Alvarado et al v. Revlon Consumer Products Company et al
Plaintiff: Alvaro Alvarado
Defendant: Revlon Consumer Products Company, Adventis Inc, Barretts Minerals Inc, Bayer Consumer Care Holdings LLC, Beyer Healthcare LLC, Brenntag Specialties LLC, Brenntag North America Inc, Dr Scholls LLC, Fisons Corporation, Maybelline LLC, Merck & Co Inc, Novartis Corporation, Pfizer Inc, PTI Union LLC and Scholls Wellness Company LLC
Cross Defendant: Maria Del Rosario Tobias, Whittaker Clark & Daniels Inc, Clinique Laboratories Inc, Clinique Laboratories LLC, Color Techniques Inc, Cosmetic Specialties Inc, Crown Laboratories Inc, Estee Lauder Inc, The Estee Lauder Companies Inc, GSK Consumer Health, L'oreal USA Inc, Presperse Corporation, Presperse International Corp and Specialty Minerals Inc
Cross Claimant: Sanofi-Aventis US LLC
Case Number: 3:2021cv01850
Filed: August 9, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Karen Gren Scholer
Nature of Suit: Torts/Pers Inj: Asbestos Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 6, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 6, 2021 Filing 45 ANSWER to Complaint filed by Brenntag Specialties LLC. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Ogden, Todd)
September 30, 2021 Filing 44 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(2) and Brief in Support filed by GSK Consumer Health with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B)Attorney Jillian van Rensburg Keith added to party GSK Consumer Health(pty:dft) (Keith, Jillian)
September 30, 2021 Filing 43 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(2) and Brief in Support filed by Crown Laboratories Inc with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B)Attorney Jillian van Rensburg Keith added to party Crown Laboratories Inc(pty:dft) (Keith, Jillian)
September 27, 2021 Filing 42 RESPONSE filed by Revlon Consumer Products Company re: #25 MOTION to Remand to State Court (Solomon, Kimberly)
September 23, 2021 Filing 41 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by PTI Union LLC. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet) (Ware, James)
September 22, 2021 Filing 40 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Clinique Laboratories LLC. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet) (Ware, James)
September 22, 2021 Filing 39 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by The Estee Lauder Companies Inc. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet) (Ware, James)
September 22, 2021 Filing 38 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Estee Lauder Inc. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet) (Ware, James)
September 21, 2021 Filing 37 First MOTION to Withdraw Pleading filed by Clinique Laboratories LLC (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Cover Sheet) (Ware, James)
September 21, 2021 Filing 36 First AMENDED ANSWER to First AMENDED COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND filed by Clinique Laboratories LLC. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet) (Ware, James) Modified text on 9/22/2021 (jmg).
September 20, 2021 Filing 35 ANSWER to Complaint filed by PTI Union LLC. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet)Attorney James L Ware added to party PTI Union LLC(pty:dft) (Ware, James)
September 20, 2021 Filing 34 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand filed by The Estee Lauder Companies Inc, Estee Lauder Companies Inc.. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. Attorney James L Ware added to party The Estee Lauder Companies Inc(pty:dft) (Ware, James)
September 20, 2021 Filing 33 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand filed by Estee Lauder Inc. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. Attorney James L Ware added to party Estee Lauder Inc(pty:dft) (Ware, James)
September 20, 2021 Filing 32 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand filed by Clinique Laboratories LLC. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. Attorney James L Ware added to party Clinique Laboratories LLC(pty:dft) (Ware, James)
September 20, 2021 Filing 31 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand filed by Clinique Laboratories Inc. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet)Attorney James L Ware added to party Clinique Laboratories Inc(pty:dft) (Ware, James)
September 20, 2021 Filing 30 MOTION to Withdraw FRCP 12(b)(2) Motion to Dismiss filed by Brenntag North America Inc, Brenntag Specialties LLC Attorney Todd D Ogden added to party Brenntag North America Inc(pty:crd), Attorney Todd D Ogden added to party Brenntag Specialties LLC(pty:crd) (Ogden, Todd)
September 17, 2021 Filing 29 SECOND AMENDED NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Revlon Consumer Products Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Exhibit(s), #3 Exhibit(s), #4 Exhibit(s)) (Solomon, Kimberly) Modified event text on 9/20/2021 (jmg).
