Raskin et al v. Dallas Independent School District et al
Plaintiff: Allyson Raskin, JD 1 and JD 2
Defendant: Dallas Independent School District, Dallas Independent School District Board of Trustees, Michael Hinojosa, Ben Mackey, Edwin Flores, Maxie Johnson, Joe Carreon, Dustin Marshall, Dan Micciche, Karla Garcia, Joyce Foreman and Justin Henry
Case Number: 3:2021cv02429
Filed: October 4, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Sam A Lindsay
Referring Judge: Renee Harris Toliver
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 29, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 33 NOTICE OF APPEAL to the Fifth Circuit by Allyson Raskin. Filing fee $505, receipt number 0539-12415678. T.O. form to appellant electronically at #Transcript Order Form or US Mail as appropriate. Copy of NOA to be sent US Mail to parties not electronically noticed. IMPORTANT ACTION REQUIRED: Provide an electronic copy of any exhibit you offered during a hearing or trial that was admitted into evidence to the clerk of the district court within 14 days of the date of this notice. Copies must be transmitted as PDF attachments through ECF by all ECF Users or delivered to the clerk on a CD by all non-ECF Users. See detailed instructions #here. (Exception: This requirement does not apply to a pro se prisoner litigant.) Please note that if original exhibits are in your possession, you must maintain them through final disposition of the case. (Raskin, Allyson) (Main Document 33 replaced on 11/29/2021) (svc).
November 17, 2021 Opinion or Order CASE Returned to District Judge; Magistrate Judge Renee Harris Toliver no longer assigned to case. (ygl)
November 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 32 JUDGMENT dismissing without prejudice all claims asserted by Plaintiffs in their Amended Complaint. (Ordered by Judge Sam A. Lindsay on 11/17/2021) (chmb)
November 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 31 Memorandum Opinion and Order: After reviewing the pending motions and record in this case, the court vacates the referral of this case to the magistrate judge and enters this memorandum opinion and order to address certain jurisdictional concerns raised by the parties' pending motions and pleadings. The court sua sponte dismisses without prejudice for lack of Article III standing the federal claims in Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint. The remaining state law claims in Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint are also dismissed without prejudice pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1367(c). As a result of these jurisdictional rulings, the court need not address Defendants' Motion to Dismiss or Plaintiffs' Motion for Injunctive Relief, which have been terminated. As no claims remain, judgment will issue by separate document. (Ordered by Judge Sam A. Lindsay on 11/17/2021) (chmb)
November 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 30 Emergency MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Allyson Raskin (Raskin, Allyson) Docket text modified on 11/16/2021 (twd).
November 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 29 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Allyson Raskin. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Raskin, Allyson)
November 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 28 RESPONSE filed by Allyson Raskin re: #26 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint (Raskin, Allyson)
November 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 27 AFFIDAVIT Mike Hook by Allyson Raskin. (Raskin, Allyson)
October 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 26 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint filed by Dallas Independent School District (Attachments: #1 Appendix A)Attorney Kathryn E Long added to party Dallas Independent School District(pty:dft) (Long, Kathryn)
October 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 25 AFFIDAVIT Stacie Miller by Allyson Raskin. (Raskin, Allyson)
October 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 AFFIDAVIT Federico Arce by Allyson Raskin. (Raskin, Allyson)
October 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 AFFIDAVIT Lauren Bohart by Allyson Raskin. (Raskin, Allyson)
October 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 AFFIDAVIT Janice Esquivel by Allyson Raskin. (Raskin, Allyson)
October 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 AFFIDAVIT Rachel Hodge by Allyson Raskin. (Raskin, Allyson)
October 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 AFFIDAVIT Virginia King by Allyson Raskin. (Raskin, Allyson) Modified text on 10/14/2021 (jmg).
October 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 AFFIDAVIT Traci Jones by Allyson Raskin. (Raskin, Allyson)
October 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 AFFIDAVIT Bobby Brooks by Allyson Raskin. (Raskin, Allyson)
October 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 AFFIDAVIT Trish Vieira by Allyson Raskin. (Raskin, Allyson)
October 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 AFFIDAVIT Jose Silvester by Allyson Raskin. (Raskin, Allyson)
October 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 AFFIDAVIT Jill Suarez by Allyson Raskin. (Raskin, Allyson)
October 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 AFFIDAVIT Kim Grosheider by Allyson Raskin. (Raskin, Allyson)
October 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 AFFIDAVIT Jessica Hudes by Allyson Raskin. (Raskin, Allyson)
October 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 AFFIDAVIT S Jennifer Doe Lipper by Allyson Raskin. (Raskin, Allyson)
October 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 AFFIDAVIT Saul Demoss by Allyson Raskin. (Raskin, Allyson)
October 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT Avis Novak by Allyson Raskin. (Raskin, Allyson)
October 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT Stephanie A Dietz by Allyson Raskin. (Raskin, Allyson)
October 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT Robert Archer by Allyson Raskin. (Raskin, Allyson)
October 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to #3 Complaint by Plaintiff Allyson Raskin. (Raskin, Allyson)
October 5, 2021 Opinion or Order ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:1, 2. Tue Oct 5 08:34:37 CDT 2021 (crt)
October 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Joe Carreon, Dallas Independent School District, Edwin Flores, Joyce Foreman, Karla Garcia, Justin Henry, Michael Hinojosa, Maxie Johnson, Ben Mackey, Dustin Marshall, Dan Micciche. (Received over the counter) (mjr) Modified on 10/5/2021 (mjr).
October 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Request for Clerk to issue Summons filed by Allyson Raskin. (mjr)
October 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Allyson Raskin. (mjr)
October 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 COMPLAINT against Joe Carreon, Dallas Independent School District, Dallas Independent School District Board of Trustees, Edwin Flores, Joyce Foreman, Karla Garcia, Justin Henry, Michael Hinojosa, Maxie Johnson, Ben Mackey, Dustin Marshall, Dan Micciche filed by JD 2, JD 1, Allyson Raskin. (Filing fee $402; Receipt number DS133990) Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (mjr)
October 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party. (mjr)
October 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. CASREF case referral set and case referred to Magistrate Judge Toliver (see Special Order 3). Case received over counter or electronically. No prior sanctions found. (For court use only - links to the #national and #circuit indexes.) Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Toliver). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (mjr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Raskin et al v. Dallas Independent School District et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allyson Raskin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JD 1
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JD 2
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dallas Independent School District
Represented By: Kathryn E Long
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dallas Independent School District Board of Trustees
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Hinojosa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ben Mackey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edwin Flores
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maxie Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joe Carreon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dustin Marshall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dan Micciche
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karla Garcia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joyce Foreman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Justin Henry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?