Wisener v. Revlon Consumer Products Corp
Plaintiff: Naomi Wisener
Defendant: Arkema Inc (sued individually and as successor-by-merger to Wallance & Tiernan d/b/a WTS Pharmacraft) for its Desenex line of products formerly known as Pennwalt Corporation formerly known as Elf Atochem North America Inc, Bayer Consumer Care Holdings LLC, Revlon Consumer Products Corp, Elizabeth Arden, Inc, Amway Corp, Pennwalt Corporation, Elf Atochem North America Inc, Aventis Inc, Avon Products Inc, Barretts Minerals Inc, Bayer Consumer Care LLC, MSD Consumer Care Inc, Bayer Healthcare LLC, Block Drug Company Inc, Block Drug Corporation, Brenntag North America Inc, Brenntag Specialties LLC, GSK Consumer Health Inc, Himmel Management Co LLC (sued Individually and as successor-in-interest to Block Drug Corparation, successor-in-interest to The Gold Bond Sterilizing Powder Company a/k/a The Gold Bond Company) also known as Himmel Group doing business as Martin Him, Noxell Corporation, PTI Union LLC, Elizabeth Arden Inc, Brenntag Specialties Inc, Mineral Pigment Solutions Inc, Brookshire Grocery Company, Charles B Chrystal Company Inc, Chattem Inc, Colgate-Palmolive Company, Conopco Inc (sued individually and as successor-in-interest to Elizabeth Arden Inc) for its White Shoulders, White Diamonds, and Elizabeth Arden lines of products doing business as Unilever Home & Personal Care USA, Cosmetic Specialties Inc (sued individually and formerly d/b/a G&G Specialty Products Co), Coty Inc, Crown Laboratories Inc, Dr. Scholl's LLC, Fisons Corporation, GlaxoSmithKline LLC, Novartis Consumer Health Inc, Ciba Self-Medication Inc, H-E-B LP, Himmel Group, L'Oreal USA Inc, Maybelline LLC, Merck & Co Inc, Nina Ricci USA Inc, Novartis Corporation, Noxzema Chemical Company, Pfizer Inc, The Procter & Gamble Company, Pharma Tech Industries, Puig USA Inc, Sanofi-Aventis US LLC, Sanofi US Services Inc, Scholl's Wellness Company LLC, Specialty Minerals Inc, Unilever United States Inc and Whittaker Clark & Daniels Inc
Case Number: 3:2021cv02683
Filed: October 29, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Jane J Boyle
Referring Judge: Brantley Starr
Nature of Suit: Torts/Pers Inj: Asbestos Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 24, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 118 REPLY filed by Naomi Wisener re: #89 MOTION to Remand to State Court (Peterson, Holly)
December 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 117 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Holly Christine Peterson on behalf of Naomi Wisener. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Peterson, Holly)
December 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 116 RESPONSE filed by Revlon Consumer Products Corp re: #89 MOTION to Remand to State Court (Solomon, Kimberly)
December 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 115 Confirmation of Consent to Removal filed by Avon Products Inc (Baxter, Kay) Modified event text on 12/17/2021 (jmg).
December 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 114 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Avon Products Inc identifying Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate Natura & Co. for Avon Products Inc. (Baxter, Kay)
December 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 113 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand filed by Avon Products Inc. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Baxter, Kay)
December 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 112 Designation of Local Counsel filed by Bayer Consumer Care Holdings LLC, Bayer Healthcare LLC, Dr. Scholl's LLC, Scholl's Wellness Company LLC. (Ellis, Gary) Modified text on 12/15/2021 (jmg). Modified text on 12/15/2021 (mjr).
December 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 111 Confirmation of Consent of Removal filed by Bayer Consumer Care Holdings LLC, Bayer Healthcare LLC, Dr. Scholl's LLC, Scholl's Wellness Company LLC. (Ellis, Gary) Modified text on 12/15/2021 (jmg). Modified text on 12/15/2021 (mjr).
December 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 110 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Bayer Consumer Care Holdings LLC, Bayer Healthcare LLC, Dr. Scholl's LLC, Scholl's Wellness Company LLC. (Ellis, Gary) Modified text on 12/15/2021 (mjr).
