Innovative Sports Management, Inc. v. HF Food and Entertainment, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Innovative Sports Management, Inc. d/b/a Integrated Sports Media and Innovative Sports Management Inc d/b/a Integrated Sports Media
Defendant: HF Food and Entertainment, LLC d/b/a Happy Fish de Dallas, Barbara R. Lozano individually and d/b/a Happy Fish de Dallas, Jose A. Gonzalez, Maria Barajas, HF Food and Entertainment LLC doing business as Happy Fish De Dallas and Barbara R. Lozano individually and doing business as Happy Fish De Dallas
Case Number: 3:2021cv03058
Filed: December 8, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Brantley Starr
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Cable/Satellite TV
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 4, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 4, 2022 Filing 10 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jamie Renee King for David Michael Walsh IV on behalf of Innovative Sports Management Inc. (King, Jamie)
December 16, 2021 Filing 9 Amended NOTICE of Dismissal ONLY as to Defendant, Jose A. Gonzalez, without Prejudice. filed by Innovative Sports Management Inc (King, Jamie) Modified linkage and text on 12/16/2021 (mjr).
December 16, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Dismissal ONLY as to Defendant, Jose A. Gonzalez, without Prejudice filed by Innovative Sports Management Inc. (King, Jamie) Modified text on 12/16/2021 (mjr).
December 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ELECTRONIC ORDER: The Court ORDERS Innovative Sports Management, Inc., to appoint local counsel, in accordance with Local Rule 83.10, by 1/13/2022. (Ordered by Judge Brantley Starr on 12/13/2021) (chmb)
December 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ELECTRONIC ORDER denying #5 Motion (Ordered by Judge Brantley Starr on 12/13/2021) (chmb)
December 9, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION Leave to Proceed without Local Counsel filed by Innovative Sports Management Inc (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (King, Jamie)
December 9, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Maria Barajas, Jose A. Gonzalez, HF Food and Entertainment LLC, Barbara R. Lozano. (ykp)
December 8, 2021 Filing 3 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Rutherford). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (ykp)
December 8, 2021 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Innovative Sports Management, Inc.. (King, Jamie)
December 8, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Innovative Sports Management, Inc.. (Filing fee $402; Receipt number 0539-12442082) Clerk to issue summons(es). In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet) (King, Jamie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Innovative Sports Management, Inc. v. HF Food and Entertainment, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Innovative Sports Management, Inc. d/b/a Integrated Sports Media
Represented By: Jamie Renee King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Innovative Sports Management Inc d/b/a Integrated Sports Media
Represented By: Jamie Renee King
Represented By: David M Walsh, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HF Food and Entertainment, LLC d/b/a Happy Fish de Dallas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barbara R. Lozano individually and d/b/a Happy Fish de Dallas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jose A. Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maria Barajas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HF Food and Entertainment LLC doing business as Happy Fish De Dallas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barbara R. Lozano individually and doing business as Happy Fish De Dallas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?