor SPV LLC(pty:pla) (Leone, Dennis)
July 27, 2021 Filing 9 Summons Reissued as to Simple Yes Corp. (mjr)
July 27, 2021 Filing 8 Request for Clerk to reissue Summons to Simple Yes Corp with address provided filed by Carstar Franchisor SPV LLC. (Stevens, Bryan) Modified text on 7/27/2021 (svc).
July 26, 2021 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Oded Gabbay, Simple Yes Corp. (Attachments: #1 Additional Page(s)) (ndt)
July 26, 2021 Filing 6 Request for Clerk to issue Summons filed by Carstar Franchisor SPV LLC. (Stevens, Bryan)
July 23, 2021 Filing 5 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Ramirez). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (mjr)
July 23, 2021 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by CARSTAR FRANCHISOR SPV LLC identifying Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate Driven Brands Inc., Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate Driven Brands Holding Inc. for CARSTAR FRANCHISOR SPV LLC. (Stevens, Bryan)
July 23, 2021 Filing 3 Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by CARSTAR FRANCHISOR SPV LLC re: #2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction. (Stevens, Bryan) Modified text on 7/26/2021 (mjr).
July 23, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by CARSTAR FRANCHISOR SPV LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration(s) of Kathleen Teffeau) (Stevens, Bryan) Modified text on 7/26/2021 (mjr).
July 23, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ODED GABBAY, SIMPLE YES CORP DBA CARSTAR GUARDIAN AUTO BODY filed by CARSTAR FRANCHISOR SPV LLC. (Filing fee $402; Receipt number 0539-12080851) Plaintiff will submit summons(es) for issuance. In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Franchise Agreement, #2 Exhibit(s) Addendum, #3 Exhibit(s) Guaranty, #4 Exhibit(s) Notice of Default - First, #5 Exhibit(s) Notice of Default - Second, #6 Exhibit(s) Notice of Termination, #7 Exhibit(s) Glenn Cole Dec, #8 Exhibit(s) Letter, #9 Exhibit(s) Damages, #10 Cover Sheet) (Stevens, Bryan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Carstar Franchisor SPV LLC v. Simple Yes Corp et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CARSTAR FRANCHISOR SPV LLC
Represented By: Bryan Paul Stevens
Represented By: Dennis Dean Leone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SIMPLE YES CORP DBA CARSTAR GUARDIAN AUTO BODY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ODED GABBAY
Represented By: Allen Landerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Simple Yes Corp doing business as Carstar Guardian Auto Body
Represented By: Allen Landerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?