Sprint Corporation v. Shichinin LLC
Defendant: Shichinin LLC
Petitioner: Sprint Corporation
Respondent: Shichinin, LLC
Case Number: 3:2021cv02308
Filed: September 28, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: David C Godbey
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Arbitration
Cause of Action: 9 U.S.C. ยง 9
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 22, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 22, 2021 Filing 12 (Document Restricted) Sealed Brief/Memorandum in Support re: #1 Petition to Confirm Arbitration Award filed by Sprint Corporation. (axm)
October 22, 2021 Filing 11 (Document Restricted) Sealed Declaration of Matthew D. Richardson in Support of Petition to Confirm Arbitration Award filed by Sprint Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B, #3 Exhibit(s) C, #4 Exhibit(s) D, #5 Exhibit(s) E - J, #6 Exhibit(s) K - M, #7 Exhibit(s) N - Q) (axm)
October 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 (Document Restricted) Sealed ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to File Declaration and Memorandum in Support of Petition to Confirm Arbitration Award Under Seal. (Clerk to enter the sealed and/or ex parte document as of the date of this order.) (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 10/22/2021) (axm)
October 14, 2021 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE of Conference re #2 (Document Restricted) Sealed Motion for Leave to File Under Seal (Sealed pursuant to motion to seal) by Nicholas Shea Davis on behalf of Sprint Corporation (Davis, Nicholas)
October 14, 2021 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Shichinin LLC. Waiver sent on 10/8/2021. (Davis, Nicholas)
October 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #6 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Matthew D. Richardson. Important Reminder: Unless excused for cause, an attorney who is not an ECF user must register within 14 days of the date the attorney appears in a case pursuant to LR 5.1(f) and LCrR 49.2(g). (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 10/8/2021) (chmb)
September 30, 2021 Filing 6 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing for Attorney Matthew D. Richardson (Filing fee $100; Receipt number 0539-12266472) filed by Sprint Corporation (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Davis, Nicholas)
September 29, 2021 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Shichinin LLC. (ygl)
September 28, 2021 Filing 4 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Ramirez). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (ygl)
September 28, 2021 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Sprint Corporation identifying Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate T-Mobile USA Inc, Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate T-Mobile Global Holding GmbH, Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate Deutsche Telekom AG, Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate T-Mobile Global Zwischenholding, Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate Deutsche Telekom Holding B.V. for Sprint Corporation. (Davis, Nicholas)
September 28, 2021 Filing 2 (Document Restricted) Sealed Motion for Leave to File Under Seal (Sealed pursuant to motion to seal) filed by Sprint Corporation (Attachments: #1 Declaration(s) Davis Declaration, #2 Exhibit(s) Exhibit 1 - Richardson Declaration, #3 Exhibit(s) Exhibit A to Richardson Declaration, #4 Exhibit(s) Exhibit B to Richardson Declaration, #5 Exhibit(s) Exhibit C to Richardson Declaration, #6 Exhibit(s) Exhibit D to Richardson Declaration, #7 Exhibit(s) Exhibit E to Richardson Declaration, #8 Exhibit(s) Exhibit F to Richardson Declaration, #9 Exhibit(s) Exhibit G to Richardson Declaration, #10 Exhibit(s) Exhibit H to Richardson Declaration, #11 Exhibit(s) Exhibit I to Richardson Declaration, #12 Exhibit(s) Exhibit J to Richardson Declaration, #13 Exhibit(s) Exhibit K to Richardson Declaration, #14 Exhibit(s) Exhibit L to Richardson Declaration, #15 Exhibit(s) Exhibit M to Richardson Declaration, #16 Exhibit(s) Exhibit N to Richardson Declaration, #17 Exhibit(s) Exhibit O to Richardson Declaration, #18 Exhibit(s) Exhibit P to Richardson Declaration, #19 Exhibit(s) Exhibit Q to Richardson Declaration, #20 Exhibit(s) Exhibit 2, #21 Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Davis, Nicholas)
September 28, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Shichinin, LLC filed by Sprint Corporation. (Filing fee $402; Receipt number 0539-12258215) Clerk to issue summons(es). In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet) (Davis, Nicholas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sprint Corporation v. Shichinin LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Sprint Corporation
Represented By: Kristine McAlister Brown
Represented By: Matthew D. Richardson
Represented By: Nicholas Shea Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Shichinin, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shichinin LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?