Segovia v. Admiral Realty Inc
Plaintiff: Rafael Segovia
Defendant: Admiral Realty Inc
Case Number: 3:2021cv02478
Filed: October 8, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Sam A Lindsay
Referring Judge: Rebecca Rutherford
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1981
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 23, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 23, 2021 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Admiral Realty Inc; served on 11/16/2021. (axm)
October 25, 2021 Filing 7 Business Reply Card signed by USMS re #6 Summons Issued, #1 Complaint, #5 Order Specifying Further Action to be Taken. Signed on 10/25/2021. (ykp)
October 22, 2021 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Admiral Realty Inc. (oyh)
October 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER SPECIFYING FURTHER ACTION TO BE TAKEN: The Clerk of the Court will issue summons to Defendant Admiral Realty, Inc., as proposed by Plaintiff, and the United States Marshal will serve process as to Defendant Admiral Realty, Inc. at the address Plaintiff has provided. Upon docketing of this order, the Clerk will terminate the referral of this action to the Magistrate Judge for screening and return the case to the District Judge for further action. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Rebecca Rutherford on 10/22/2021) (oyh)
October 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ELECTRONIC NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY AND ORDER: Rafael Segovia must address the following deficiency: Signature of the attorney of record or each party proceeding pro se is required on each pleading, motion or other paper filed by that party. Plaintiff(s) must submit a new and properly signed complaint. Failure to comply with this order may lead to dismissal for failure to prosecute pursuant to FRCvP 41(b). Deadline to cure the deficiency is 11/22/2021. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Rebecca Rutherford on 10/22/2021) (Magistrate Judge Rebecca Rutherford)
October 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting [] Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. The Clerk of the Court SHALL NOT ISSUE SUMMONS or take any further action pending judicial screening. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Rebecca Rutherford on 10/12/2021) (oyh)
October 8, 2021 Filing 2 New Case Notes: A filing fee has not been paid. SCREEN case referral set and case referred to Magistrate Judge Rutherford (see Special Order 3). Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Rutherford). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (axm)
October 8, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ADMIRAL REALTY, INC. filed by Rafael Segovia. (Filer fee note- IFP motion in complaint or to be filed) Clerk to issue summons(es). In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Additional Page(s), #3 Additional Page(s), #4 Proposed Order) (Strickland, Duncan) (Attachment 1 replaced on 10/8/2021 to flatten pdf) (axm).
October 8, 2021 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Rafael Segovia (see document #1 -4 for image). (axm)
October 8, 2021 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Rafael Segovia (see document #1 -2 for image). (axm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Segovia v. Admiral Realty Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rafael Segovia
Represented By: Duncan Harold Strickland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Admiral Realty Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?