December 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 109 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand filed by Bayer Consumer Care Holdings LLC, Bayer Healthcare LLC, Dr. Scholl's LLC, Scholl's Wellness Company LLC. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. Attorney Gary Joe Ellis added to party Bayer Consumer Care Holdings LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Gary Joe Ellis added to party Bayer Healthcare LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Gary Joe Ellis added to party Dr. Scholl's LLC(pty:dft) (Ellis, Gary) Modified text on 12/15/2021 (mjr).
December 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 108 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand filed by The Procter & Gamble Company. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Stepp, Katie)
December 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 107 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand filed by Noxell Corporation. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Stepp, Katie)
December 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 106 NOTICE of Confirmation of Consent to Removal filed by GSK Consumer Health Inc (Keith, Jillian)
December 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 105 NOTICE of Confirmation of Consent to Removal filed by GlaxoSmithKline LLC (Keith, Jillian)
December 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 104 NOTICE of Confirmation of Consent to Removal filed by Crown Laboratories Inc (Keith, Jillian)
December 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 103 NOTICE of Confirmation of Consent to Removal filed by Block Drug Corporation (Keith, Jillian)
December 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 102 NOTICE of Confirmation of Consent to Removal filed by Block Drug Company Inc (Keith, Jillian)
December 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 101 Confirmation of Consent of Removal filed by Conopco Inc (Baxter, Kay) Modified event text on 12/14/2021 (jmg).
December 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 100 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Conopco Inc. (Baxter, Kay)
December 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand filed by Conopco Inc. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Baxter, Kay)
December 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 98 NOTICE of Consent to Removal re: #1 Notice of Removal filed by Elizabeth Arden Inc (Solomon, Kimberly)
December 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 97 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Kay Barnes Baxter on behalf of Conopco Inc. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Baxter, Kay)
December 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 96 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Kay Barnes Baxter on behalf of Avon Products Inc. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Baxter, Kay)
December 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 95 NOTICE of Consent to Removal filed by PTI Union LLC (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet) (Ware, James)
December 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) filed by Pfizer Inc. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Frazier, Mary) Modified title on 12/6/2021 (ygl).
December 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 93 NOTICE of DEFENDANT COSMETIC SPECIALTIES INC.S CONSENT TO REMOVAL filed by Cosmetic Specialties Inc (Irvin, Jason)
December 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 92 NOTICE of Consent of Removal re: #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Colgate-Palmolive Company (Jones, Quincy)
November 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 91 Appendix in Support filed by Naomi Wisener re #89 MOTION to Remand to State Court (Wathen, Frank)
November 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 90 Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by Naomi Wisener re #89 MOTION to Remand to State Court (Wathen, Frank)
November 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 89 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Naomi Wisener (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Wathen, Frank)
November 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 88 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Frank J Wathen on behalf of Naomi Wisener. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Wathen, Frank)
November 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 87 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Nina Ricci USA Inc, Puig USA Inc identifying Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate Puig North America, Inc. for Puig USA Inc; Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate Nina Ricci, S.A.R.L. for Nina Ricci USA Inc. (Sarokhanian, Nicholas)
November 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 86 NOTICE of Consent to Removal filed by Puig USA Inc (Sarokhanian, Nicholas)
November 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 85 Mail returned as undeliverable. #5 Judge Boyle, received back from Forrest Ren Wilkes as Attempted- Not Known unable to Forward. Email address has been added to case so document will not be re-mailed. (oyh)
November 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 84 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Novartis Corporation. (Miltenberger, Lewis)
November 22, 2021 Opinion or Order ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:77. Mon Nov 22 08:35:37 CST 2021 (crt)
November 22, 2021 Opinion or Order ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:76. Mon Nov 22 08:32:25 CST 2021 (crt)
November 22, 2021 Opinion or Order ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:78. Mon Nov 22 08:40:07 CST 2021 (crt)
November 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) with Jury Demand filed by GSK Consumer Health Inc (Keith, Jillian)
November 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) with Jury Demand filed by Crown Laboratories Inc (Keith, Jillian)
November 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) with Jury Demand filed by Block Drug Company Inc (Keith, Jillian)
November 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 80 MOTION to Dismiss filed by GlaxoSmithKline LLC with Brief/Memorandum in Support. Attorney Jillian van Rensburg Keith added to party GlaxoSmithKline LLC(pty:dft) (Keith, Jillian)
November 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 79 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(2) and Brief in Support filed by Block Drug Company Inc (Keith, Jillian) Modified text on 11/22/2021 (jmg).
