Morton v. C R Bard Inc et al
Plaintiff: Valerie Ava Morton
Defendant: C R Bard Inc and Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc
Not Classified By Court: ADR Provider
Case Number: 3:2021cv02169
Filed: September 8, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Karen Gren Scholer
Nature of Suit: Torts/Pers Inj: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Pers Inj/Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 21, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MEDIATION ORDER. The court appoints Craig W Phillips as mediator. The parties are to complete mediation 90 days before trial. #Alternative Dispute Resolution Summary form provided electronically or by US Mail as appropriate. (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 10/21/2021) (jmg)
October 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Trial set for three-week docket beginning 4/11/2022 before Judge Karen Gren Scholer. Joinder of Parties due by 11/15/2021. Motions due by 12/13/2021. Discovery due by 1/17/2022. Pretrial Conference set for 3/31/2022 01:30 PM before Judge Karen Gren Scholer. (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 10/21/2021) (jmg)
October 4, 2021 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to C R Bard Inc; served on 9/15/2021. (Patel, Shreedhar)
October 2, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Melissa Dorman Matthews for Richard B. North, Jr. on behalf of Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc, C R Bard Inc. (Matthews, Melissa)
October 2, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Melissa Dorman Matthews for Brandee J. Kowalzyk on behalf of Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc, C R Bard Inc. (Matthews, Melissa)
October 2, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Melissa Dorman Matthews for Taylor Tapley Daly on behalf of Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc, C R Bard Inc. (Matthews, Melissa)
October 1, 2021 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc, C R Bard Inc. (Matthews, Melissa)
October 1, 2021 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc, C R Bard Inc. (Matthews, Melissa)
October 1, 2021 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand filed by Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc, C R Bard Inc. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. Attorney Melissa Dorman Matthews added to party Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc(pty:dft), Attorney Melissa Dorman Matthews added to party C R Bard Inc(pty:dft) (Matthews, Melissa)
September 10, 2021 Filing 5 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Ramirez). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (ndt)
September 10, 2021 NEW CASE NUMBER 3:21-cv-02169-S Morton v. C.R. Bard, Inc. et al has been opened following the order of transfer entered in case number 4:21cv1035-P. Future filings should reflect only the new case number and be directed to the proper division (see LR 5.1(a)). Clerk to complete new case processing and mail notice of this entry to any party who did not receive it electronically. (ldm)
September 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: The above-styled case is TRANSFERRED to the docket of the Honorable United States District Judge Karen Gren Scholer. (Ordered by Judge Mark Pittman on 9/10/2021) (sre)
September 8, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc., C.R. Bard, Inc. (sre)
September 8, 2021 Filing 2 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. File to: Judge Pittman. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge. Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. Attorneys are further reminded that, if necessary, they must comply with Local Rule 83.10(a) within 14 days or risk the possible dismissal of this case without prejudice or without further notice. (sre)
September 8, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc, C.R. Bard Inc filed by Valerie Ava Morton. (Filing fee $402; Receipt number 0539-12200700) Clerk to issue summons(es). In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet) (Patel, Shreedhar)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Morton v. C R Bard Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Valerie Ava Morton
Represented By: Shreedhar R Patel
Represented By: Shreedhar R. Patel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C R Bard Inc
Represented By: Brandee J Kowalzyk
Represented By: Melissa Dorman Matthews
Represented By: Richard B North, Jr
Represented By: Taylor Tapley Daly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc
Represented By: Brandee J Kowalzyk
Represented By: Melissa Dorman Matthews
Represented By: Richard B North, Jr
Represented By: Taylor Tapley Daly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: ADR Provider
Represented By: Craig W Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?