Mcginty v. Commissioner, Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Linward Mcginty
Defendant: Commissioner, Social Security Administration
Interested Party: Social Security Administration - Interested Party
Case Number: 3:2021cv02300
Filed: September 28, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: David L Horan
Referring Judge: Ed Kinkeade
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW (405(g))
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 14, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 14, 2021 Filing 9 SUMMONS Executed as to Commissioner, Social Security Administration; served on 10/12/2021. (ndt)
October 14, 2021 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to U.S. Attorney, and U.S. Attorney General; served on 10/12/2021. (ndt) Modified text on 10/18/2021 (mjr).
September 29, 2021 Filing 7 Business Reply Card signed by USMS; re: #6 Summons Issued, #5 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis, #1 Complaint. Signed on 9/29/2021. (mjr)
September 29, 2021 Filing 6 Summons issued as to Commissioner, Social Security Administration, U.S. Attorney, and U.S. Attorney General. (axm)
September 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. The Clerk of the Court shall issue summons and the United States Marshal's Service shall serve process on the Defendant. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge David L. Horan on 9/29/2021) (axm)
September 28, 2021 Filing 4 New Case Notes: A filing fee has not been paid. CASREF case referral set and case referred to Magistrate Judge Horan (see Special Order 3). Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Horan). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. Motion(s) referred to Magistrate Judge David L. Horan. (ygl)
September 28, 2021 Filing 3 First MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Linward Mcginty (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Summons) (Herrera, Betty)
September 28, 2021 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Linward Mcginty. (Herrera, Betty) (Main Document 2 replaced with flattened PDF on 9/28/2021) (ygl).
September 28, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Kilolo Kijakazi filed by Linward Mcginty. (Filer fee note- IFP motion in complaint or to be filed) Clerk to issue summons(es). In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit(s) Summons, #3 Exhibit(s) Summons, #4 Exhibit(s) Summons) (Herrera, Betty) (Attachment 1 replaced with flattened PDF on 9/28/2021) (ygl).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mcginty v. Commissioner, Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linward Mcginty
Represented By: Betty Herrera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner, Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Social Security Administration - Interested Party
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?