November 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #62 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Carl William Margrabe. Important Reminder: Unless excused for cause, an attorney who is not an ECF user must register within 14 days of the date the attorney appears in a case pursuant to LR 5.1(f) and LCrR 49.2(g). (Ordered by Judge Brantley Starr on 11/19/2021) (chmb)
November 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #53 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Alexis A. Adams. Important Reminder: Unless excused for cause, an attorney who is not an ECF user must register within 14 days of the date the attorney appears in a case pursuant to LR 5.1(f) and LCrR 49.2(g). (Ordered by Judge Brantley Starr on 11/19/2021) (chmb)
November 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #52 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Ruben J. Olvera. Important Reminder: Unless excused for cause, an attorney who is not an ECF user must register within 14 days of the date the attorney appears in a case pursuant to LR 5.1(f) and LCrR 49.2(g). (Ordered by Judge Brantley Starr on 11/19/2021) (chmb)
November 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER granting #68 MOTION to Designate Local Counsel. (Ordered by Judge Brantley Starr on 11/19/2021) (ykp)
November 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 74 NOTICE of Designation of Local Counsel filed by Arkema Inc (Hendryx, Michael)
November 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 73 NOTICE of Designation of Local Counsel filed by PTI Union LLC (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet) (Ware, James)
November 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to #52 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice by Defendant H-E-B LP. (Olvera, Ruben)
November 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to #53 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice, by Defendant H-E-B LP. (Adams, Alexis)
November 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to #62 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice, by Plaintiff Naomi Wisener. (Attachments: #1 Additional Page(s) Page 3 of Pro Hac Admission App.) (Margrabe, Carl)
November 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand filed by Whittaker Clark & Daniels Inc. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Ogden, Todd)
November 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 68 MOTION to Designate Local Counsel filed by H-E-B LP (Olvera, Ruben) Modified title on 11/18/2021 (ygl).
November 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 67 NOTICE of Designation of Local Counsel filed by Amway Corp (Hicks, Jake)
November 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 66 NOTICE of Written Designation of Local Counsel pursuant to Local Rule 83.10(a) filed by Charles B Chrystal Company Inc (Barron, Barbara)
November 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 65 FRCP 12(b)(2) MOTION to Dismiss filed by Brenntag Specialties LLC (Ogden, Todd) Modified text on 11/17/2021 (jmg).
November 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 64 FRCP 12(b)(2) MOTION to Dismiss filed by Brenntag North America Inc (Ogden, Todd) Modified text on 11/17/2021 (jmg).