September 17, 2021 Filing 28 NOTICE of Dismissal filed by Brenntag North America Inc (Ogden, Todd)
September 17, 2021 Filing 27 Agreed Stipulation and MOTION to Bifurcate Plaintiffs' Successor Liability Claims Against Brenntag Specialties LLC by Brenntag North America Inc. (Ogden, Todd) Modified event text on 9/17/2021 (jmg).
September 8, 2021 Filing 26 Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by Alvaro Alvarado re #25 MOTION to Remand to State Court (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1 - Execution of Service) (Montemayor, Jennifer)
September 8, 2021 Filing 25 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Alvaro Alvarado (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Montemayor, Jennifer)
September 3, 2021 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:24. Fri Sep 3 12:35:10 CDT 2021 (crt)
September 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER: The Court previously ordered Defendant Revlon Consumer Products Corporation to allege the citizenship of Defendants Bayer Consumer Care Holdings LLC; Bayer Healthcare LLC; Brenntag Specialties, LLC; Clinique Laboratories, LLC; Dr. Scholl's LLC; Maybelline LLC; PTI Union, LLC; Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC; Scholls Wellness Company LLC; and Fiesta Mart, LLC. The Amended Notice of Removal, however, does not allege the citizenships of all members of the LLC Defendants. Accordingly, on or before 9/17/2021, Revlon shall amend its notice of removal setting forth diversity of citizenship, in conformity with 28 U.S.C. 1332. (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 9/2/2021) (mjr)
August 31, 2021 Filing 23 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Brenntag Specialties LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Plt's 1st Amended Jury Demand, #2 Affidavit(s) Affidavit)Attorney Todd D Ogden added to party Brenntag Specialties LLC(pty:dft) (Ogden, Todd)
August 31, 2021 Filing 22 AMENDED NOTICE OF REMOVAL against Alvaro Alvarado filed by Revlon Consumer Products Company. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) List of State Court Documents, #2 Exhibit(s) State Court Pleadings 1-68, #3 Exhibit(s) Amended Petition, #4 Exhibit(s) List of Counsel and Parties, #5 Exhibit(s) Revlon Corporate Disclosure Statement Filed) (Solomon, Kimberly) Modified text on 9/1/2021 (jmg).
August 31, 2021 Filing 21 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Brenntag North America Inc (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Plt's 1st Amended Jury Demand, #2 Affidavit(s) Affidavit)Attorney Todd D Ogden added to party Brenntag North America Inc(pty:dft) (Ogden, Todd)
August 30, 2021 Filing 20 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Maybelline LLC identifying Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate L'OREAL USA Inc for Maybelline LLC. (Miller, Matthew)
August 30, 2021 Filing 19 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand filed by Maybelline LLC. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. Attorney Matthew R Miller added to party Maybelline LLC(pty:dft) (Miller, Matthew)
August 30, 2021 Filing 18 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by L'oreal USA Inc identifying Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate L'Oreal SA for L'oreal USA Inc. (Miller, Matthew)
August 30, 2021 Filing 17 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand filed by L'oreal USA Inc. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. Attorney Matthew R Miller added to party L'oreal USA Inc(pty:dft) (Miller, Matthew)
August 26, 2021 Filing 16 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Sanofi-Aventis US LLC identifying Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate sanofi for Sanofi-Aventis US LLC. (Elliston, Gary)
August 26, 2021 Filing 15 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand filed by Sanofi-Aventis US LLC. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge., CROSSCLAIM against All Parties filed by Sanofi-Aventis US LLCAttorney Gary D Elliston added to party Sanofi-Aventis US LLC(pty:dft) (Elliston, Gary)
August 26, 2021 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Brenntag North America Inc. (Ogden, Todd)
August 23, 2021 Filing 13 Designation of local counsel Mary Elizondo Frazier for Defendants Barretts Minerals Inc, Pfizer Inc, Specialty Minerals Inc. (Frazier, Mary) Modified title on 8/24/2021 (ygl).
