Manfredini v. Quick Technologies Inc et al
Plaintiff: Jansen Manfredini
Defendant: Quick Technologies Inc doing business as Sage, Eric Natinsky, David Natinsky and Bille Forman
Case Number: 3:2021cv02886
Filed: November 17, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Ed Kinkeade
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 6, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #10 Unopposed Motion to Extend Time to File Response to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss and Refer to Arbitration. Responses due by 1/17/2022. (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 1/6/2022) (chmb)
January 6, 2022 Filing 10 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to #5 MOTION to Dismiss and Refer to Arbitration filed by Jansen Manfredini. (Narvaez, Monica) Modified text and linkage on 1/7/2022 (jmg).
December 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #8 Unopposed Motion to Extend Time to File Response to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss and Refer to Arbitration. Responses due by 1/10/2022. (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 12/9/2021) (chmb)
December 9, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to #5 MOTION to Dismiss and Refer to Arbitration filed by Jansen Manfredini (Narvaez, Monica)
December 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #4 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Steven H. Garrett. Important Reminder: Unless excused for cause, an attorney who is not an ECF user must register within 14 days of the date the attorney appears in a case pursuant to LR 5.1(f) and LCrR 49.2(g). (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 12/6/2021) (chmb)
December 3, 2021 Filing 6 Appendix in Support filed by Quick Technologies Inc re #5 MOTION to Dismiss and Refer to Arbitration Appendix (Merritt, Laura) Modified text on 12/6/2021 (ygl).
December 3, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss and Refer to Arbitration filed by Quick Technologies Inc with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Merritt, Laura)
December 3, 2021 Filing 4 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing (Filing fee $100; Receipt number 0539-12431004) filed by Quick Technologies Inc (Garrett, Steven) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/6/2021: #1 Additional Page(s) PHV with Signature and Certificate of Good Standing from Texas State Bar) (chmb). (Main Document 4 replaced on 12/6/2021) (ygl).
November 17, 2021 Filing 3 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Rutherford). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (mla)
November 17, 2021 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Bille Forman, David Natinsky, Eric Natinsky, Quick Technologies, Inc. d/b/a Sage. (Merritt, Laura)
November 17, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH JURY DEMAND filed by Bille Forman, Eric Natinsky, David Natinsky, Quick Technologies, Inc. d/b/a Sage. (Filing fee $402; receipt number 0539-12393029) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Cover Sheet Supplement, #3 Additional Page(s) Index, #4 Additional Page(s) Docket, #5 Additional Page(s) State Court Filings) (Merritt, Laura)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Manfredini v. Quick Technologies Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jansen Manfredini
Represented By: Michael Y Kim
Represented By: Ericha Ramsey Brown
Represented By: Monica Lynn Narvaez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quick Technologies Inc doing business as Sage
Represented By: Laura M Merritt
Represented By: Steven H Garrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric Natinsky
Represented By: Laura M Merritt
Represented By: Steven H Garrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Natinsky
Represented By: Laura M Merritt
Represented By: Steven H Garrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bille Forman
Represented By: Laura M Merritt
Represented By: Steven H Garrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?