November 16, 2021 Opinion or Order ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:63. Tue Nov 16 09:39:18 CST 2021 (crt)
November 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ELECTRONIC ORDER: Pursuant to Local Rule 83.10, the following defendants have 30 days for local counsel to make an appearance: Amway Corp, Arkema Inc, Avon Products Inc, Bayer Consumer Care Holdings LLC, Bayer Healthcare LLC, Charles B Chrystal Company Inc, Conopco Inc, Dr. Scholl's LLC, H-E-B LP, PTI Union LLC, and Unilever United States Inc. (Ordered by Judge Brantley Starr on 11/15/2021) (chmb)
November 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 62 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing (Filing fee $100; Receipt number 0539-12385584) filed by Naomi Wisener (Attachments: #1 Additional Page(s) Certificate of Good Standing - State of New Jersey)Attorney Carl William Margrabe added to party Naomi Wisener(pty:pla) (Margrabe, Carl)
November 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 61 Court Request for Recusal: Senior Judge A. Joe Fish recused. Pursuant to instruction in Special Order 3-249, the Clerk has reassigned the case to Judge Brantley Starr for all further proceedings. Future filings should indicate the case number as: 3:21-cv-2683-X. (ctf)
November 15, 2021 Opinion or Order ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:61. NEF of doc. 61 Mon Nov 15 14:30:53 CST 2021 (crt)
November 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 60 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by The Procter & Gamble Company. (Stepp, Katie)
November 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 59 NOTICE of Confirmation of Consent to Removal filed by The Procter & Gamble Company (Stepp, Katie)
November 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 58 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Noxell Corporation identifying Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate Coty Inc. for Noxell Corporation. (Stepp, Katie)
November 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 57 NOTICE of Confirmation of Consent to Removal filed by Noxell Corporation (Stepp, Katie)
November 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 56 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Coty Inc. (Stepp, Katie)
November 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 55 NOTICE of Confirmation of Consent to Removal filed by Coty Inc (Stepp, Katie)
November 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 54 NOTICE of Consent to Removal filed by Novartis Corporation. Party Novartis Corporation added. (Miltenberger, Lewis)
November 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 53 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing (Filing fee $100; Receipt number 0539-12380199) filed by H-E-B LP (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Certificate of Good Standing)Attorney Alexis A Adams added to party H-E-B LP(pty:dft) (Adams, Alexis)
November 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 52 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing (Filing fee $100; Receipt number 0539-12380029) filed by H-E-B LP (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s)) (Olvera, Ruben)
November 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 51 Court Request for Recusal: Judge Jane J. Boyle recused. Pursuant to instruction in Special Order 3-249, the Clerk has reassigned the case to Senior Judge A. Joe Fish for all further proceedings. Future filings should indicate the case number as: 3:21-cv-2683-G. (axm)
November 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ELECTRONIC ORDER finding as moot #19 Motion to Designate Local Counsel. A motion is to the Court is not required for a party to designate local counsel. See L.R. 83.10. The Clerk of Court has added Laura E. Kugler as an attorney of record for Defendant Revlon Consumer Products Corp. (Ordered by Judge Jane J. Boyle on 11/12/2021) (chmb)
November 12, 2021 Opinion or Order ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:51. Fri Nov 12 10:54:21 CST 2021 (crt)
November 12, 2021 Opinion or Order ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:. NEF of document 50 Fri Nov 12 10:59:51 CST 2021 (crt)
November 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 49 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Arkema Inc. (Hendryx, Michael)
November 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 48 NOTICE of Confirmation of Consent to Removal filed by Amway Corp (Hicks, Jake)
November 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 47 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Amway Corp. (Hicks, Jake)
November 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 46 Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by Cosmetic Specialties Inc re #45 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Special Appearance (Irvin, Jason)
November 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 45 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Special Appearance filed by Cosmetic Specialties Inc with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit(s) Affidavit in Support of Motion to Dismiss, #2 Proposed Order Cosmetic Specialties Inc.s Proposed Order for its Motion to Dismiss). Party Cosmetic Specialties Inc. added. (Irvin, Jason)
November 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 44 NOTICE of Motion to Designate Local Counsel filed by Merck & Co Inc (Edwards, Brady)
November 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 43 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Merck & Co Inc identifying Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate Merck & Co., Inc., Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate Merck & Co. Inc. for Merck & Co Inc. (Edwards, Brady)
November 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 42 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by James L Ware for James L. Ware on behalf of PTI Union LLC. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet) (Ware, James)
November 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 41 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Brandy Edwards. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Exhibit A) (Edwards, Brady) Modified text on 11/10/2021 (mjr).