August 23, 2021 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Pfizer Inc. (Frazier, Mary)
August 23, 2021 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Specialty Minerals Inc identifying Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate Minerals Technologies Inc. for Specialty Minerals Inc. (Frazier, Mary)
August 23, 2021 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Barretts Minerals Inc identifying Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate Specialty Minerals Inc for Barretts Minerals Inc. (Frazier, Mary)
August 23, 2021 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint filed by Pfizer Inc. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. Attorney Mary Elizondo Frazier added to party Pfizer Inc(pty:dft) (Frazier, Mary)
August 23, 2021 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint filed by Specialty Minerals Inc. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. Attorney Mary Elizondo Frazier added to party Specialty Minerals Inc(pty:dft) (Frazier, Mary)
August 23, 2021 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint filed by Barretts Minerals Inc. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. Attorney Mary Elizondo Frazier added to party Barretts Minerals Inc(pty:dft) (Frazier, Mary)
August 16, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Cosmetic Specialties Inc (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Exhibit A)Attorney Jason James Irvin added to party Cosmetic Specialties Inc(pty:dft) (Irvin, Jason) Modified title on 8/17/2021 (ygl).
August 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: No later than 21 days from the date of this Order, Defendant must file an amended notice of removal that alleges diversity of citizenship, in conformity with 28 U.S.C. 1332; otherwise, this action will be remanded to state court. The Court has not specifically evaluated whether the notice of removal complies with N.D. Tex. Civ. R. 81.1. If Defendant is satisfied that the notice of removal complies with Rule 81.1 and that additional documents are unnecessary to address the defect identified in this Order, the amended notice of removal required by this Order need not also contain the documents required by Rule 81.1. (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 8/11/2021) (twd) (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 8/11/2021) (twd)
August 9, 2021 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Revlon Consumer Products Company. (Solomon, Kimberly)
August 9, 2021 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand filed by Revlon Consumer Products Company. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Solomon, Kimberly)
August 9, 2021 Filing 2 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Rutherford). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (ndt)
August 9, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH JURY DEMAND filed by Revlon Consumer Products Company. (Filing fee $402; receipt number 0539-12119575) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Exhibit(s), #3 Exhibit(s), #4 Exhibit(s), #5 Exhibit(s), #6 Exhibit(s), #7 Cover Sheet, #8 Cover Sheet Supplement, #9 Proposed Order) (Solomon, Kimberly)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Alvarado et al v. Revlon Consumer Products Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alvaro Alvarado
Represented By: Jennifer Ivett Montemayor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: Maria Del Rosario Tobias
Represented By: Jennifer Ivett Montemayor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: Whittaker Clark & Daniels Inc
Represented By: Todd D Ogden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: Clinique Laboratories Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: Clinique Laboratories LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: Color Techniques Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: Cosmetic Specialties Inc
Represented By: Austin C Daniel
Represented By: Edward M Slaughter
Represented By: Jason James Irvin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: Crown Laboratories Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: Estee Lauder Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: The Estee Lauder Companies Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: GSK Consumer Health
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: L'oreal USA Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: Presperse Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: Presperse International Corp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: Specialty Minerals Inc
Represented By: Mary Elizondo Frazier
Represented By: Jeffrey Stewart Davis
Represented By: Joseph Anthony Ernest D Mansilla
Represented By: Saira Siddiqui
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Revlon Consumer Products Company
Represented By: Kimberly Erin Solomon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adventis Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barretts Minerals Inc
Represented By: Mary Elizondo Frazier
Represented By: Jeffrey Stewart Davis
Represented By: Joseph Anthony Ernest D Mansilla
Represented By: Saira Siddiqui
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bayer Consumer Care Holdings LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beyer Healthcare LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brenntag Specialties LLC
Represented By: Todd D Ogden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brenntag North America Inc
Represented By: Todd D Ogden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr Scholls LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fisons Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maybelline LLC
Represented By: Matthew R Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Merck & Co Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Novartis Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pfizer Inc
Represented By: Mary Elizondo Frazier
Represented By: Jeffrey Stewart Davis
Represented By: Joseph Anthony Ernest D Mansilla
Represented By: Saira Siddiqui
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PTI Union LLC
Represented By: James L Ware
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scholls Wellness Company LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross claimant: Sanofi-Aventis US LLC
Represented By: Gary D Elliston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?