Paramski et al v. Mohr Partners Inc
Plaintiff: Steve Paramski, Michael Morgret and Mark Urbanowicz
Defendant: Mohr Partners, Inc. and Mohr Partners Inc
Case Number: 3:2021cv01946
Filed: August 19, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: David C Godbey
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Arbitration
Cause of Action: 09 U.S.C. ยง 0010
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 1, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 1, 2021 Filing 15 OBJECTION filed by Michael Morgret, Steve Paramski, Mark Urbanowicz re: #8 Answer to Complaint, (Stauch, Thomas)
September 30, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Consent to re: #11 Amended MOTION to Consolidate Cases , #10 Agreed MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by Michael Morgret, Steve Paramski, Mark Urbanowicz (Stauch, Thomas)
September 29, 2021 Filing 13 Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by Michael Morgret, Steve Paramski, Mark Urbanowicz re #12 MOTION to Vacate Arbitration Award (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B, #3 Exhibit(s) C, #4 Exhibit(s) D, #5 Exhibit(s) E, #6 Exhibit(s) F) (Stauch, Thomas)
September 29, 2021 Filing 12 MOTION to Vacate Arbitration Award filed by Michael Morgret, Steve Paramski, Mark Urbanowicz (Stauch, Thomas)
September 28, 2021 Filing 11 Amended MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by Michael Morgret, Steve Paramski, Mark Urbanowicz (Stauch, Thomas)
September 16, 2021 Filing 10 Agreed MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by Michael Morgret, Steve Paramski, Mark Urbanowicz (Stauch, Thomas)
September 14, 2021 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Mohr Partners Inc. (Korn, Andrew)
September 14, 2021 Filing 8 Response to Request to Vacate Arbitration Award filed by Mohr Partners Inc. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Mohr Partner's Appendix, #2 Proposed Order Order on Arbitration Award)Attorney Andrew R Korn added to party Mohr Partners Inc(pty:dft) (Korn, Andrew) Modified text on 9/15/2021 (jmg).
August 25, 2021 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Mohr Partners Inc; served on 8/23/2021. (ndt)
August 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #5 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Eric P. Sparks. Important Reminder: Unless excused for cause, an attorney who is not an ECF user must register within 14 days of the date the attorney appears in a case pursuant to LR 5.1(f) and LCrR 49.2(g). (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 8/23/2021) (chmb)
August 20, 2021 Filing 5 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing (Filing fee $100; Receipt number 0539-12155848) filed by Michael Morgret, Steve Paramski, Mark Urbanowicz (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed order re: Admission Pro Hac Vice, #2 Exhibit(s) Certificate of Good Standing)Attorney Eric P Sparks added to party Michael Morgret(pty:pla), Attorney Eric P Sparks added to party Steve Paramski(pty:pla), Attorney Eric P Sparks added to party Mark Urbanowicz(pty:pla) (Sparks, Eric)
August 20, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Mohr Partners Inc. (mla)
August 20, 2021 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Michael Morgret, Steve Paramski, Mark Urbanowicz. (Stauch, Thomas)
August 19, 2021 Filing 3 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Rutherford). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (mla)
August 19, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Mohr Partners, Inc. filed by Steve Paramski, Mark Urbanowicz, Michael Morgret. (Filing fee $402; Receipt number 0539-12152435) Clerk to issue summons(es). In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B, #3 Exhibit(s) C, #4 Exhibit(s) D, #5 Exhibit(s) E, #6 Exhibit(s) F) (Stauch, Thomas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Paramski et al v. Mohr Partners Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steve Paramski
Represented By: Thomas R Stauch
Represented By: Eric P Sparks
Represented By: Ryan C Gentry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Morgret
Represented By: Thomas R Stauch
Represented By: Eric P Sparks
Represented By: Ryan C Gentry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Urbanowicz
Represented By: Thomas R Stauch
Represented By: Eric P Sparks
Represented By: Ryan C Gentry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mohr Partners, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mohr Partners Inc
Represented By: Andrew R Korn
Represented By: C Kyle Pugh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?