November 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 40 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Whittaker Clark & Daniels Inc. (Ogden, Todd)
November 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 39 NOTICE of Consent to the Removal re: #1 Notice of Removal,,,,, filed by Sanofi US Services Inc (Elliston, Gary)
November 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 38 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Sanofi US Services Inc identifying Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate sanofi for Sanofi US Services Inc. (Elliston, Gary)
November 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 37 NOTICE of Consent to the Removal re: #1 Notice of Removal,,,,, filed by Sanofi-Aventis US LLC (Elliston, Gary)
November 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 36 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Sanofi-Aventis US LLC identifying Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate sanofi for Sanofi-Aventis US LLC. (Elliston, Gary)
November 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 35 NOTICE of Consent to the Removal re: #1 Notice of Removal,,,,, filed by Fisons Corporation (Elliston, Gary)
November 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 34 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Fisons Corporation identifying Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate sanofi for Fisons Corporation. (Elliston, Gary)
November 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 33 NOTICE of Consent to the Removal re: #1 Notice of Removal,,,,, filed by Aventis Inc (Elliston, Gary)
November 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 32 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Aventis Inc identifying Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate sanofi for Aventis Inc. (Elliston, Gary)
November 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 31 NOTICE of Consent to the Removal re: #1 Notice of Removal,,,,, filed by Chattem Inc (Elliston, Gary)
November 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 30 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Chattem Inc identifying Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate sanofi for Chattem Inc. (Elliston, Gary)
November 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 29 NOTICE of Consent to Removal filed by Specialty Minerals Inc (Frazier, Mary)
November 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 28 NOTICE of Consent to Removal filed by Barretts Minerals Inc (Frazier, Mary)
November 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 27 NOTICE of Consent to Removal filed by Pfizer Inc (Frazier, Mary)
November 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 26 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Specialty Minerals Inc identifying Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate Minerals Technologies Inc. for Specialty Minerals Inc. (Frazier, Mary)
November 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 25 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Barretts Minerals Inc identifying Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate Specialty Minerals, Inc. for Barretts Minerals Inc. (Frazier, Mary)
November 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Pfizer Inc. (Frazier, Mary)
November 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 Designation of local counsel for Defendants Barretts Minerals Inc, Pfizer Inc, Specialty Minerals Inc. (Frazier, Mary) Modified title on 11/10/2021 (ygl).
November 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 NOTICE of Consent to Removal filed by Whittaker Clark & Daniels Inc (Ogden, Todd)
November 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand filed by L'Oreal USA Inc, Maybelline LLC. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Miller, Matthew)
November 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 NOTICE of Consent to the Removal re: #1 Notice of Removal filed by Arkema Inc. (Hendryx, Michael)
November 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MOTION Designate Local Counsel filed by Revlon Consumer Products Corp (Solomon, Kimberly)
November 8, 2021 Opinion or Order ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:18. Mon Nov 8 15:06:19 CST 2021 (crt)
November 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ELECTRONIC ORDER denying #15 Motion for Leave to Proceed without Local Counsel. All parties are expected to fully comply with the requirements of Local Rule 83.10. (Ordered by Judge Jane J. Boyle on 11/5/2021) (chmb)
November 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by PTI Union LLC. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet) (Ware, James)
November 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Colgate-Palmolive Company. (Jones, Quincy)
November 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MOTION for Leave to Proceed without Local Counsel filed by Charles B Chrystal Company Inc (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Barron, Barbara) Modified text on 11/5/2021 (ygl).
November 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 NOTICE of Confirmation of Consent to Removal filed by Charles B Chrystal Company Inc. (Barron, Barbara) Modified linkage and text on 11/4/2021 (mjr).
November 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Charles B Chrystal Company Inc (Barron, Barbara) Modified text on 11/5/2021 (ykp).
November 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by PTI Union LLC re #11 Proposed MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet) (Ware, James)
November 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Proposed MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by PTI Union LLC (Ware, James)
November 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Maybelline LLC identifying Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate L'Oreal USA, Inc. for Maybelline LLC. (Miller, Matthew)
November 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by L'Oreal USA Inc identifying Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate L'Oreal SA for L'Oreal USA Inc. (Miller, Matthew)
November 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE of Defendants L'Oreal USA, Inc. and Maybelline, LLC's Consent to Removal re: #1 Notice of Removal,,,,, filed by L'Oreal USA Inc, Maybelline LLC (Miller, Matthew)
November 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Matthew R Miller on behalf of L'Oreal USA Inc, Maybelline LLC. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Miller, Matthew)
November 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ELECTRONIC ORDER: Plaintiff is hereby ORDERED to respond to Defendant Revlon Consumer Products Company's argument, as set forth in its Notice of Removal (Doc. 1), that Defendants H-E-B, LP and Brookshire Grocery Company are improperly joined. Plaintiff must make her responsive filing by no later than 11/29/2021. (Ordered by Judge Jane J. Boyle on 11/3/2021) (chmb)
November 3, 2021 Opinion or Order ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:6. Wed Nov 3 13:09:21 CDT 2021 (crt)
November 1, 2021 Opinion or Order ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:5. Mon Nov 1 09:45:53 CDT 2021 (crt)
October 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Rutherford). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (jmg)
October 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Elizabeth Arden, Inc. (Solomon, Kimberly)
October 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint filed by Elizabeth Arden, Inc. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. Attorney Kimberly Erin Solomon added to party Elizabeth Arden, Inc(pty:dft) (Solomon, Kimberly)
October 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand filed by Revlon Consumer Products Corp. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Solomon, Kimberly)
October 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH JURY DEMAND filed by Revlon Consumer Products Corp. (Filing fee $402; receipt number 0539-12341886) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Exhibit(s), #3 Exhibit(s), #4 Exhibit(s), #5 Exhibit(s), #6 Exhibit(s), #7 Exhibit(s), #8 Exhibit(s), #9 Exhibit(s), #10 Exhibit(s), #11 Cover Sheet, #12 Cover Sheet Supplement, #13 Proposed Order) (Solomon, Kimberly)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wisener v. Revlon Consumer Products Corp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arkema Inc (sued individually and as successor-by-merger to Wallance & Tiernan d/b/a WTS Pharmacraft) for its Desenex line of products formerly known as Pennwalt Corporation formerly known as Elf Atochem North America Inc
Represented By: Michael Hendryx
Represented By: Clayton E Devin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bayer Consumer Care Holdings LLC
Represented By: Gary Joe Ellis
Represented By: Chad A Johnson
Represented By: Douglas B Dougherty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Revlon Consumer Products Corp
Represented By: Kimberly Erin Solomon
Represented By: Laura E Kugler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elizabeth Arden, Inc
Represented By: Kimberly Erin Solomon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amway Corp
Represented By: Edward Donald Burbach
Represented By: Jake Hicks
Represented By: Davis G Mosmeyer, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pennwalt Corporation
Represented By: Michael Hendryx
Represented By: Clayton E Devin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elf Atochem North America Inc
Represented By: Michael Hendryx
Represented By: Clayton E Devin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aventis Inc
Represented By: Gary D Elliston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Avon Products Inc
Represented By: Kay Barnes Baxter
Represented By: Stephanie Lynn Spardone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barretts Minerals Inc
Represented By: Mary Elizondo Frazier
Represented By: Jeffrey Stewart Davis
Represented By: Joseph Anthony Ernest D Mansilla
Represented By: Saira Siddiqui
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bayer Consumer Care LLC
Represented By: Gary Joe Ellis
Represented By: Chad A Johnson
Represented By: Douglas B Dougherty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MSD Consumer Care Inc
Represented By: Gary Joe Ellis
Represented By: Chad A Johnson
Represented By: Douglas B Dougherty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bayer Healthcare LLC
Represented By: Gary Joe Ellis
Represented By: Chad A Johnson
Represented By: Douglas B Dougherty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Block Drug Company Inc
Represented By: Jillian van Rensburg Keith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Block Drug Corporation
Represented By: Jillian van Rensburg Keith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brenntag North America Inc
Represented By: Todd D Ogden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brenntag Specialties LLC
Represented By: Todd D Ogden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GSK Consumer Health Inc
Represented By: Jillian van Rensburg Keith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Himmel Management Co LLC (sued Individually and as successor-in-interest to Block Drug Corparation, successor-in-interest to The Gold Bond Sterilizing Powder Company a/k/a The Gold Bond Company) also known as Himmel Group doing business as Martin Him
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Noxell Corporation
Represented By: Forrest Ren Wilkes
Represented By: Clint Hagaman
Represented By: Gregory L Deans
Represented By: Katie H Stepp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PTI Union LLC
Represented By: James L Ware
Represented By: James W Karel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elizabeth Arden Inc
Represented By: Kimberly Erin Solomon
Represented By: Laura E Kugler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brenntag Specialties Inc
Represented By: Todd D Ogden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mineral Pigment Solutions Inc
Represented By: Todd D Ogden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brookshire Grocery Company
Represented By: Aaron McClain Speer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles B Chrystal Company Inc
Represented By: Barbara Jane Barron
Represented By: Steven L Russell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chattem Inc
Represented By: Gary D Elliston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Colgate-Palmolive Company
Represented By: Edward M Slaughter
Represented By: Austin C Daniel
Represented By: Quincy Ann Marie Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Conopco Inc (sued individually and as successor-in-interest to Elizabeth Arden Inc) for its White Shoulders, White Diamonds, and Elizabeth Arden lines of products doing business as Unilever Home & Personal Care USA
Represented By: Kay Barnes Baxter
Represented By: Stephanie Lynn Spardone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cosmetic Specialties Inc (sued individually and formerly d/b/a G&G Specialty Products Co)
Represented By: Edward M Slaughter
Represented By: Austin C Daniel
Represented By: Jason James Irvin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Coty Inc
Represented By: Forrest Ren Wilkes
Represented By: Katie H Stepp
Represented By: Clint Hagaman
Represented By: Gregory L Deans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crown Laboratories Inc
Represented By: Jillian van Rensburg Keith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Scholl's LLC
Represented By: Gary Joe Ellis
Represented By: Chad A Johnson
Represented By: Douglas B Dougherty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fisons Corporation
Represented By: Gary D Elliston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GlaxoSmithKline LLC
Represented By: Jillian van Rensburg Keith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Novartis Consumer Health Inc
Represented By: Jillian van Rensburg Keith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ciba Self-Medication Inc
Represented By: Jillian van Rensburg Keith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: H-E-B LP
Represented By: Ruben J Olvera
Represented By: Alexis A Adams
Represented By: Benjamin T Pendroff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Himmel Group
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L'Oreal USA Inc
Represented By: Matthew R Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maybelline LLC
Represented By: Matthew R Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Merck & Co Inc
Represented By: Brady Sherrod Edwards
Represented By: Elizabeth M Chiaviello
Represented By: Lauren A McCulloch Semlinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nina Ricci USA Inc
Represented By: Nicholas Alex Sarokhanian
Represented By: Zoe Phelps
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Novartis Corporation
Represented By: Lewis C Miltenberger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Noxzema Chemical Company
Represented By: Forrest Ren Wilkes
Represented By: Clint Hagaman
Represented By: Gregory L Deans
Represented By: Katie H Stepp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pfizer Inc
Represented By: Mary Elizondo Frazier
Represented By: Jeffrey Stewart Davis
Represented By: Joseph Anthony Ernest D Mansilla
Represented By: Saira Siddiqui
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Procter & Gamble Company
Represented By: Forrest Ren Wilkes
Represented By: Clint Hagaman
Represented By: Gregory L Deans
Represented By: Katie H Stepp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pharma Tech Industries
Represented By: James L Ware
Represented By: James W Karel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Puig USA Inc
Represented By: Nicholas Alex Sarokhanian
Represented By: Zoe Phelps
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanofi-Aventis US LLC
Represented By: Gary D Elliston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanofi US Services Inc
Represented By: Gary D Elliston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scholl's Wellness Company LLC
Represented By: Gary Joe Ellis
Represented By: Chad A Johnson
Represented By: Douglas B Dougherty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Specialty Minerals Inc
Represented By: Mary Elizondo Frazier
Represented By: Jeffrey Stewart Davis
Represented By: Joseph Anthony Ernest D Mansilla
Represented By: Saira Siddiqui
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unilever United States Inc
Represented By: Kay Barnes Baxter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Whittaker Clark & Daniels Inc
Represented By: Todd D Ogden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Naomi Wisener
Represented By: Holly C Peterson
Represented By: Carl William Margrabe
Represented By: Frank J Wathen
Represented By: Holly Christine Peterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?